EP1575350 - AUTOMATED HITCHING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.02.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.03.2010 [2010/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agco SA Avenue Blaise Pascal 60026 Beauvais / FR | [2005/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RATEAU, Andre 15, rue des Ormeaux F-60408 Franscastel / FR | [2005/38] | Representative(s) | Morrall, Roger, et al AGCO Limited Abbey Park Stoneleigh Kenilworth CV8 2TQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | Morrall, Roger, et al AGCO Limited Abbey Park Stoneleigh Kenilworth CV8 2TQ / GB | ||
Former [2005/38] | Morrall, Roger AGCO Limited, P.O. Box 62, Banner Lane Coventry CV4 9GF / GB | Application number, filing date | 03789366.6 | 19.12.2003 | [2005/38] | WO2003EP14667 | Priority number, date | GB20020029570 | 19.12.2002 Original published format: GB 0229570 | GB20030018264 | 05.08.2003 Original published format: GB 0318264 | FR20030014899 | 18.12.2003 Original published format: FR 0314899 | [2005/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004056168 | Date: | 08.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1575350 | Date: | 21.09.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1575350 | Date: | 15.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A01B59/06, B62D49/06 | [2005/38] | CPC: |
B62D49/02 (EP);
A01B59/068 (EP);
B62D49/065 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2006/15] |
Former [2005/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHES KUPPLUNGSSYSTEM | [2005/38] | English: | AUTOMATED HITCHING SYSTEM | [2005/38] | French: | SYSTEME D'ATTELAGE AUTOMATISE | [2005/38] | Entry into regional phase | 19.07.2005 | National basic fee paid | 19.07.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.07.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/38] | 08.12.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]US4176727 (PERIN PHILIPPE) [AD] 1,9,10,12,13,27 * column 3, line 22 - line 51; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US6321851 (WEISS HEINZ ET AL) [A] 1,12,27 * column 4, line 20 - line 30; figure - *; | [A]US4340240 (ANDERSON ERNEST L) [A] 12,31,32 * column 2, line 31 - line 40; figure 1 *; | [A]US4216975 (SCHAFER RICHARD A) [A] 12,31,32 * column 3, line 56 - line 59; figures 1-3 * |