EP1539895 - WATERBORNE COPOLYMER DISPERSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.01.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Celanese Emulsions Norden AB Box 30 284 80 Perstorp / SE | [2005/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JÖNSSON, Jan-Erik Fagelhundsvägen 20 S-226 53 Lund / SE | 02 /
KARLSSON, Ola Svenshögsvägen 9 S-221 41 Lund / SE | [2005/24] | Representative(s) | Henriksson, Dan Ragnar Mikael Awapatent AB P.O. Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/24] | Henriksson, Dan Ragnar Mikael Awapatent AB P.O. Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 03788205.7 | 13.08.2003 | WO2003SE01268 | Priority number, date | SE20020002436 | 16.08.2002 Original published format: SE 0202436 | [2005/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004016700 | Date: | 26.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1539895 | Date: | 15.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.02.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1539895 | Date: | 28.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 26.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C09D201/00, C08F291/00, C08L101/02, C08G63/06, C08F2/24 | [2005/24] | CPC: |
C08G83/003 (EP,US);
C08F283/04 (EP,US);
C08F283/06 (EP,US);
C08F291/00 (EP,US);
C09D151/003 (EP,US);
C09D151/08 (EP,US);
C09D201/005 (EP,US);
C09J151/003 (EP,US);
C09J151/08 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/24] |
Former [N/P] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | 01.02.2005 | LV | 01.02.2005 | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WÄSSRIGE COPOLYMERDISPERSION | [2005/24] | English: | WATERBORNE COPOLYMER DISPERSION | [2005/24] | French: | DISPERSION DE COPOLYMERES EN PHASE AQUEUSE | [2005/24] | Entry into regional phase | 01.02.2005 | National basic fee paid | 01.02.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.02.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.03.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 01.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/24] | 12.09.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.02.2007 | CH | 28.02.2007 | CY | 28.02.2007 | CZ | 28.02.2007 | DK | 28.02.2007 | EE | 28.02.2007 | FI | 28.02.2007 | LI | 28.02.2007 | RO | 28.02.2007 | SK | 28.02.2007 | BG | 29.05.2007 | GR | 29.05.2007 | PT | 30.07.2007 | IE | 13.08.2007 | MC | 31.08.2007 | HU | 01.09.2007 | [2009/43] |
Former [2009/35] | AT | 28.02.2007 | |
CH | 28.02.2007 | ||
CY | 28.02.2007 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2007 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
EE | 28.02.2007 | ||
FI | 28.02.2007 | ||
LI | 28.02.2007 | ||
RO | 28.02.2007 | ||
SK | 28.02.2007 | ||
BG | 29.05.2007 | ||
GR | 29.05.2007 | ||
PT | 30.07.2007 | ||
IE | 13.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 28.02.2007 | |
CH | 28.02.2007 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2007 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
EE | 28.02.2007 | ||
FI | 28.02.2007 | ||
LI | 28.02.2007 | ||
RO | 28.02.2007 | ||
SK | 28.02.2007 | ||
BG | 29.05.2007 | ||
GR | 29.05.2007 | ||
PT | 30.07.2007 | ||
IE | 13.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/45] | AT | 28.02.2007 | |
CH | 28.02.2007 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2007 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
FI | 28.02.2007 | ||
LI | 28.02.2007 | ||
RO | 28.02.2007 | ||
SK | 28.02.2007 | ||
BG | 29.05.2007 | ||
GR | 29.05.2007 | ||
PT | 30.07.2007 | ||
IE | 13.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 28.02.2007 | |
CH | 28.02.2007 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2007 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
FI | 28.02.2007 | ||
LI | 28.02.2007 | ||
RO | 28.02.2007 | ||
SK | 28.02.2007 | ||
BG | 29.05.2007 | ||
GR | 29.05.2007 | ||
PT | 30.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 28.02.2007 | |
CH | 28.02.2007 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2007 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
FI | 28.02.2007 | ||
LI | 28.02.2007 | ||
RO | 28.02.2007 | ||
SK | 28.02.2007 | ||
BG | 29.05.2007 | ||
PT | 30.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/02] | AT | 28.02.2007 | |
CH | 28.02.2007 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2007 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
FI | 28.02.2007 | ||
LI | 28.02.2007 | ||
SK | 28.02.2007 | ||
BG | 29.05.2007 | ||
PT | 30.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/51] | AT | 28.02.2007 | |
CH | 28.02.2007 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
FI | 28.02.2007 | ||
LI | 28.02.2007 | ||
SK | 28.02.2007 | ||
BG | 29.05.2007 | ||
PT | 30.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | AT | 28.02.2007 | |
CH | 28.02.2007 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
FI | 28.02.2007 | ||
LI | 28.02.2007 | ||
BG | 29.05.2007 | ||
PT | 30.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | AT | 28.02.2007 | |
CH | 28.02.2007 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
FI | 28.02.2007 | ||
LI | 28.02.2007 | ||
BG | 29.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/41] | CH | 28.02.2007 | |
FI | 28.02.2007 | ||
LI | 28.02.2007 | ||
BG | 29.05.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9723539 (PERSTORP AB [SE], et al); | [A]WO9730097 (PPG INDUSTRIES INC [US]); | [A]EP0899286 (TOYO INK MFG CO [JP]); | [A]US5969030 (GRANDHEE SUNITHA [US]); | [A]SE512020 (OEHLINS RACING AB [SE]); | [A]WO0064975 (PERSTORP AB [SE], et al); | [X]EP1095953 (DOW CORNING TORAY SILICONE [JP]); | [Y]WO0233013 (AVECIA BV [NL], et al); | [A]EP1219650 (NAT STARCH CHEM INVEST [US]) |