EP1528725 - A Retry Communication Control Method and System [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/18] | RE-CHALLENGE COMMUNICATION CONTROL METHOD, SYSTEM THEREOF, PACKET TRANSFER ENABLED/DISABLED DECISION METHOD, PACKET TRANSFER DEVICE, PACKET TRANSFER SYSTEM, PACKET MONITORING METHOD, CALL CONTROL DEVICE, MONITOR DEVICE, AND PROGRAM | ||
[2011/11] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.08.2012 [2012/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON TELEGRAPH AND TELEPHONE CORPORATION 3-1, Otemachi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8116 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/18] | For all designated states Nippon Telegraph and Telephone Corporation 3-1, Otemachi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8116 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOYANAGI, Etsuko NTT Intellectual Property Center 9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-Shi Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | 02 /
MIYAYAMA Satoshi NTT Intellectual Property Center 9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-Shi Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | 03 /
MORITA, Naotaka NTT Intellectual Property Center 9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-Shi Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | 04 /
MORI, Shunsuke NTT Intellectual Property Center 9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-Shi Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | [2011/37] |
Former [2011/32] | 01 /
KOYANAGI, Etsuko NTT Intellectual Property Center 9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome, Musashino-Shi Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | ||
02 /
MIYAYAMA Satoshi NTT Intellectual Property Center 9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome, Musashino-Shi Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | |||
03 /
MORITA, Naotaka NTT Intellectual Property Center 9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome, Musashino-Shi Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | |||
04 /
MORI, Shunsuke NTT Intellectual Property Center 9-11, Midori-cho 3-chome, Musashino-Shi Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | |||
Former [2005/30] | 01 /
KOYANAGI, E., NTT Intellectural Property Center 9-11, Midoricho 3-Chome, Musashino-Shi Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | ||
02 /
MIYAYAMA, S., NTT Intellectural Property Center 9-11, Midoricho 3-Chome, Musashino-Shi Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | |||
03 /
MORITA, N., NTT Intellectural Property Center 9-11, Midoricho 3-Chome, Musashino-Shi Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | |||
04 /
MORI, S., NTT Intellectural Property Center 9-11, Midoricho 3-Chome, Musashino-Shi Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | |||
Former [2005/18] | 01 /
KOYANAGI, E., NTT Intellectural Property Center 9-11, Midoricho 3-Chome, Musashino-Shi Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | ||
02 /
MIYAYAMA, s., NTT Intellectural Property Center 9-11, Midoricho 3-Chome, Musashino-Shi Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | |||
03 /
MORITA, N., NTT Intellectural Property Center 9-11, Midoricho 3-Chome, Musashino-Shi Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | |||
04 /
MORI, s., NTT Intellectural Property Center 9-11, Midoricho 3-Chome, Musashino-Shi Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/37] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/18] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03792642.5 | 30.07.2003 | [2005/18] | WO2003JP09683 | Priority number, date | JP20020222146 | 30.07.2002 Original published format: JP 2002222146 | JP20030175485 | 19.06.2003 Original published format: JP 2003175485 | JP20030176432 | 20.06.2003 Original published format: JP 2003176432 | JP20030176846 | 20.06.2003 Original published format: JP 2003176846 | JP20030176547 | 20.06.2003 Original published format: JP 2003176547 | [2005/18] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004019567 | Date: | 04.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1528725 | Date: | 04.05.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1528725 | Date: | 14.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.03.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/56 | [2005/18] | CPC: |
H04L47/32 (EP,US);
H04L47/10 (US);
H04L47/11 (EP,US);
H04L47/20 (EP,US);
H04L47/215 (EP,US);
H04L47/2408 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/47] |
Former [2005/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur Kommunikationssteuerung mit Neuversuch | [2011/11] | English: | A Retry Communication Control Method and System | [2011/11] | French: | Procédé et système pour le contrôl de communication en relance | [2011/11] |
Former [2005/18] | STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR NEUER KOMMUNIKATIONSVERSUCH, SYSTEM DAFÜR, EIN/AUSSCHALTBARES FÜR PAKETÜBERTRAGUNG ENTSCHEIDUNGSVERFAHREN, PAKETÜBERWACHUNGSVERFAHREN, ANRUFSTEUERUNGSGERÄT, ÜBERWACHUNGSGERÄT UND PROGRAM | ||
Former [2005/18] | RE-CHALLENGE COMMUNICATION CONTROL METHOD, SYSTEM THEREOF, PACKET TRANSFER ENABLED/DISABLED DECISION METHOD, PACKET TRANSFER DEVICE, PACKET TRANSFER SYSTEM, PACKET MONITORING METHOD, CALL CONTROL DEVICE, MONITOR DEVICE, AND PROGRAM | ||
Former [2005/18] | PROCEDE DE COMMANDE DE NOUVELLE TENTATIVE DE COMMUNICATION, SYSTEME A CET EFFET, PROCEDE DE DECISION D'ACTIVATION/DESACTIVATION DE TRANSFERT DE PAQUET, DISPOSITIF DE TRANSFERT DE PAQUET, SYSTEME DE TRANSFERT DE PAQUET, PROCEDE DE SURVEILLANCE DE PAQUET, DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE D'APPEL, DISPOSITIF DE | Entry into regional phase | 18.02.2005 | Translation filed | 18.02.2005 | National basic fee paid | 18.02.2005 | Search fee paid | 18.02.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.02.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.02.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 18.02.2005 | Examination requested [2009/43] | 30.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.06.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 30.06.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.11.2009 | Opposition(s) | 15.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2002190804 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE); | [A]JP2002208939 (ALCATEL CANADA INC); | [A] - ELEK V. ET AL., "Admission control based on end-to-end measurements", INFOCOM 2000. NINETEENTH ANNUAL JOINT CONFERENCE OF THE IEEE COMPUTER AND COMMUNICATIONS SOCIETIES. PROCEEDINGS. IEEE, (20000326), vol. 2, pages 623 - 630, XP001042776 | by applicant | - VIKTORIA ELEK; GUNNAR KARLSSON; ROVERT RONNGREN, "Admission control based on end-to-end measurements", INFOCOM2000, U.S.A., (3281220) |