EP1552965 - RUBBER-REINFORCED STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.06.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.07.2011 [2011/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daicel-Evonik Ltd. 2-18-1, Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8230 / JP | [2009/22] |
Former [2005/28] | For all designated states Daicel-Degussa Ltd. 18-1, Konan 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8230 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IKUTA, Toru 5-6-23, Nishiokamoto Higashinada-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 658-0073 / JP | [2005/28] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/28] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03792624.3 | 04.07.2003 | [2005/28] | WO2003JP08570 | Priority number, date | JP20020204296 | 12.07.2002 Original published format: JP 2002204296 | [2005/28] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004018234 | Date: | 04.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1552965 | Date: | 13.07.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B60C1/00, // (B32B25/08, C08J5:12),(C08L21/00, 101:00) | [2005/28] | CPC: |
B60C1/00 (EP,US);
B60C1/0025 (EP,US);
B60C17/0009 (EP,US);
C08J5/12 (EP,US);
C08L21/00 (EP,US);
Y10T152/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/44] |
Former [2005/28] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KAUTSCHUKVERSTÄRKTE KONSTRUKTION | [2005/28] | English: | RUBBER-REINFORCED STRUCTURE | [2005/28] | French: | STRUCTURE RENFORCEE DE CAOUTCHOUC | [2005/28] | Entry into regional phase | 04.01.2005 | Translation filed | 04.01.2005 | National basic fee paid | 04.01.2005 | Search fee paid | 04.01.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.01.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/28] | 01.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/30] | 11.03.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2010 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH08217923 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD); | [X]JPH07149108 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND); | [X]JPH09216502 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD); | [X]JPH0752605 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD); | [X]JPH0640207 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD); | [X]JPH05169909 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD); | [X]JPH09272314 (BRIDGESTONE CORP); | [X]EP0337279 (HERCULES INC [US]); | [A]JPH1035232 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD); | [AP]WO02055296 (DAICEL DEGUSSA LTD [JP], et al) | [A] - MITSUTERU MUTSUDA ET AL., "Gomu to chokusetsu karyu secchaku dekiru engineering plastic", PLASTICS, (20011101), vol. 52, no. 11, pages 38 - 43, XP002973848 |