EP1549477 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR FEEDING AN EXPANDING AGENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 01.10.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2021 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 29.09.2021 [2021/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CGR S.r.l. Via S. Filippo 3 Reggio Emilia / IT | [2008/14] |
Former [2005/27] | For all designated states CGR System S.R.L. Via Del Molino 36 62010 Montecassiano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FARABOLINI, Paolo Loc. Commenda, 32/A I-62010 Montecassiano / IT | 02 /
RIVI, Giuliano Via Curriel, 9 I-42019 Scandiano / IT | [2005/27] | Representative(s) | Baldi, Claudio, et al Ing. Claudio Baldi S.r.l. Viale Cavallotti 13 P.O. Box 187 60035 Jesi (AN) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/39] | Baldi, Claudio, et al Ing. Claudio Baldi s.r.l. Viale Cavallotti 13 P.O. Box 187 60035 Jesi (AN) / IT | ||
Former [2008/45] | Jorio, Paolo, et al STUDIO TORTA Via Viotti 9 10121 Torino / IT | ||
Former [2005/27] | Jorio, Paolo, et al STUDIO TORTA S.r.l., Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 03794051.7 | 05.09.2003 | WO2003IT00531 | Priority number, date | IT2002BO00563 | 05.09.2002 Original published format: IT BO20020563 | [2005/27] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004022303 | Date: | 18.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1549477 | Date: | 06.07.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.03.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1549477 | Date: | 21.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/21] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1549477 | Date: | 03.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B29C44/34, B29C44/60 | [2005/27] | CPC: |
B29C44/3446 (EP);
B29C44/60 (EP);
B29C48/0012 (EP);
B29C48/295 (EP);
B29C48/297 (EP);
B29C48/397 (EP);
B29C48/92 (EP);
B29C2948/92019 (EP);
B29C2948/92409 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/27] |
Former [N/P] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ZUFÜHREN EINES TREIBMITTELS | [2005/27] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR FEEDING AN EXPANDING AGENT | [2005/27] | French: | MÉTHODE ET APPAREIL POUR L'INTRODUCTION D'UN AGENT GONFLANT | [2007/48] |
Former [2005/27] | DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT D'INTRODUIRE UN AGENT GONFLANT POUR MATERIAU POLYMERE, MACHINE DE TRAITEMENT, MACHINE ET PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT DE MATERIAU POLYMERE | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.2004 | Translation filed | 23.03.2005 | National basic fee paid | 23.03.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.03.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/27] | 14.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
20.02.2009
ADMISSIBLE TREXEL INC. 45 Sixth Road Woburn, MA 01801 / US Opponent's representative Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/14] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
20.02.2009
ADMISSIBLE TREXEL INC. 45 Sixth Road Woburn, MA 01801 / US Opponent's representative HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4 81925 München / DE | 12.05.2009 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 21.09.2009 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 26.02.2010 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 26.02.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.03.2010 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 12.03.2010 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 29.06.2010 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 13.09.2010 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.05.2008 | BE | 21.05.2008 | CY | 21.05.2008 | DK | 21.05.2008 | EE | 21.05.2008 | FI | 21.05.2008 | SE | 21.08.2008 | IE | 05.09.2008 | MC | 30.09.2008 | LU | 05.09.2009 | HU | 06.09.2009 | GR | 06.04.2010 | [2021/39] |
Former [2015/21] | AT | 21.05.2008 | |
BE | 21.05.2008 | ||
CY | 21.05.2008 | ||
DK | 21.05.2008 | ||
EE | 21.05.2008 | ||
FI | 21.05.2008 | ||
SE | 21.08.2008 | ||
IE | 05.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
LU | 05.09.2009 | ||
HU | 06.09.2009 | ||
GR | 06.04.2010 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 21.05.2008 | |
BE | 21.05.2008 | ||
CY | 21.05.2008 | ||
DK | 21.05.2008 | ||
EE | 21.05.2008 | ||
FI | 21.05.2008 | ||
SE | 21.08.2008 | ||
IE | 05.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
LU | 05.09.2009 | ||
HU | 06.09.2009 | ||
GR | 06.04.2010 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 21.05.2008 | |
BE | 21.05.2008 | ||
CY | 21.05.2008 | ||
DK | 21.05.2008 | ||
EE | 21.05.2008 | ||
FI | 21.05.2008 | ||
SE | 21.08.2008 | ||
ES | 01.09.2008 | ||
IE | 05.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
LU | 05.09.2009 | ||
HU | 06.09.2009 | ||
GR | 06.04.2010 | ||
Former [2012/08] | AT | 21.05.2008 | |
BE | 21.05.2008 | ||
CY | 21.05.2008 | ||
DK | 21.05.2008 | ||
EE | 21.05.2008 | ||
FI | 21.05.2008 | ||
SE | 21.08.2008 | ||
IE | 05.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
LU | 05.09.2009 | ||
HU | 06.09.2009 | ||
GR | 06.04.2010 | ||
ES | 06.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 21.05.2008 | |
BE | 21.05.2008 | ||
CY | 21.05.2008 | ||
DK | 21.05.2008 | ||
EE | 21.05.2008 | ||
FI | 21.05.2008 | ||
SE | 21.08.2008 | ||
IE | 05.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
LU | 05.09.2009 | ||
HU | 06.09.2009 | ||
GR | 06.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/49] | AT | 21.05.2008 | |
BE | 21.05.2008 | ||
CY | 21.05.2008 | ||
DK | 21.05.2008 | ||
EE | 21.05.2008 | ||
FI | 21.05.2008 | ||
SE | 21.08.2008 | ||
IE | 05.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
HU | 06.09.2009 | ||
GR | 06.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/34] | AT | 21.05.2008 | |
BE | 21.05.2008 | ||
CY | 21.05.2008 | ||
DK | 21.05.2008 | ||
EE | 21.05.2008 | ||
FI | 21.05.2008 | ||
SE | 21.08.2008 | ||
IE | 05.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
HU | 06.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 21.05.2008 | |
BE | 21.05.2008 | ||
DK | 21.05.2008 | ||
EE | 21.05.2008 | ||
FI | 21.05.2008 | ||
SE | 21.08.2008 | ||
IE | 05.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 21.05.2008 | |
BE | 21.05.2008 | ||
DK | 21.05.2008 | ||
EE | 21.05.2008 | ||
FI | 21.05.2008 | ||
SE | 21.08.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/20] | AT | 21.05.2008 | |
BE | 21.05.2008 | ||
DK | 21.05.2008 | ||
FI | 21.05.2008 | ||
SE | 21.08.2008 | ||
MC | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 21.05.2008 | |
BE | 21.05.2008 | ||
DK | 21.05.2008 | ||
FI | 21.05.2008 | ||
SE | 21.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | AT | 21.05.2008 | |
DK | 21.05.2008 | ||
FI | 21.05.2008 | ||
SE | 21.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 21.05.2008 | |
FI | 21.05.2008 | ||
SE | 21.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/50] | AT | 21.05.2008 | |
FI | 21.05.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4246230 (HASSELMAN SR WALTER J) [A] 1-16 * column 13, line 55 - column 14, line 1 ** column 14, line 32 - line 43 *; | [A]US5984280 (OKUDA SHINJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-16 * column 9, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3; claim 5 *; | [X]EP0995569 (BATTENFELD GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-16 * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0026] * |