EP1550204 - MULTIPLE BAND LOCAL OSCILLATOR FREQUENCY GENERATION CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.05.2007 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2006/26] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2005/27] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAHN, Wilhelm, S. 1109 McKay Drive, M/S-41SJ San Jose, CA 95131 / US | 02 /
RIOU, Emmanuel 1109 McKay Drive, M/S-41SJ San Jose, CA 95131 / US | [2005/27] | Representative(s) | Eleveld, Koop Jan Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2005/27] | Eleveld, Koop Jan Philips Intellectual Property & Standards, P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 03791140.1 | 22.08.2003 | [2005/27] | WO2003IB03805 | Priority number, date | US20020229598 | 27.08.2002 Original published format: US 229598 | [2005/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004021572 | Date: | 11.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/11] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1550204 | Date: | 06.07.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.03.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1550204 | Date: | 28.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H03B21/02 | [2005/27] | CPC: |
H03B21/025 (EP,US);
H03B21/02 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/27] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEHRBAND-EMPFANGSOSZILLATORFREQUENZERZEUGUNGSSCHALTUNG | [2005/27] | English: | MULTIPLE BAND LOCAL OSCILLATOR FREQUENCY GENERATION CIRCUIT | [2005/27] | French: | CIRCUIT GENERATEUR DE FREQUENCES A OSCILLATEUR LOCAL MULTIBANDE | [2005/27] | Entry into regional phase | 29.03.2005 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/27] | 30.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 08.05.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.06.2006 | BE | 28.06.2006 | CH | 28.06.2006 | CY | 28.06.2006 | CZ | 28.06.2006 | EE | 28.06.2006 | FI | 28.06.2006 | IT | 28.06.2006 | LI | 28.06.2006 | NL | 28.06.2006 | SI | 28.06.2006 | SK | 28.06.2006 | TR | 28.06.2006 | IE | 22.08.2006 | LU | 22.08.2006 | MC | 31.08.2006 | BG | 28.09.2006 | DK | 28.09.2006 | SE | 28.09.2006 | GR | 29.09.2006 | ES | 09.10.2006 | PT | 28.11.2006 | HU | 29.12.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 28.06.2006 | |
BE | 28.06.2006 | ||
CH | 28.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 28.06.2006 | ||
EE | 28.06.2006 | ||
FI | 28.06.2006 | ||
IT | 28.06.2006 | ||
LI | 28.06.2006 | ||
NL | 28.06.2006 | ||
SI | 28.06.2006 | ||
SK | 28.06.2006 | ||
TR | 28.06.2006 | ||
IE | 22.08.2006 | ||
LU | 22.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
BG | 28.09.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
GR | 29.09.2006 | ||
ES | 09.10.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
HU | 29.12.2006 | ||
Former [2008/32] | AT | 28.06.2006 | |
BE | 28.06.2006 | ||
CH | 28.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 28.06.2006 | ||
EE | 28.06.2006 | ||
FI | 28.06.2006 | ||
IT | 28.06.2006 | ||
LI | 28.06.2006 | ||
NL | 28.06.2006 | ||
SI | 28.06.2006 | ||
SK | 28.06.2006 | ||
IE | 22.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
BG | 28.09.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
GR | 29.09.2006 | ||
ES | 09.10.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
HU | 29.12.2006 | ||
Former [2008/31] | AT | 28.06.2006 | |
BE | 28.06.2006 | ||
CH | 28.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 28.06.2006 | ||
EE | 28.06.2006 | ||
FI | 28.06.2006 | ||
IT | 28.06.2006 | ||
LI | 28.06.2006 | ||
NL | 28.06.2006 | ||
SI | 28.06.2006 | ||
SK | 28.06.2006 | ||
IE | 22.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
BG | 28.09.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
GR | 29.09.2006 | ||
ES | 09.10.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 28.06.2006 | |
BE | 28.06.2006 | ||
CH | 28.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 28.06.2006 | ||
EE | 28.06.2006 | ||
FI | 28.06.2006 | ||
IT | 28.06.2006 | ||
LI | 28.06.2006 | ||
NL | 28.06.2006 | ||
SI | 28.06.2006 | ||
SK | 28.06.2006 | ||
IE | 22.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
GR | 29.09.2006 | ||
ES | 09.10.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 28.06.2006 | |
BE | 28.06.2006 | ||
CH | 28.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 28.06.2006 | ||
FI | 28.06.2006 | ||
IT | 28.06.2006 | ||
LI | 28.06.2006 | ||
NL | 28.06.2006 | ||
SI | 28.06.2006 | ||
SK | 28.06.2006 | ||
IE | 22.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
GR | 29.09.2006 | ||
ES | 09.10.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/42] | AT | 28.06.2006 | |
BE | 28.06.2006 | ||
CH | 28.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 28.06.2006 | ||
FI | 28.06.2006 | ||
IT | 28.06.2006 | ||
LI | 28.06.2006 | ||
NL | 28.06.2006 | ||
SI | 28.06.2006 | ||
SK | 28.06.2006 | ||
IE | 22.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
ES | 09.10.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/41] | AT | 28.06.2006 | |
BE | 28.06.2006 | ||
CH | 28.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 28.06.2006 | ||
FI | 28.06.2006 | ||
IT | 28.06.2006 | ||
LI | 28.06.2006 | ||
NL | 28.06.2006 | ||
SI | 28.06.2006 | ||
SK | 28.06.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
ES | 09.10.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | AT | 28.06.2006 | |
BE | 28.06.2006 | ||
CH | 28.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 28.06.2006 | ||
FI | 28.06.2006 | ||
LI | 28.06.2006 | ||
NL | 28.06.2006 | ||
SI | 28.06.2006 | ||
SK | 28.06.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
DK | 28.09.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
ES | 09.10.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 28.06.2006 | |
BE | 28.06.2006 | ||
CH | 28.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 28.06.2006 | ||
FI | 28.06.2006 | ||
LI | 28.06.2006 | ||
NL | 28.06.2006 | ||
SI | 28.06.2006 | ||
SK | 28.06.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
ES | 09.10.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/14] | AT | 28.06.2006 | |
BE | 28.06.2006 | ||
CH | 28.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 28.06.2006 | ||
FI | 28.06.2006 | ||
LI | 28.06.2006 | ||
SI | 28.06.2006 | ||
SK | 28.06.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
ES | 09.10.2006 | ||
PT | 28.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | AT | 28.06.2006 | |
FI | 28.06.2006 | ||
SI | 28.06.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/01] | AT | 28.06.2006 | |
FI | 28.06.2006 | ||
SE | 28.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | SE | 28.09.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3140447 (OLBRYCH JOHN E, et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US3320547 (ALBERT STANDFORD RICHARD THOMA, et al) [A] 1-10* the whole document * |