EP1595034 - REAR CHASSIS FOR A GRADER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.03.2008 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CNH Baumaschinen GmbH Staakener Strasse 53-63 13581 Berlin / DE | [2005/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAMM, Jürgen Pfarrer Theile Strasse 27 13591 Berlin / DE | 02 /
SCHWARTZ, Harald An Den Leddigen 53 14476 Fahrland / DE | [2005/46] | Representative(s) | Meinke, Dabringhaus und Partner GbR Rosa-Luxemburg-Strasse 18 44141 Dortmund / DE | [2005/46] | Application number, filing date | 03788836.9 | 02.12.2003 | [2005/46] | WO2003DE03964 | Priority number, date | DE2002159183 | 18.12.2002 Original published format: DE 10259183 | [2005/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004057116 | Date: | 08.07.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1595034 | Date: | 16.11.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1595034 | Date: | 16.05.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | E02F9/18, E02F3/76 | [2005/46] | CPC: |
E02F3/764 (EP,US);
E02F3/7604 (EP,US);
E02F3/7627 (EP,US);
E02F3/7631 (EP,US);
E02F5/32 (EP,US);
E02F9/18 (EP,US);
B60R19/50 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/46] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HINTERRAHMEN FÜR GRADER | [2005/46] | English: | REAR CHASSIS FOR A GRADER | [2005/46] | French: | CHASSIS ARRIERE POUR NIVELEUSE | [2005/46] | Entry into regional phase | 12.04.2005 | National basic fee paid | 12.04.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.04.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.06.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/46] | 11.08.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.01.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.02.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 16.05.2007 | CZ | 16.05.2007 | DK | 16.05.2007 | EE | 16.05.2007 | FI | 16.05.2007 | IE | 16.05.2007 | NL | 16.05.2007 | RO | 16.05.2007 | SI | 16.05.2007 | SK | 16.05.2007 | TR | 16.05.2007 | BG | 16.08.2007 | GR | 17.08.2007 | PT | 16.10.2007 | HU | 17.11.2007 | AT | 02.12.2007 | LU | 02.12.2007 | BE | 31.12.2007 | CH | 31.12.2007 | LI | 31.12.2007 | MC | 31.12.2007 | [2009/43] |
Former [2009/40] | CY | 16.05.2007 | |
CZ | 16.05.2007 | ||
DK | 16.05.2007 | ||
EE | 16.05.2007 | ||
FI | 16.05.2007 | ||
IE | 16.05.2007 | ||
NL | 16.05.2007 | ||
RO | 16.05.2007 | ||
SI | 16.05.2007 | ||
SK | 16.05.2007 | ||
BG | 16.08.2007 | ||
GR | 17.08.2007 | ||
PT | 16.10.2007 | ||
AT | 02.12.2007 | ||
LU | 02.12.2007 | ||
BE | 31.12.2007 | ||
CH | 31.12.2007 | ||
LI | 31.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2009/35] | CY | 16.05.2007 | |
CZ | 16.05.2007 | ||
DK | 16.05.2007 | ||
EE | 16.05.2007 | ||
FI | 16.05.2007 | ||
IE | 16.05.2007 | ||
NL | 16.05.2007 | ||
RO | 16.05.2007 | ||
SI | 16.05.2007 | ||
SK | 16.05.2007 | ||
BG | 16.08.2007 | ||
GR | 17.08.2007 | ||
PT | 16.10.2007 | ||
AT | 02.12.2007 | ||
BE | 31.12.2007 | ||
CH | 31.12.2007 | ||
LI | 31.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2009/23] | CZ | 16.05.2007 | |
DK | 16.05.2007 | ||
EE | 16.05.2007 | ||
FI | 16.05.2007 | ||
IE | 16.05.2007 | ||
NL | 16.05.2007 | ||
RO | 16.05.2007 | ||
SI | 16.05.2007 | ||
SK | 16.05.2007 | ||
BG | 16.08.2007 | ||
GR | 17.08.2007 | ||
PT | 16.10.2007 | ||
AT | 02.12.2007 | ||
BE | 31.12.2007 | ||
CH | 31.12.2007 | ||
LI | 31.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2009/11] | CZ | 16.05.2007 | |
DK | 16.05.2007 | ||
EE | 16.05.2007 | ||
FI | 16.05.2007 | ||
IE | 16.05.2007 | ||
NL | 16.05.2007 | ||
RO | 16.05.2007 | ||
SI | 16.05.2007 | ||
SK | 16.05.2007 | ||
BG | 16.08.2007 | ||
GR | 17.08.2007 | ||
PT | 16.10.2007 | ||
BE | 31.12.2007 | ||
CH | 31.12.2007 | ||
LI | 31.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/48] | CZ | 16.05.2007 | |
DK | 16.05.2007 | ||
FI | 16.05.2007 | ||
IE | 16.05.2007 | ||
NL | 16.05.2007 | ||
RO | 16.05.2007 | ||
SI | 16.05.2007 | ||
SK | 16.05.2007 | ||
BG | 16.08.2007 | ||
GR | 17.08.2007 | ||
PT | 16.10.2007 | ||
BE | 31.12.2007 | ||
CH | 31.12.2007 | ||
LI | 31.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/43] | CZ | 16.05.2007 | |
DK | 16.05.2007 | ||
FI | 16.05.2007 | ||
IE | 16.05.2007 | ||
NL | 16.05.2007 | ||
RO | 16.05.2007 | ||
SI | 16.05.2007 | ||
SK | 16.05.2007 | ||
BG | 16.08.2007 | ||
GR | 17.08.2007 | ||
PT | 16.10.2007 | ||
BE | 31.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/33] | CZ | 16.05.2007 | |
DK | 16.05.2007 | ||
FI | 16.05.2007 | ||
IE | 16.05.2007 | ||
NL | 16.05.2007 | ||
RO | 16.05.2007 | ||
SI | 16.05.2007 | ||
SK | 16.05.2007 | ||
BG | 16.08.2007 | ||
GR | 17.08.2007 | ||
PT | 16.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CZ | 16.05.2007 | |
DK | 16.05.2007 | ||
FI | 16.05.2007 | ||
IE | 16.05.2007 | ||
NL | 16.05.2007 | ||
RO | 16.05.2007 | ||
SI | 16.05.2007 | ||
SK | 16.05.2007 | ||
BG | 16.08.2007 | ||
GR | 17.08.2007 | ||
PT | 16.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | CZ | 16.05.2007 | |
DK | 16.05.2007 | ||
FI | 16.05.2007 | ||
IE | 16.05.2007 | ||
NL | 16.05.2007 | ||
SI | 16.05.2007 | ||
SK | 16.05.2007 | ||
BG | 16.08.2007 | ||
GR | 17.08.2007 | ||
PT | 16.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/14] | CZ | 16.05.2007 | |
DK | 16.05.2007 | ||
FI | 16.05.2007 | ||
IE | 16.05.2007 | ||
NL | 16.05.2007 | ||
SI | 16.05.2007 | ||
SK | 16.05.2007 | ||
BG | 16.08.2007 | ||
PT | 16.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | CZ | 16.05.2007 | |
DK | 16.05.2007 | ||
FI | 16.05.2007 | ||
IE | 16.05.2007 | ||
NL | 16.05.2007 | ||
SI | 16.05.2007 | ||
BG | 16.08.2007 | ||
PT | 16.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | DK | 16.05.2007 | |
FI | 16.05.2007 | ||
NL | 16.05.2007 | ||
SI | 16.05.2007 | ||
BG | 16.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | DK | 16.05.2007 | |
FI | 16.05.2007 | ||
SI | 16.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/07] | FI | 16.05.2007 | |
SI | 16.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | FI | 16.05.2007 | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPH10183687 ; | [A]US3639748 (PEARSON CHARLES J, et al) [A] 1-6* figure - *; | [Y]US4213507 (HORRER ERWIN [DE], et al) [Y] 1-6 * figures 1-4 *; | [A]US4580811 (WYKHUIS LLOYD A [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * figure - * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981031), vol. 1998, no. 12, & JP10183687 A 19980714 (KANZAKI KOKYUKOKI MFG CO LTD) [Y] 1-6 * abstract * |