EP1682410 - DEVICE AND MACHINE FOR PACKAGING DIFFERENT OBJECTS, IN PARTICULAR BOUQUETS OR POTS OF FLOWERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.10.2007 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.11.2007 [2007/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rangeard, Patrick 13 bis rue des Romains F-85700 Pouzauges / FR | [2006/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2006/30] | Representative(s) | Larcher, Dominique Cabinet Vidon 16 B, rue Jouanet B.P. 90333 Technopole Atalante 35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/30] | Larcher, Dominique Cabinet Vidon, 16 B, rue Jouanet, B.P. 90333 35703 Rennes Cédex 7 / FR | Application number, filing date | 03789509.1 | 07.11.2003 | [2006/30] | WO2003FR03498 | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005054057 | Date: | 16.06.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1682410 | Date: | 26.07.2006 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B65B25/02, B65B47/10, B65B47/06 | [2006/30] | CPC: |
B65B25/02 (EP);
B65B47/06 (EP);
B65B47/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND ANLAGE ZUM VERPACKEN VON VERSCHIEDENEN GEGENSTÄNDEN, INSBESONDERE BLUMENSTRÄUSSEN ODER -TÖPFEN. | [2006/30] | English: | DEVICE AND MACHINE FOR PACKAGING DIFFERENT OBJECTS, IN PARTICULAR BOUQUETS OR POTS OF FLOWERS | [2006/30] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET MACHINE POUR EMBALLER DES OBJETS DIVERS, EN PARTICULIER DES BOUQUETS OU DES POTS DE FLEURS | [2006/30] | Entry into regional phase | 01.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 01.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/30] | 11.01.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/46] | 25.06.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2007/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5661952 (STRAETER JOSEPH G ET AL) [A] 1,5,7 * column 17, line 15 - column 19, line 37; figure - *; | [A]US5720151 (WEDER DONALD E) [A] 1,2 * column 7, line 29 - column 8, line 61 * * column 13, line 21 - column 16, line 58; figure - *; | [A]US5611192 (WEDER DONALD E) [A] 1 * column 15, line 16 - column 18, line 35; figure - *; | [A]US5628164 (WEDER DONALD E ET AL) [A] 5 * column 5, line 10 - column 6, line 12; figure -; claim - *; | [A]US5765306 (DUNN JACK R E ET AL) [A] 7 * column 13, line 62 - column 17, line 60; figure - * |