EP1534659 - TRANSESTERIFICATION AND ESTERIFICATION OF FATTY ACIDS AND TRIGLYCERIDES BY DISPERSION AND DISPERSION METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF FATTY ACID METHYLESTERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.01.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 08.12.2010 [2010/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gapes, Richard Mariensteig 15/2/4 1133 Wien / AT | For all designated states Baumgartner, Hans Rudolf Nurejev Promenade 9-21 1220 Wien / AT | [2005/39] |
Former [2005/22] | For all designated states Gapes, Richard Mariensteig 15/2/4 1133 Wien / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2005/22] | Representative(s) | SONN Patentanwälte GmbH & Co KG Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/39] | Sonn & Partner Patentanwälte Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | ||
Former [2005/25] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2005/22] | Patentanwälte BARGER, PISO & PARTNER Mahlerstrasse 9 Postfach 96 1015 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 03792015.4 | 25.08.2003 | [2005/22] | WO2003AT00242 | Priority number, date | AT20020001262 | 23.08.2002 Original published format: AT 12622002 | [2005/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004018405 | Date: | 04.03.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1534659 | Date: | 01.06.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1534659 | Date: | 12.03.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C07C67/03, C11C3/00 | [2005/22] | CPC: |
C11C3/003 (EP,US);
C07C67/03 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C67/03, C07C69/24 (US,EP);
C07C67/03, C07C69/52 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | UM- UND VERESTERUNG VON FETTS UREN UND TRIGLYCERIDEN DURCH DISPERGIEREN UND DISPERSIONSVERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON FETTSÄUREMETHYLESTERN | [2005/22] | English: | TRANSESTERIFICATION AND ESTERIFICATION OF FATTY ACIDS AND TRIGLYCERIDES BY DISPERSION AND DISPERSION METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF FATTY ACID METHYLESTERS | [2005/22] | French: | TRANSESTERIFICATION ET ESTERIFICATION D'ACIDES GRAS ET DE TRIGLYCERIDES PAR DISPERSION ET PROCEDE DE DISPERSION POUR LA PRODUCTION DE METHYLESTERS D'ACIDES GRAS | [2005/22] | Entry into regional phase | 23.03.2005 | National basic fee paid | 23.03.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.03.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.03.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/22] | 20.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 07.04.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 06.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.08.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 13.08.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/08] | Request for further processing for: | 06.06.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 06.06.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.06.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 12.03.2008 | CZ | 12.03.2008 | DK | 12.03.2008 | EE | 12.03.2008 | FI | 12.03.2008 | IT | 12.03.2008 | NL | 12.03.2008 | RO | 12.03.2008 | SI | 12.03.2008 | SK | 12.03.2008 | TR | 12.03.2008 | BG | 12.06.2008 | SE | 12.06.2008 | GR | 13.06.2008 | ES | 23.06.2008 | LU | 25.08.2008 | BE | 31.08.2008 | MC | 31.08.2008 | HU | 13.09.2008 | [2010/49] |
Former [2010/37] | CY | 12.03.2008 | |
CZ | 12.03.2008 | ||
DK | 12.03.2008 | ||
EE | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
IT | 12.03.2008 | ||
NL | 12.03.2008 | ||
RO | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SK | 12.03.2008 | ||
TR | 12.03.2008 | ||
BG | 12.06.2008 | ||
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
ES | 23.06.2008 | ||
LU | 25.08.2008 | ||
BE | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
HU | 13.09.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | CY | 12.03.2008 | |
CZ | 12.03.2008 | ||
DK | 12.03.2008 | ||
EE | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
IT | 12.03.2008 | ||
NL | 12.03.2008 | ||
RO | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SK | 12.03.2008 | ||
BG | 12.06.2008 | ||
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
ES | 23.06.2008 | ||
LU | 25.08.2008 | ||
BE | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
HU | 13.09.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | CY | 12.03.2008 | |
CZ | 12.03.2008 | ||
DK | 12.03.2008 | ||
EE | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
IT | 12.03.2008 | ||
NL | 12.03.2008 | ||
RO | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SK | 12.03.2008 | ||
BG | 12.06.2008 | ||
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
ES | 23.06.2008 | ||
LU | 25.08.2008 | ||
BE | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/43] | CY | 12.03.2008 | |
CZ | 12.03.2008 | ||
DK | 12.03.2008 | ||
EE | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
IT | 12.03.2008 | ||
NL | 12.03.2008 | ||
RO | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SK | 12.03.2008 | ||
BG | 12.06.2008 | ||
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
ES | 23.06.2008 | ||
BE | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/40] | CZ | 12.03.2008 | |
DK | 12.03.2008 | ||
EE | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
IT | 12.03.2008 | ||
NL | 12.03.2008 | ||
RO | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SK | 12.03.2008 | ||
BG | 12.06.2008 | ||
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
ES | 23.06.2008 | ||
BE | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/32] | CZ | 12.03.2008 | |
DK | 12.03.2008 | ||
EE | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
NL | 12.03.2008 | ||
RO | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SK | 12.03.2008 | ||
BG | 12.06.2008 | ||
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
ES | 23.06.2008 | ||
BE | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | CZ | 12.03.2008 | |
DK | 12.03.2008 | ||
EE | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
NL | 12.03.2008 | ||
RO | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SK | 12.03.2008 | ||
BG | 12.06.2008 | ||
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
ES | 23.06.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | CZ | 12.03.2008 | |
DK | 12.03.2008 | ||
EE | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
NL | 12.03.2008 | ||
RO | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SK | 12.03.2008 | ||
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
ES | 23.06.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/18] | CZ | 12.03.2008 | |
DK | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
NL | 12.03.2008 | ||
RO | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SK | 12.03.2008 | ||
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
ES | 23.06.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | CZ | 12.03.2008 | |
DK | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
NL | 12.03.2008 | ||
RO | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SK | 12.03.2008 | ||
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
ES | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/01] | CZ | 12.03.2008 | |
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
NL | 12.03.2008 | ||
RO | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SK | 12.03.2008 | ||
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
ES | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/50] | CZ | 12.03.2008 | |
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
RO | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SK | 12.03.2008 | ||
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
ES | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | FI | 12.03.2008 | |
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
ES | 23.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | FI | 12.03.2008 | |
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | FI | 12.03.2008 | Cited in | International search | [XD]WO9926913 (ENERGEA HANDELSGMBH [AT], et al) [XD] 1,2,5 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * figures 1,2 * * page 3, paragraph 6 - page 4, paragraph 3 * * page 5, paragraph 4 * * page 19 - page 20; claims 1-9 *; | [L] - Römpps Chemie-Lexikon, STUTTGART - GERMANY, NEUMÜLLER, OTTO-ALBRECHT, (1981), XP002266102 [L] 1-5 * Bd.2, 8.Aufl.; page 986 - page 987 * * page 1127 - page 1130 * |