EP1531714 - METHOD FOR OPERATING A WATER-GUIDING DEVICE AND WATER-GUIDING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.07.2017 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [2015/13] |
Former [2009/23] | For all designated states BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/21] | For all designated states BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Hochstrasse 17 81669 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EIERMANN, Rüdiger Zwergbachstrasse 7 89428 Sygenstein / DE | 02 /
JERG, Helmut Ringental 15 89537 Giengen / DE | 03 /
KIMMICH, Reinhard Ömdwiesenweg 78476 Allensbach / DE | [2005/21] | Application number, filing date | 03793626.7 | 22.07.2003 | [2016/36] | WO2003EP08007 | Priority number, date | DE20021037854 | 19.08.2002 Original published format: DE 10237854 | [2005/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004021853 | Date: | 18.03.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1531714 | Date: | 25.05.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.03.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1531714 | Date: | 07.09.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A47L15/42, D06F39/00, G01N33/18 | [2005/21] | CPC: |
G01N31/005 (EP,US);
A47L15/4297 (EP,US);
D06F34/22 (EP,US);
D06F35/001 (EP,US);
A47L2401/10 (EP,US);
A47L2401/34 (EP,US);
A47L2501/16 (EP,US);
A47L2501/30 (EP,US);
A47L2601/08 (EP,US);
C02F1/78 (EP,US);
C02F2209/21 (EP,US);
C02F2209/23 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/36] |
Former [2005/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | ||
Former [N/P] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINES WASSERFÜHRENDEN GERÄTS UND WASSERFÜHRENDES GERÄT | [2005/21] | English: | METHOD FOR OPERATING A WATER-GUIDING DEVICE AND WATER-GUIDING DEVICE | [2005/21] | French: | PROCEDE POUR FAIRE FONCTIONNER UN APPAREIL AQUIFERE ET APPAREIL AQUIFERE | [2005/21] | Entry into regional phase | 21.03.2005 | National basic fee paid | 21.03.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.03.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.03.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/21] | 25.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 19.07.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.07.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.06.2007 | Opposition(s) | 08.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 31.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 01.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.07.2003 | CY | 07.09.2016 | CZ | 07.09.2016 | DK | 07.09.2016 | EE | 07.09.2016 | ES | 07.09.2016 | FI | 07.09.2016 | IT | 07.09.2016 | MC | 07.09.2016 | NL | 07.09.2016 | RO | 07.09.2016 | SE | 07.09.2016 | SI | 07.09.2016 | SK | 07.09.2016 | TR | 07.09.2016 | BG | 07.12.2016 | GR | 08.12.2016 | PT | 09.01.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 22.07.2003 | |
CY | 07.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
IT | 07.09.2016 | ||
MC | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 22.07.2003 | |
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
IT | 07.09.2016 | ||
MC | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | CZ | 07.09.2016 | |
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
IT | 07.09.2016 | ||
MC | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 07.09.2016 | |
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
IT | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | CZ | 07.09.2016 | |
DK | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
IT | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/32] | CZ | 07.09.2016 | |
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
ES | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
IT | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
PT | 09.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/13] | ES | 07.09.2016 | |
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
NL | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/12] | ES | 07.09.2016 | |
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
GR | 08.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 07.09.2016 | |
SE | 07.09.2016 | Cited in | International search | [XY]DE3000826 (SKIRDE AQUA NORT [DE]) [X] 1-3,7,8 * page 11 - page 14; figure 1 * [Y] 4-6; | [Y]DE19959310 (HENKEL ECOLAB GMBH & CO OHG [DE]) [Y] 4-6 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE4311064 (LANG APPARATEBAU GMBH [DE]) [Y] 4-6 * the whole document *; | [Y]FR2485576 (LABO ELECTRONIQUE PHYSIQUE [FR]) [Y] 4-6 * page 2, line 30 - page 4, line 7; figure - *; | [Y]DE2949254 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) [Y] 4-6 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5172572 (ONO SHUZO [JP]) [Y] 4-6 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [Y]EP0526860 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 4-6 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0852929 (BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document * |