EP1535423 - KEY DELIVERY FOR OPERATING AN HOME NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.08.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.10.2013 [2013/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2005/22] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OHTA, Yuusaku 19 F Matsushita IMP Bldg., 3-7, Shiromi 1-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6319 / JP | 02 /
YAMAUCHI, Hiroki 19F Matsushita IMP Bldg., -7, Shiromi 1-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6319 / JP | 03 /
MIYAZAKI, Masaya 1-6-14, Asahigaoka Ikeda-shi, Osaka 563-0022 / JP | 04 /
MATSUZAKI, Natsume 2-10-11, Aoshinke Mino-shi, Osaka 562-0024 / JP | 05 /
ABE, Toshihisa 1-2631-5, Takamatsunishi Izumisano-shi, Osaka 598-0016 / JP | [2007/01] |
Former [2005/22] | 01 /
OHTA, Yuusaku Syofuryo, 3-14, Miyukihigashimachi Neyagawa-shi, Osaka 572-0055 / JP | ||
02 /
YAMAUCHI, Hiroki 5-3, Funakicho Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-0828 / JP | |||
03 /
MIYAZAKI, Masaya 1-6-14, Asahigaoka Ikeda-shi, Osaka 563-0022 / JP | |||
04 /
MATSUZAKI, Natsume 2-10-11, Aoshinke Mino-shi, Osaka 562-0024 / JP | |||
05 /
ABE, Toshihisa 1-2631-5, Takamatsunishi Izumisano-shi, Osaka 598-0016 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/23] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/22] | Grünecker, August, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Partner Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03794108.5 | 28.08.2003 | WO2003JP10903 | Priority number, date | JP20020249242 | 28.08.2002 Original published format: JP 2002249242 | [2005/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004023710 | Date: | 18.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/12] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1535423 | Date: | 01.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.03.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/00 | [2005/22] | CPC: |
H04N21/43615 (EP,US);
H04L9/08 (KR);
G06F21/10 (EP,US);
G06F21/445 (EP,US);
G11B20/00086 (EP,US);
G11B20/00123 (EP,US);
G11B20/00195 (EP,US);
G11B20/0021 (EP,US);
G11B20/00224 (EP,US);
G11B20/0084 (EP,US);
G11B20/00855 (EP,US);
H04L9/00 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/22] |
Former [N/P] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHLÜSSELABLIEFERUNG ZUM BETRIEB IN EINEM HEIMNETZWERK | [2005/22] | English: | KEY DELIVERY FOR OPERATING AN HOME NETWORK | [2005/22] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DISTRIBUTION DE CLES, BORNE, SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT ET SYSTEME DE DISTRIBUTION DE CLES | [2005/22] | Entry into regional phase | 17.03.2005 | National basic fee paid | 17.03.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.03.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/22] | 28.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/40] | 16.05.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/40] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.11.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]EP1018733 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRONICS CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-3,11-15,17,18,21-24 * abstract * * column 22, line 51 - column 23, line 2 * * column 24, line 42 - column 25, line 10 * * column 26, line 55 - column 27, line 32 * * column 31, line 56 - column 32, line 27 * * figures 15,17 * [A] 4-10,16,19,20; | [YA]EP1081616 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-3,11-15,17,18,21-24 * abstract * * page 2, line 21 - line 39 * * page 3, line 8 - line 11 * * page 3, line 35 - line 44 * * page 6, line 47 - page 7, line 31 * * page 8, line 12 - line 26 * * page 8, line 56 - page 9, line 33 * * page 11, line 44 - line 45 * * page 11, line 55 - line 57 * * figures 1,2b,2c,4c,4d,9,11 * [A] 4-10,16,19,20; | [A] - "IBM RESPONSE TO DVB-CPT CALL FOR PROPOSALS FOR CONTENT PROTECTION & COPY MANAGEMENT:XCP CLUSTER PROTOCOL", IBM RESPONSE TO DVB-CPT CALL FOR PROPOSALS FOR CONTENT PROTECTION & COPY MANAGEMENT:XCP CLUSTER PROTOCOL, (20011019), XP001148193 [A] 1-24 * page 6 - page 9 * | [A] - "Content Protection for Recordable Media Specification : SD Memory Card Book, Revision 0.95", CONTENT PROTECTION FOR RECORDABLE MEDIA SPECIFICATION : SD MEMORY CARD BOOK, REVISION 0.95, (20010528), XP002226117 [A] 1-24 * page 5 - page 11 * * page 26 - page 27 * | [A] - "Call for proposals for content protection & copy management technologies", CALL FOR PROPOSALS FOR CONTENT PROTECTION & COPY MANAGEMENT TECHNOLOGIES, (20010705), XP002230687 [A] 1-24 * page 4 - page 6 * * paragraph [06.4] * | [A] - "5C Digital Transmission Content Protection White Paper", 5C DIGITAL TRANSMISSION CONTENT PROTECTION WHITE PAPER, (19980714), XP002213172 [A] 1-24 * the whole document * | [A] - "SDMI SECURE DIGITAL MUSIC INITIATIVE", SDMI PORTABLE DEVICE SPECIFICATION VERSION 1.0, XX, XX, (19990708), no. PART 1, pages 1 - 35, XP000997330 [A] 1-24 * the whole document * |