EP1550122 - RECORDING MEDIUM HAVING DATA STRUCTURE FOR MANAGING REPRODUCTION OF STILL IMAGES RECORDED THEREON AND RECORDING AND REPRODUCING METHODS AND APPARATUSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.05.2015 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.07.2015 [2015/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics, Inc. 20, Yoido-Dong Youngdungpo-Gu Seoul 150-010 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/27] | For all designated states LG ELECTRONICS INC. 20, Yoido-Dong, Youngdungpo-ku Seoul 150-010 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Byung Jin 111-204, Hansol Chungu APT., 110 Jeongja-dong Bundang-gu Sungnam, Kyunggi-do 463-010 / KR | 02 /
PARK, Sung Wan 337-1403, Byuksan APT., Doogyun Maeul Jungja-dong Jangan-gu Suwon-si 440-300 / KR | 03 /
UM, Soung Hyun 18-701, Samho Apt. Bisan-dong, Dongan-gu Anyang, Kyunggi-do 431-050 / KR | 04 /
SEO, Kang Soo 606-503, Chowon Hanyang Apt., 897-5 Pyoungan-dong Dongan-gu Anyang, Kyunggi-do 431-075 / KR | [2005/27] | Representative(s) | Diehl & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Erika-Mann-Straße 9 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/36] | Diehl & Partner GbR Patentanwälte Augustenstrasse 46 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/27] | Diehl, Hermann, Dr. Dipl.-Phys., et al DIEHL, GLÄSER, HILTL & PARTNER Patentanwälte Augustenstrasse 46 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03794319.8 | 03.09.2003 | WO2003KR01800 | Priority number, date | KR20020053608 | 05.09.2002 Original published format: KR 2002053608 | KR20020056235 | 16.09.2002 Original published format: KR 2002056235 | KR20020056923 | 18.09.2002 Original published format: KR 2002056923 | [2005/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004023485 | Date: | 18.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1550122 | Date: | 06.07.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.03.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 18.03.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G11B27/10, G11B27/034, G11B20/12 | [2009/49] | CPC: |
G11B27/105 (EP,US);
G11B20/12 (EP,KR,US);
G11B27/034 (EP,US);
H04N1/00198 (EP,US);
G11B2020/10537 (EP,US);
G11B2020/1288 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2005/27] | G11B20/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/27] |
Former [N/P] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM MIT DATENSTRUKTUR ZU VERWALTUNG DER WIEDERGABE VON DARAUF AUFGEZEICHNETEN STANDBILDERN UND AUFZEICHNUNGS- UND WIEDERGABEVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNGEN | [2005/27] | English: | RECORDING MEDIUM HAVING DATA STRUCTURE FOR MANAGING REPRODUCTION OF STILL IMAGES RECORDED THEREON AND RECORDING AND REPRODUCING METHODS AND APPARATUSES | [2005/27] | French: | SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT PRESENTANT UNE STRUCTURE DE DONNÉES GERANT LA REPRODUCTION D'IMAGES FIXES Y ETANT ENREGISTRÉES, ET PROCÉDÉS ET APPAREILS D'ENREGISTREMENT ET DE RÉPRODUCTION | [2005/38] |
Former [2005/27] | SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT PRESENTANT UNE STRUCTURE DE DONNEES GERANT LA REPRODUCTION D'IMAGES FIXES Y ETANT ENREGISTREES, ET PROCEDES ET APPAREILS D'ENREGISTREMENT ET DE REPRODUCTION | Entry into regional phase | 07.04.2004 | National basic fee paid | 07.04.2004 | Search fee paid | 31.03.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/27] | 27.01.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/27] | 24.02.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/27] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.05.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 09.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 20.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 26.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0942609 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-18 * paragraphs [0172] , [0173] , [0205] - [0210] - [0256] - [0263] - [0267] - [0269] - [0296] , [0299] , [0308] - [0311] *; | [X]EP1041566 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-18 * paragraphs [0002] , [0020] , [0056] , [0058] , [0059] , [0063] , [0064] , [0080] , [0099] - [0120] - [0151] - [0163] - [0174]; figures 11a-11d * * paragraphs [0266] - [0269] *; | [X]EP1102270 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRONICS CORP [JP]) [X] 1-18 * paragraphs [0281] , [0313] , [0336] - [0344] *; | [X]EP1128386 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [X] 1-18 * paragraphs [0242] , [0243] , [0352] * * paragraphs [0004] , [0006] , [0025] , [0028] , [0033] , [0046] , [0047] , [0053] , [0066] , [0078] , [0079]; figures 6a,6b,7,8 * * paragraphs [0106] - [0115]; figures 10-13 *; | [X]US6369835 (LIN TONY HONGTONG [US]) [X] 1-18* paragraphs [0002] , [0005] , [0006] , [0010] , [0018] , [0044] , [0051] , [0052] , [0055]; figures 9-11 * | International search | [A]JPH0917101 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [A]EP1045393 (SONY CORP [JP]); | [A]EP1113439 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) |