EP1574010 - INTER-PROXY COMMUNICATION PROTOCOL FOR MOBILE IP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.12.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cisco Technology, Inc. 170 West Tasman Drive San Jose, CA 95134-1706 / US | [2005/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Huizhao 6420 El Paseo Drive San Jose, CA 95120 / US | [2005/37] | Representative(s) | Kazi, Ilya Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/06] | Kazi, Ilya Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | ||
Former [2005/37] | Kazi, Ilya Mathys & Squire 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 03790336.6 | 03.12.2003 | [2005/37] | WO2003US38568 | Priority number, date | US20020321080 | 16.12.2002 Original published format: US 321080 | [2005/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004062230 | Date: | 22.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1574010 | Date: | 14.09.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1574010 | Date: | 08.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06 | [2005/37] | CPC: |
H04L61/5007 (EP,US);
H04W60/00 (EP,US);
H04W36/0019 (EP,US);
H04W88/182 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/37] | Title | German: | INTER PROXY KOMMUNIKATIONSPROTOKOLL FÜR MOBILE IP | [2005/37] | English: | INTER-PROXY COMMUNICATION PROTOCOL FOR MOBILE IP | [2005/37] | French: | PROTOCOLE DE COMMUNICATION INTER-MANDATAIRES POUR IP MOBILE | [2005/37] | Entry into regional phase | 20.06.2005 | National basic fee paid | 20.06.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.06.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.07.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.06.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/37] | 12.08.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 07.12.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.08.2011 | Opposition(s) | 09.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.12.2003 | AT | 08.02.2012 | BE | 08.02.2012 | CY | 08.02.2012 | CZ | 08.02.2012 | DK | 08.02.2012 | EE | 08.02.2012 | FI | 08.02.2012 | IT | 08.02.2012 | NL | 08.02.2012 | RO | 08.02.2012 | SE | 08.02.2012 | SI | 08.02.2012 | SK | 08.02.2012 | TR | 08.02.2012 | BG | 08.05.2012 | GR | 09.05.2012 | ES | 19.05.2012 | PT | 08.06.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 08.02.2012 | |
BE | 08.02.2012 | ||
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
IT | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
TR | 08.02.2012 | ||
BG | 08.05.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
ES | 19.05.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 08.02.2012 | |
BE | 08.02.2012 | ||
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
IT | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
BG | 08.05.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
ES | 19.05.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 08.02.2012 | |
BE | 08.02.2012 | ||
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
IT | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
ES | 19.05.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 08.02.2012 | |
BE | 08.02.2012 | ||
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
IT | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 08.02.2012 | |
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
IT | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
SK | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 08.02.2012 | |
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2012 | ||
DK | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
RO | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
SI | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 08.02.2012 | |
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
EE | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
SE | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BE | 08.02.2012 | |
CY | 08.02.2012 | ||
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 08.02.2012 | |
FI | 08.02.2012 | ||
NL | 08.02.2012 | ||
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
PT | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | NL | 08.02.2012 | |
GR | 09.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | NL | 08.02.2012 | Cited in | International search | [YA]EP0924913 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]EP1124396 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]); |