EP1532689 - NON-VOLATILE SEMICONDUCTOR MEMORY ELEMENT AND CORRESPONDING PRODUCTION AND OPERATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.01.2011 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.02.2011 [2011/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG Am Campeon 1-12 85579 Neubiberg / DE | [2009/46] |
Former [2005/21] | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81669 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHULER, Franz Riesengebirgsstr. 42 85586 Poing / DE | 02 /
TEMPEL, Georg Königsbrücker Str. 180 01099 Dresden / DE | [2006/51] |
Former [2005/21] | 01 /
SCHULER, Franz Ludwig-Jahn-Str. 4 01109 Dresden / DE | ||
02 /
TEMPEL, Georg Königsbrücker Str. 180 01099 Dresden / DE | Representative(s) | Kindermann, Peter, et al Patentanwälte Kindermann Postfach 10 02 34 85593 Baldham / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/21] | Kindermann, Peter, Dipl.-Ing., et al Kindermann Patentanwälte Postfach 1330 85627 Grasbrunn / DE | Application number, filing date | 03790703.7 | 08.08.2003 | [2005/21] | WO2003DE02678 | Priority number, date | DE2002138784 | 23.08.2002 Original published format: DE 10238784 | [2005/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004021448 | Date: | 11.03.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1532689 | Date: | 25.05.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.03.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1532689 | Date: | 17.03.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/792, H01L21/336, G11C11/56 | [2005/21] | CPC: |
H01L29/66833 (EP,KR,US);
G11C16/0475 (EP,KR,US);
H01L29/40117 (EP,US);
H01L29/7923 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2005/50] |
Former [2005/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | NICHTFLÜCHTIGES HALBLEITERSPEICHERELEMENT SOWIE ZUGEHÖRIGES HERSTELLUNGS- UND ANSTEUERVERFAHREN | [2005/21] | English: | NON-VOLATILE SEMICONDUCTOR MEMORY ELEMENT AND CORRESPONDING PRODUCTION AND OPERATION METHOD | [2005/21] | French: | ELEMENT SEMI-CONDUCTEUR DE MEMOIRE NON VOLATILE ET PROCEDE DE REALISATION ET PROCEDE DE COMMANDE CORRESPONDANTS | [2005/21] | Entry into regional phase | 31.01.2005 | National basic fee paid | 31.01.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.01.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.03.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 31.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/21] | 18.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 23.09.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3731163 (SHUSKUS A) [A] 5* column A *; | [X]EP0543703 (SGS THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS [FR]) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5654568 (NAKAO HIRONOBU [JP]) [A] 1 * column W *; | [A]WO0117030 (MACRONIX AMERICA INC [US]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]US6249022 (LIN CHIH-HUNG [TW], et al) [A] 1-5 * column W *; | [A]US6335554 (YOSHIKAWA KUNIYOSHI [JP]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [DA]US6366500 (OGURA SEIKI [US], et al) [DA] 1-5 * column W *; | [A]US6388293 (OGURA SEIKI O [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * column W *; | [A]US2002105023 (KUO TUNG CHEN [TW], et al) [A] 1-5 * column W * |