EP1570120 - SPUNBONDED NONWOVEN MADE OF ENDLESS FIBERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 09.11.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state New state(s): BG, ES, HU, LU, SE | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fiberweb Corovin GmbH Woltorfer Strasse 124 31224 Peine / DE | [2007/09] |
Former [2005/36] | For all designated states Corovin GmbH Woltorfer Strasse 124 31224 Peine / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SODEMANN, Ralf Eulenring 42 31224 Peine / DE | 02 /
VOGES, Michael Am Suedhang 11 64739 Hoechst / DE | [2005/36] | Representative(s) | Maxton Langmaack & Partner Postfach 51 08 06 50944 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/36] | Maxton Langmaack & Partner Patentanwälte, Postfach 51 08 06 50944 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 03790829.0 | 29.07.2003 | [2005/36] | WO2003EP08336 | Priority number, date | DE2002140191 | 28.08.2002 Original published format: DE 10240191 | [2005/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004020722 | Date: | 11.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/11] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1570120 | Date: | 07.09.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.03.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1570120 | Date: | 02.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | D04H1/00 | [2005/36] | CPC: |
B32B5/02 (EP,US);
B32B5/26 (US);
B32B5/022 (US);
D01F11/04 (EP,US);
D04H1/56 (EP,US);
D04H13/00 (US);
D04H3/11 (EP);
D04H3/16 (EP,US);
B32B2555/02 (US);
Y10T428/249936 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249939 (EP,US);
Y10T442/614 (EP,US);
Y10T442/637 (EP,US);
Y10T442/659 (EP,US);
Y10T442/66 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPINNVLIES AUS ENDLOSEN FASERN | [2005/36] | English: | SPUNBONDED NONWOVEN MADE OF ENDLESS FIBERS | [2005/36] | French: | NON-TISSE FILE-LIE EN FIBRES SANS FIN | [2005/36] | Entry into regional phase | 17.02.2005 | National basic fee paid | 17.02.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.02.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.03.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.02.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/36] | 05.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
02.06.2010
16.06.2010
ADMISSIBLE NANOVAL GmbH & Co. KG Kienhorststrasse 61-65 13403 Berlin / DE Opponent's representative Butenschön, Antje Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Joachimstaler Strasse 10-12 10719 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/29] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
02.06.2010
16.06.2010
ADMISSIBLE NANOVAL GmbH & Co. KG Kienhorststrasse 61-65 13403 Berlin / DE Opponent's representative Butenschön, Antje Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Joachimstaler Strasse 10-12 10719 Berlin / DE | 08.07.2010 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 09.11.2010 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 02.07.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.07.2012 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2012/50] | 24.07.2012 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 24.07.2012 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.09.2009 | BE | 02.09.2009 | BG | 02.09.2009 | CY | 02.09.2009 | DK | 02.09.2009 | EE | 02.09.2009 | FI | 02.09.2009 | RO | 02.09.2009 | SI | 02.09.2009 | SK | 02.09.2009 | GR | 03.12.2009 | PT | 04.01.2010 | HU | 03.03.2010 | GB | 29.07.2010 | IE | 29.07.2010 | IT | 29.07.2010 | LU | 29.07.2010 | ES | 30.07.2010 | SE | 30.07.2010 | CH | 31.07.2010 | LI | 31.07.2010 | MC | 31.07.2010 | NL | 01.02.2011 | [2015/21] |
Former [2011/35] | AT | 02.09.2009 | |
BE | 02.09.2009 | ||
CY | 02.09.2009 | ||
DK | 02.09.2009 | ||
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
RO | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
SK | 02.09.2009 | ||
GR | 03.12.2009 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
GB | 29.07.2010 | ||
IE | 29.07.2010 | ||
IT | 29.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
NL | 01.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/31] | AT | 02.09.2009 | |
BE | 02.09.2009 | ||
CY | 02.09.2009 | ||
DK | 02.09.2009 | ||
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
RO | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
SK | 02.09.2009 | ||
GR | 03.12.2009 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
IT | 29.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
NL | 01.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/24] | AT | 02.09.2009 | |
BE | 02.09.2009 | ||
CY | 02.09.2009 | ||
DK | 02.09.2009 | ||
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
RO | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
SK | 02.09.2009 | ||
GR | 03.12.2009 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
NL | 01.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/20] | AT | 02.09.2009 | |
BE | 02.09.2009 | ||
CY | 02.09.2009 | ||
DK | 02.09.2009 | ||
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
RO | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
SK | 02.09.2009 | ||
GR | 03.12.2009 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/11] | AT | 02.09.2009 | |
BE | 02.09.2009 | ||
CY | 02.09.2009 | ||
DK | 02.09.2009 | ||
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
RO | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
SK | 02.09.2009 | ||
GR | 03.12.2009 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/49] | AT | 02.09.2009 | |
BE | 02.09.2009 | ||
CY | 02.09.2009 | ||
DK | 02.09.2009 | ||
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
RO | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
SK | 02.09.2009 | ||
GR | 03.12.2009 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 02.09.2009 | |
BE | 02.09.2009 | ||
CY | 02.09.2009 | ||
DK | 02.09.2009 | ||
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
RO | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
SK | 02.09.2009 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 02.09.2009 | |
BE | 02.09.2009 | ||
CY | 02.09.2009 | ||
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
RO | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
SK | 02.09.2009 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/28] | BE | 02.09.2009 | |
CY | 02.09.2009 | ||
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
RO | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
SK | 02.09.2009 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/23] | CY | 02.09.2009 | |
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
RO | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
SK | 02.09.2009 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/22] | CY | 02.09.2009 | |
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
RO | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/20] | CY | 02.09.2009 | |
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/16] | CY | 02.09.2009 | |
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | FI | 02.09.2009 | |
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | FI | 02.09.2009 | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2000017558 ; | [X]US4239720 (GERLACH KLAUS [DE], et al) [X] 8-12 * column 9, line 24 - line 32 *; | [X]US4472329 (MUSCHELKNAUTZ EDGAR [DE], et al) [X] 2,21-25 * column 2, line 59 - line 63; figures 1-7 * * column 3, line 30 - line 40 *; | [A]US5011698 (ANTOON JR MITCHELL K [US], et al) [A] 26-29 * column 4, line 44 - column 5, line 2 *; | [DA]US5075161 (NYSSEN PETER R [DE], et al) [DA] 1 * column 1, line 24 - line 47; figures 1,2; claims 1-8 *; | [A]US5260003 (NYSSEN PETER R [DE], et al) [A] 1 * column 1, line 63 - column 2, line 57; figure 1 *; | [AD]EP0724029 (GERKING LUEDER DR ING [DE]) [AD] 1 * figures 1-3; example 1 *; | [X]US5573717 (PEIFFER HERBERT [DE], et al) [X] 28 * column 2, line 50 - column 3, line 55 *; | [A]US5672415 (SAWYER LAWRENCE HOWELL [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 45 - column 3, line 17; figure 1 *; | [A]US5733822 (GESSNER SCOTT L [US], et al) [A] 2,21,22 * column 2, line 64 - line 66 * * column 3, line 37 - line 48 *; | [X]US5759926 (PIKE RICHARD DANIEL [US], et al) [X] 13-19 * column 11, line 7 - line 30 * * column 13, line 56 - line 64 *; | [X]US5783503 (GILLESPIE JAY DARRELL [US], et al) [X] 8-11,13-19 * column 2, line 16 - column 3, line 56 * * column 7, line 16 - line 26 *; | [X]EP0854164 (LEER KONINKLIJKE EMBALLAGE [NL]) [X] 26,28 * column 1, line 29 - column 2, line 20; figure 1 *; | [X]WO9919131 (HILLS INC [US], et al) [X] 8-11 * page 3, line 21 - line 29 *; | [A]EP0915192 (SUOMINEN OY J W [FI]) [A] 2,21,22 * paragraphs [0007] , [0013] *; | [X]US5935883 (PIKE RICHARD DANIEL [US]) [X] 8-11,13-19 * column 2, line 11 - line 43 *; | [X]US5965084 (NISHIJIMA MASARU [JP]) [X] 8-11,16 * column 2, line 17 - line 43 *; | [A]US6106913 (SCARDINO FRANK L [US], et al) [A] 1 * figure 1; claims 1-12 *; | [A]WO0100909 (GERKING LUEDER [DE]) [A] 1,23-25 * page 3, line 27 - page 4, line 10; figures 1,2 *; | [X]DE19962357 (FREUDENBERG CARL FA [DE]) [X] 3,4,7 * column 1, line 25 - line 55 *; | [X]DE10065859 (GERKING LUEDER [DE]) [X] 23-25 * paragraphs [0005] - [0007] - [0009]; figure 1 *; | [PX]WO02075028 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [PX] 3,6,8-11 * page 9, line 11 - line 14 * * page 5, lines 1-7 *; | [PX]WO03043809 (POLYMER GROUP INC [US]) [PX] 1 * page 3, line 9 - page 4, line 25 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000831), vol. 2000, no. 04, & JP2000017558 A 20000118 (UNITIKA LTD) [X] 20 * abstract * |