EP1535524 - FILTER FOR SMOKING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.08.2013 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Japan Tobacco Inc. 2-1, Toranomon 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8422 / JP | [2012/42] |
Former [2005/22] | For all designated states Japan Tobacco Inc. 2-1, Toranomon 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8422 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
INAGAKI, Michihiro, @c/o JAPAN TOBACCO INC. 17-7, Yokokawa 1-chome Sumida-ku Tokyo 130-8603 / JP | 02 /
HASEGAWA, Takashi, @c/o JAPAN TOBACCO INC. 17-7, Yokokawa 1-chome Sumida-ku Tokyo 130-8603 / JP | 03 /
SUGAI, Kazunori, @c/o JAPAN TOBACCO INC. 17-7, Yokokawa 1-chome Sumida-ku Tokyo 130-8603 / JP | [2012/42] |
Former [2005/22] | 01 /
INAGAKI, Michihiro, c/o JAPAN TOBACCO INC. 17-7, Yokokawa 1-chome, Sumida-ku Tokyo 130-8603 / JP | ||
02 /
HASEGAWA, Takashi, c/o JAPAN TOBACCO INC. 17-7, Yokokawa 1-chome, Sumida-ku Tokyo 130-8603 / JP | |||
03 /
SUGAI, Kazunori, c/o JAPAN TOBACCO INC. 17-7, Yokokawa 1-chome, Sumida-ku Tokyo 130-8603 / JP | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/18] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/22] | Behnisch, Werner, Dr. Reinhard-Skuhra-Weise & Partner GbR, Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03794103.6 | 27.08.2003 | WO2003JP10877 | Priority number, date | JP20020258988 | 04.09.2002 Original published format: JP 2002258988 | [2005/22] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004021810 | Date: | 18.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1535524 | Date: | 01.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.03.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1535524 | Date: | 17.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.03.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A24D1/04, A24D3/04, A24D3/16 | [2005/22] | CPC: |
A24F13/04 (EP,KR,US);
A24D3/04 (EP,US);
A24D3/067 (KR,US);
A24D3/17 (KR);
A24F40/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/22] |
Former [N/P] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | RAUCHFILTER | [2005/22] | English: | FILTER FOR SMOKING | [2005/22] | French: | FILTRE A FUMEE | [2005/22] | Entry into regional phase | 09.03.2005 | Translation filed | 09.03.2005 | National basic fee paid | 09.03.2005 | Search fee paid | 09.03.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.03.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.03.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 09.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/22] | 01.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.08.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 14.08.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.05.2012 | Opposition(s) | 18.07.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.08.2003 | CY | 17.10.2012 | CZ | 17.10.2012 | EE | 17.10.2012 | FI | 17.10.2012 | MC | 17.10.2012 | SI | 17.10.2012 | SK | 17.10.2012 | BG | 17.01.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2014/20] | CY | 17.10.2012 | |
CZ | 17.10.2012 | ||
EE | 17.10.2012 | ||
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
MC | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
SK | 17.10.2012 | ||
BG | 17.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 17.10.2012 | |
CZ | 17.10.2012 | ||
EE | 17.10.2012 | ||
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
SK | 17.10.2012 | ||
BG | 17.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 17.10.2012 | |
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
BG | 17.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | CY | 17.10.2012 | |
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
SI | 17.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 17.10.2012 | |
FI | 17.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 17.10.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR820402 (CHEVALIER M.G. [FR]) [A] 1-8* the whole document *; | [X]US4215708 (BRON EVERT J S [NL]) [X] 1 * column 2, line 12 - line 40; figure - * * column 3, line 4 - line 8 *; | [XAI]US5392793 (MOLLOY PETER J [GB]) [X] 1,6 * column 3 - column 7; figure - * [A] 4,5 [I] 2,3,7,8 | International search | [X]JPH04262773 (ROSUMAN INTERN TABAKO LTD); | [Y]JP2001000165 (TOKYO BIO CERAMICS KENKYUSHO K) | by applicant | US6279766 | US5392793 | US4215708 |