EP1531937 - PIPETTING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A PIPETTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.07.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.08.2011 [2011/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hirschmann Laborgeräte GmbH & Co. KG Hauptstrasse 15 74246 Eberstadt / DE | [2006/20] |
Former [2005/21] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80636 München / DE | ||
For all designated states Hirschmann Laborgeräte GmbH & Co. KG Hauptstrasse 7-15 74246 Eberstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RICHTER, Martin Mondstrasse 9 81543 München / DE | 02 /
WACKERLE, Martin Grafinger Strasse 20 83565 Tegernau / DE | 03 /
BIGUS, Hans-Jürgen Neuffenstrasse 11 72124 Pliezhausen / DE | 04 /
DEBUSMANN, Ralph Nimmerfallstrasse 17 81245 München / DE | [2007/11] |
Former [2005/21] | 01 /
RICHTER, Martin Brahmsstrasse 6 81677 München / DE | ||
02 /
WACKERLE, Martin Grafinger Strasse 20 83565 Tegernau / DE | |||
03 /
BIGUS, Hans-Jürgen Neuffenstrasse 11 72124 Pliezhausen / DE | |||
04 /
DEBUSMANN, Ralph Nimmerfallstrasse 17 81245 München / DE | Representative(s) | Lenz, Steffen LICHTI - Patentanwälte Postfach 41 07 60 76207 Karlsruhe / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/10] | Lenz, Steffen Patentanwälte Lichti, Lempert, Lasch & Lenz Postfach 41 07 60 76207 Karlsruhe / DE | ||
Former [2005/21] | Stöckeler, Ferdinand, Dipl.-Ing., et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03792160.8 | 17.06.2003 | [2005/21] | WO2003EP06389 | Priority number, date | DE2002138564 | 22.08.2002 Original published format: DE 10238564 | [2005/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004018103 | Date: | 04.03.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1531937 | Date: | 25.05.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B01L3/02, F04B43/04 | [2005/21] | CPC: |
F04B43/046 (EP,US);
B01L3/02 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0681 (EP,US);
B01L2400/0439 (EP,US);
B01L2400/0622 (EP,US);
B01L2400/0638 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FI, FR, LI [2005/50] |
Former [2005/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PIPETIEREINRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINER PIPETIEREINRICHTUNG | [2005/21] | English: | PIPETTING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A PIPETTING DEVICE | [2005/21] | French: | SYSTEME DE PIPETAGE ET PROCEDE POUR EXPLOITER UN SYSTEME DE PIPETAGE | [2005/21] | Entry into regional phase | 17.02.2005 | National basic fee paid | 17.02.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.02.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.02.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/21] | 10.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.03.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0949418 (SEIKO INSTR INC [JP]) [X] 1-6,9-12 * paragraphs [0010] - [0012] - [0015] - [0018] * * paragraphs [0069] - [0071] *; | [X]US5611676 (OOUMI TAKEHARU [JP], et al) [X] 1-6,9-12 * column 1, line 33 - column 1, line 62 * * column 2, line 19 - column 2, line 61 * * column 3, line 8 - column 3, line 28 *; | [X]JP2001193657 (SEIKO INSTR INC) [X] 1-6,9-12 * the whole document *; | [PX]US6481984 (SHINOHARA JUN [JP], et al) [PX] 1-6,9-12 * column 1 - column 2 * * example 7 * * figures 7-13 *; | [A]US2001055812 (MIAN ALEC [US], et al) [A] 7 * paragraph [0160]; figure 6 *; | [A]US6280148 (ZENGERLE ROLAND [DE], et al) [A] 1-12 * column 9, line 30 - column 9, line 57; figure 4 *; | [A]EP0993869 (HIRSCHMANN LABORGERAETE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]US5593290 (GREISCH DANNY L [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document * | [A] - ZENGERLE R ET AL, "A bidirectional silicon micropump", SENSORS AND ACTUATORS A, ELSEVIER SEQUOIA S.A., LAUSANNE, CH, (199508), vol. 50, no. 1-2, ISSN 0924-4247, pages 81 - 86, XP004303517 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0924-4247(96)80088-4 |