EP1532825 - LOW-COST HIGH-POWER DIGITAL CORDLESS TELEPHONE ARCHITECTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.08.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.09.2007 [2007/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Atlinks USA, Inc. 10330 N. Meridan Street, INH-340 Indianapolis, IN 46290-1024 / US | [2005/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KECHKAYLO, David, Lee 3816 Constitution Drive Carmel, IN 46032 / US | 02 /
LAI Hung Chi 81441 A Ivy Knoll Lane MARION Indianapolis, IN46250 / US | 03 /
RIEDL, Wilhelm Ernst 872 Garonne Terrace nr. 2D Indianapolis, IN 46250 / US | [2006/52] |
Former [2005/21] | 01 /
KECHKAYLO, David, Lee 3816 Constitution Drive Carmel, IN 46032 / US | ||
02 /
LAI, Hung, Chi 8949 Autumn Wood Drive Indianapolis, IN 46250 / US | |||
03 /
RIEDL, Wilhelm Ernst 872 Garonne Terrace nr. 2D Indianapolis, IN 46250 / US | Representative(s) | Berthier, Karine THOMSON European Patent Operations 46 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/21] | Berthier, Karine THOMSON, European Patent Operations, 46 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 03793144.1 | 20.08.2003 | [2005/21] | WO2003US26016 | Priority number, date | US20020405355P | 22.08.2002 Original published format: US 405355 P | [2005/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004019629 | Date: | 04.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1532825 | Date: | 25.05.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/20 | [2005/21] | CPC: |
H04M1/72502 (EP,US);
H04B1/40 (KR);
H04B1/04 (EP,US);
H04L27/10 (KR);
H04W88/02 (EP,US);
H04M2250/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2005/50] |
Former [2005/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOSTENGÜNSTIGE HOCHLEISTUNGFÄHIGE DIGITALE SCHNURLOSE TELEFON-ARCHITEKTUR | [2005/21] | English: | LOW-COST HIGH-POWER DIGITAL CORDLESS TELEPHONE ARCHITECTURE | [2005/21] | French: | ARCHITECTURE DE TELEPHONE SANS FIL NUMERIQUE ECONOMIQUE A FORTE PUISSANCE | [2005/21] | Entry into regional phase | 11.02.2005 | National basic fee paid | 11.02.2005 | Search fee paid | 11.02.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.02.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/21] | 06.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/39] | 14.05.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2006 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5636264 (SULAVUORI TONI [FI], et al); | [A]US6343217 (BORLAND DAVID J [US]); | [XP]US6633550 (GAERDENFORS KARL HAAKAN TORBJO [SE], et al) |