EP1537173 - FLAMEPROOF AGENT-STABILISER-COMBINATION FOR THERMOPLASTIC POLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.02.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2006/11] |
Former [2005/23] | For all designated states Clariant GmbH Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOEROLD, Sebastian Schmutterstr. 8c 86420 Diedorf / DE | 02 /
WANZKE, Wolfgang Carron-du-Val-Str. 32c 86161 Augsburg / DE | 03 /
SCHACKER, Ottmar Gailenbacher Strasse 3a 86368 Gersthofen / DE | 04 /
NASS, Bernd Bei den Sieben Kindeln 1 86152 Augsburg / DE | 05 /
SICKEN, Martin Mainstr. 40a 51149 Koeln / DE | [2006/51] |
Former [2005/23] | 01 /
HOEROLD, Sebastian Schmutterstr. 8c 86420 Diedorf / DE | ||
02 /
WANZKE, Wolfgang Carron-du-Val-Str. 32c 86161 Augsburg / DE | |||
03 /
SCHACKER, Ottmar Dorfstr. 2a 86356 Neusaess / DE | |||
04 /
NASS, Bernd Bei den Sieben Kindeln 1 86152 Augsburg / DE | |||
05 /
SICKEN, Martin Mainstr. 40a 51149 Koeln / DE | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2006/11] |
Former [2005/23] | Paczkowski, Marcus, Dr. Clariant Service GmbH Patente, Marken, Lizenzen Am Unisys-Park 1 65843 Sulzbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 03793757.0 | 26.08.2003 | WO2003EP09434 | Priority number, date | DE2002141126 | 03.09.2002 Original published format: DE 10241126 | [2005/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004022640 | Date: | 18.03.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1537173 | Date: | 08.06.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.03.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1537173 | Date: | 01.04.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C08K13/02, C08K5/5313, C08K5/3492, C08K3/22 | [2006/24] | CPC: |
C08K5/5313 (EP,KR,US);
C08K13/02 (KR);
C08K3/22 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/23] | C08K13/02, // C08K13/02, C08K5/5313, C08K5/3492, C08K3/22 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/23] |
Former [N/P] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | FLAMMSCHUTZMITTEL-STABILISATOR-KOMBINATION FUR THERMOPLASTISCHE POLYMERE | [2005/23] | English: | FLAMEPROOF AGENT-STABILISER-COMBINATION FOR THERMOPLASTIC POLYMERS | [2005/23] | French: | COMBINAISON AGENT IGNIFUGEANT-STABILISANT POUR POLYMERES THERMOPLASTIQUES | [2005/23] | Entry into regional phase | 04.04.2005 | National basic fee paid | 04.04.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.04.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.03.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/23] | 05.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 01.04.2009 | CZ | 01.04.2009 | DK | 01.04.2009 | EE | 01.04.2009 | FI | 01.04.2009 | IE | 01.04.2009 | RO | 01.04.2009 | SI | 01.04.2009 | SK | 01.04.2009 | TR | 01.04.2009 | BG | 01.07.2009 | SE | 01.07.2009 | GR | 02.07.2009 | LU | 26.08.2009 | MC | 31.08.2009 | PT | 02.09.2009 | HU | 02.10.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/31] | CZ | 01.04.2009 | |
DK | 01.04.2009 | ||
EE | 01.04.2009 | ||
FI | 01.04.2009 | ||
IE | 01.04.2009 | ||
RO | 01.04.2009 | ||
SI | 01.04.2009 | ||
SK | 01.04.2009 | ||
BG | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
GR | 02.07.2009 | ||
LU | 26.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
PT | 02.09.2009 | ||
HU | 02.10.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | CZ | 01.04.2009 | |
DK | 01.04.2009 | ||
EE | 01.04.2009 | ||
FI | 01.04.2009 | ||
IE | 01.04.2009 | ||
RO | 01.04.2009 | ||
SI | 01.04.2009 | ||
SK | 01.04.2009 | ||
BG | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
GR | 02.07.2009 | ||
LU | 26.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
PT | 02.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/49] | CZ | 01.04.2009 | |
DK | 01.04.2009 | ||
EE | 01.04.2009 | ||
FI | 01.04.2009 | ||
IE | 01.04.2009 | ||
RO | 01.04.2009 | ||
SI | 01.04.2009 | ||
SK | 01.04.2009 | ||
BG | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
GR | 02.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
PT | 02.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/18] | CZ | 01.04.2009 | |
DK | 01.04.2009 | ||
EE | 01.04.2009 | ||
FI | 01.04.2009 | ||
IE | 01.04.2009 | ||
RO | 01.04.2009 | ||
SI | 01.04.2009 | ||
SK | 01.04.2009 | ||
BG | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
PT | 02.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/16] | CZ | 01.04.2009 | |
DK | 01.04.2009 | ||
EE | 01.04.2009 | ||
FI | 01.04.2009 | ||
IE | 01.04.2009 | ||
RO | 01.04.2009 | ||
SI | 01.04.2009 | ||
SK | 01.04.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
PT | 02.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | CZ | 01.04.2009 | |
DK | 01.04.2009 | ||
EE | 01.04.2009 | ||
FI | 01.04.2009 | ||
IE | 01.04.2009 | ||
RO | 01.04.2009 | ||
SI | 01.04.2009 | ||
SK | 01.04.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
PT | 02.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | DK | 01.04.2009 | |
EE | 01.04.2009 | ||
FI | 01.04.2009 | ||
IE | 01.04.2009 | ||
SI | 01.04.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
PT | 02.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | EE | 01.04.2009 | |
FI | 01.04.2009 | ||
IE | 01.04.2009 | ||
SI | 01.04.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
PT | 02.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/52] | EE | 01.04.2009 | |
FI | 01.04.2009 | ||
SI | 01.04.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
PT | 02.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/50] | EE | 01.04.2009 | |
FI | 01.04.2009 | ||
SI | 01.04.2009 | ||
PT | 02.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | SI | 01.04.2009 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1024168 (CLARIANT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-5,8,11-14,17,21,24,25,27,29,30 * claims 1,8-12,14,15 * * page 4, lines 25,29,36 *; | [X]EP1024167 (CLARIANT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-5,11,13,14,16,17,21-25,27-30 * claims 1-8,10-21 * * page 11, line 32; table 8 *; | [A]US6270560 (KLEINER HANS-JERG [DE], et al) [A] 1-31* claims 19,20 * |