EP1529364 - MIXED ANALOG AND DIGITAL CHIP-SCALE RECONFIGURABLE WDM NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 28.02.2014 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.2014 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 02.04.2014 [2014/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2014/14] | For all designated states The Boeing Company P.O. Box 3707 M.S. 11-XT Seattle, WA 98124-2207 / US | ||
Former [2008/42] | For all designated states The Boeing Company P.O. Box 3707, M.S. 11-XT Seattle Washington 98124-2207 / US | ||
Former [2005/19] | For all designated states The Boeing Company P.O. Box 3707, M.S. 11-XT Seattle, Washington 98124-2207 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRUG, William, P. 14643 NE 43rd Place 1612 Bellevue, WA 98007 / US | 02 /
HAGER, Harold 18025 NE 10th Street Bellevue, WA 98008 / US | 03 /
HAMILTON, Michael, C. 20418 NE 41st Street Redmond, WA 98053 / US | 04 /
SCHERER, Axel 1900 Catalina Street Laguna Beach, CA 92651 / US | [2005/19] | Representative(s) | Korenberg, Alexander Tal, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/14] | Korenberg, Alexander Tal, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [2009/44] | Korenberg, Alexander Tal, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [2009/38] | Hollywood, Jane Constance Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [2008/34] | Land, Addick Adrianus Gosling, et al Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2005/19] | Land, Addick Adrianus Gosling, et al Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 03788605.8 | 15.08.2003 | WO2003US25814 | Priority number, date | US20020404073P | 15.08.2002 Original published format: US 404073 P | US20030641334 | 13.08.2003 Original published format: US 641334 | [2005/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004017546 | Date: | 26.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/09] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1529364 | Date: | 11.05.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.02.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1529364 | Date: | 15.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/42] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1529364 | Date: | 02.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04J14/02 | [2005/19] | CPC: |
H04Q11/0005 (EP,US);
B82Y20/00 (EP,US);
G02B6/1225 (EP,US);
H04J14/02 (US);
H04J14/0247 (EP,US);
H04J14/0252 (EP,US);
H04J14/0305 (EP);
G02B6/3528 (EP,US);
G02B6/356 (EP,US);
H04J14/0226 (EP,US);
H04J14/0282 (EP,US);
H04Q2011/0016 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2005/49] |
Former [2005/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | ||
Former [N/P] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ANALOG-DIGITAL CHIP-GRÖSSE REKONFIGURIERBARES WDM NETZWERK | [2005/19] | English: | MIXED ANALOG AND DIGITAL CHIP-SCALE RECONFIGURABLE WDM NETWORK | [2005/19] | French: | RESEAU MRL RECONFIGURABLE A L'ECHELLE DE LA PUCE ANALOGIQUE ET NUMERIQUE MIXTE | [2005/19] | Entry into regional phase | 07.03.2005 | National basic fee paid | 07.03.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.03.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.03.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/19] | 16.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.08.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 28.08.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
13.07.2009
14.07.2009
ADMISSIBLE AIRBUS SAS(FR)/ AIRBUS OPÉRATIONS SAS(FR)/ AIRBUS OPERATIONS LTD (GB)/ AIRBUS OPERATIONS GMBH (DE)/ AIRBUS OPERATIONS S.L. (ES 1 Rond-Point Maurice Bellonte 31700 Blagnac / FR Opponent's representative Santarelli, Luc Santarelli 49, avenue des Champs Elysées 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/34] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.07.2009
14.07.2009
ADMISSIBLE AIRBUS SAS(FR)/ AIRBUS OPERATIONS SAS(FR)/ AIRBUS OPERATIONS LTD (GB)/ AIRBUS OPERATIONS GMBH (DE)/ AIRBUS OPERATIONS S.L. (ES 1 Rond-Point Maurice Bellonte 31700 Blagnac / FR Opponent's representative Santarelli, Luc Santarelli 14 avenue de la Grande Armée 75017 Paris / FR | 21.08.2009 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 16.02.2010 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 18.06.2013 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 18.06.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.07.2013 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 30.08.2013 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 18.12.2013 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 19.02.2014 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5926496 (HO SENG-TIONG [US], et al); | [X]WO0049752 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al); | [Y]US6195187 (SOREF RICHARD A [US], et al); | [A]WO0122141 (NANOVATION TECH INC [US]); | [Y]EP1122905 (NTT ELECTRONICS CORP [JP]); | [X]WO0211489 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al); | [PX]WO03007440 (MOTOROLA INC [US]); | Examination | US6054506 | US2001006567 | US2001031112 | US2002074537 |