EP1538127 - INORGANIC LAYERED COMPOUND DISPERSION, PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME, AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.07.2016 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAKATA INX CORPORATION 23-37, Edobori 1-chome Nishi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 550-0002 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/23] | For all designated states Sakata Inx Corporation 23-37, Edobori 1-chome, Nishi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 550-0002 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUOKA, Yutaka, c/o SAKATA INX CORP. 23-37, Edobori 1-chome, Nishi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 550-0002 / JP | 02 /
UENO, Yoshiaki, c/o SAKATA INX CORP. 23-37, Edobori 1-chome, Nishi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 550-0002 / JP | 03 /
KANO, Masanori, c/o SAKATA INX CORP. 23-37, Edobori 1-chome, Nishi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 550-0002 / JP | [2005/23] | Representative(s) | Hart-Davis, Jason, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/23] | Hart Davis, Jason, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie, 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 03794085.5 | 18.08.2003 | WO2003JP10395 | Priority number, date | JP20020239677 | 20.08.2002 Original published format: JP 2002239677 | [2005/23] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004022485 | Date: | 18.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1538127 | Date: | 08.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.03.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.03.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C01B33/38, C09D201/00, C09D7/12, C08J7/04, C09C3/06, C09C3/08, B65D25/14, B65D30/02 | [2005/23] | CPC: |
C09D129/04 (EP,KR,US);
C01B33/40 (KR);
C01B33/38 (EP,US);
C08K3/346 (EP,KR,US);
C09C3/00 (EP,US);
C09C3/063 (EP,KR,US);
C09C3/08 (EP,US);
C09D123/0846 (KR);
C09D7/48 (EP,US);
C09D7/61 (KR);
C09D7/70 (EP,KR,US);
C08K2201/008 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2005/49] |
Former [2005/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | ||
Former [N/P] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DISPERSION EINER ANORGANISCHEN SCHICHTVERBINDUNG, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2005/23] | English: | INORGANIC LAYERED COMPOUND DISPERSION, PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME, AND USE THEREOF | [2005/23] | French: | DISPERSION DE COMPOSE INORGANIQUE EN COUCHE, PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION ET UTILISATION | [2005/23] | Entry into regional phase | 02.03.2005 | Translation filed | 01.03.2005 | National basic fee paid | 01.03.2005 | Search fee paid | 01.03.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.03.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/23] | 14.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/32] | 01.04.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/32] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.03.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 21.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2006 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   01.12.2006 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPS5551717 (NIPPON PEROXIDE CO LTD) [X] 1-4 * the whole document * [Y] 5-9; | [XY]JPS571486B (KABUSHIKI KAISHA KAKUHACHI GYORINPAKU) [X] 1-4 * the whole document * [Y] 5-9; | [Y]US5700560 (KOTANI KOZO [JP], et al) [Y] 5-9* the whole document * | International search | [X]JPS5551717 (NIPPON PEROXIDE CO LTD); | [X]JPS571486B ; | [X] - HERETER AGNES, "Changes in particle-size distribution influenced by organic matter and mechanical or ultrasonic dispersion techiques", COMMUN. SOIL. SCI. PLANT. ANAL., (200204), vol. 33, no. 7, pages 1351 - 1362, XP002973829 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1081/CSS-120003892 | [X] - GREGORICH E.G., "Ultrasonic dispersion of aggregates: distribution of organic matter in size fractions", CANADIAN JOURNAL OF SOIL SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 68, no. 2, pages 395 - 403, XP002973830 | [XP] - OBUT A., "Hydrogen peroxide enfoliation of vermiculite and phlogopite", MINERALS ENGINEERING, (200209), vol. 15, pages 683 - 687, XP002973831 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0892-6875(02)00161-9 | [X] - CHAHI A., "The use of surfactant for clay dispersion in organic matter-rich soil: preliminary examination", SOIL SCIENCE, (1996), vol. 161, no. 11, pages 761 - 769, XP002973832 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/00010694-199611000-00005 | [X] - MUROMSCHEV B.A., IZV. AKAD. NAUK SSSR NEORG. MATER., (1991), vol. 27, no. 8, pages 1755 - 1757, XP002973833 |