EP1535389 - MOTOR DRIVE CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.11.2010 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.12.2010 [2010/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TRW Limited Stratford Road Solihull, West Midlands B90 4AX / GB | [2010/01] |
Former [2005/22] | For all designated states TRW Limited Stratford Road, Solihull West Midlands B90 4AX / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COLES, Jeffrey Ronald 64 Kineton Green Road, Olton Solihull, West Midlands B92 7EB / GB | 02 /
WILLIAMS, Connel 144 Leam Terrace Leamington Spa CV31 1DN / GB | [2005/22] | Representative(s) | Wilson, Alan Stuart Barker Brettell LLP Medina Chambers Town Quay Southampton SO14 2AQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/22] | Wilson, Alan Stuart Barker Brettell, 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | Application number, filing date | 03793876.8 | 03.09.2003 | WO2003GB03817 | Priority number, date | GB20020020401 | 03.09.2002 Original published format: GB 0220401 | [2005/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004023639 | Date: | 18.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1535389 | Date: | 01.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.03.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1535389 | Date: | 30.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/53] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H02P6/18 | [2005/22] | CPC: |
H02P6/185 (EP,US);
H02P21/00 (KR);
H02P6/18 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2005/51] |
Former [2005/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | ||
Former [N/P] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MOTORANTRIEBSSTEUERUNG | [2005/22] | English: | MOTOR DRIVE CONTROL | [2005/22] | French: | COMMANDE DE MOTEUR | [2005/22] | Entry into regional phase | 21.03.2005 | National basic fee paid | 21.03.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.03.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/22] | 19.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 18.11.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 10.04.2010 | [2010/32] | Cited in | International search | [DA]EP0856937 (ADVANCED MOTION CONTROLS INC [US]) [DA] 1,28 * column 7, line 4 - column 14, line 6; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US6172498 (SCHMIDT PETER B [US], et al) [A] 1 * column A * * column 2, line 61 - column 4, line 6 * * column 6, line 45 - column 9, line 7; figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE19838227 (FRANKL & KIRCHNER [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 2, lines 12-57 * * column 4, line 6 - column 5, line 33; figures 1-3 *; | [A] - OGASAWARA S. ET AL.:, "An Approach to Real-Time Position Estimation at Zero and Low Speed for a PM Motor Based on Saliency", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INDUSTRY APPLICATIONS, NEW YORK, US, (199801), vol. 34, no. 1, pages 163 - 168, XP000766895 [A] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/28.658742 |