Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2003262785 | Global Dossier | 19.03.2004 | A8 | AU2003262785 | 19.03.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US23197702 | 30.08.2002 | US0326287 | 21.08.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1554441 | Global Dossier | 20.07.2005 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US23197702 | 30.08.2002 | US0326287 | 21.08.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2495973 | 11.03.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US23197702 | 30.08.2002 | US0326287 | 21.08.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MXPA05002333 | 08.06.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US23197702 | 30.08.2002 | US0326287 | 21.08.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2004020753 | Global Dossier | 21.05.2004 | A3 | WO2004020753 | 11.03.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US23197702 | 30.08.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20050035899 | Global Dossier | 19.04.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US23197702 | 30.08.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1685118 | 19.10.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US23197702 | 30.08.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2004040080 | 04.03.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US23197702 | 30.08.2002 |