EP1546453 - A METHOD OF MAKING PAPERBOARD AND A MACHINE FOR MAKING PAPERBOARD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/26] | A METHOD OF MAKING PAPERBOARD, A MACHINE FOR MAKING PAPERBOARD AND A PRESS SECTION FOR DEWATERING A WET FIBROUS WEB | ||
[2007/21] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.2008 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Metso Paper, Inc. Fabianinkatu 9 A 00130 Helsinki / FI | [2005/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEANDERSSON, Anders Kvarnbergsgatan 6 S-652 29 Karlstad / SE | [2005/26] | Representative(s) | Johansson, Lars-Erik, et al Hynell Intellectual Property AB Hammarbybacken 27 120 30 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/45] | Johansson, Lars-Erik, et al Hynell Patenttjänst AB Patron Carls väg 2 683 40 Hagfors / Uddeholm / SE | ||
Former [2005/26] | Johansson, Lars E. Hynell Patenttjänst AB Patron Carls väg 2 683 40 Hagfors/Uddeholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 03794380.0 | 28.08.2003 | WO2003SE01330 | Priority number, date | SE20020002660 | 09.09.2002 Original published format: SE 0202660 | US20020420290P | 22.10.2002 Original published format: US 420290 P | [2005/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004022845 | Date: | 18.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1546453 | Date: | 29.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.03.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1546453 | Date: | 17.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 18.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | D21F11/00, D21F3/00, D21F9/00 | [2005/26] | CPC: |
D21F3/045 (EP);
D21F11/04 (EP);
D21F9/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/26] |
Former [N/P] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PAPPE UND MASCHINE ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PAPPE | [2007/21] | English: | A METHOD OF MAKING PAPERBOARD AND A MACHINE FOR MAKING PAPERBOARD | [2007/21] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE CARTON ET MACHINE DE FABRICATION DE CARTON | [2007/21] |
Former [2005/26] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PAPPE, MASCHINE ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PAPPE UND TROCKENPARTIE ZUM ENTWÄSSERN EINER NASSEN FASERSTOFFBAHN | ||
Former [2005/26] | A METHOD OF MAKING PAPERBOARD, A MACHINE FOR MAKING PAPERBOARD AND A PRESS SECTION FOR DEWATERING A WET FIBROUS WEB | ||
Former [2005/26] | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE CARTON, MACHINE DE FABRICATION DE CARTON ET SECTION DE PRESSE POUR EPAISSISSEMENT D'UNE BANDE FIBREUSE HUMIDE | Entry into regional phase | 17.02.2005 | National basic fee paid | 17.02.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.02.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/26] | 30.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.08.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 29.08.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.07.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 17.10.2007 | CH | 17.10.2007 | CY | 17.10.2007 | CZ | 17.10.2007 | DK | 17.10.2007 | EE | 17.10.2007 | FI | 17.10.2007 | LI | 17.10.2007 | NL | 17.10.2007 | RO | 17.10.2007 | SI | 17.10.2007 | SK | 17.10.2007 | TR | 17.10.2007 | BG | 17.01.2008 | SE | 17.01.2008 | GR | 18.01.2008 | ES | 28.01.2008 | PT | 17.03.2008 | HU | 18.04.2008 | [2010/37] |
Former [2010/34] | BE | 17.10.2007 | |
CH | 17.10.2007 | ||
CY | 17.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2007 | ||
DK | 17.10.2007 | ||
EE | 17.10.2007 | ||
FI | 17.10.2007 | ||
LI | 17.10.2007 | ||
NL | 17.10.2007 | ||
RO | 17.10.2007 | ||
SI | 17.10.2007 | ||
SK | 17.10.2007 | ||
BG | 17.01.2008 | ||
SE | 17.01.2008 | ||
GR | 18.01.2008 | ||
ES | 28.01.2008 | ||
PT | 17.03.2008 | ||
HU | 18.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | BE | 17.10.2007 | |
CH | 17.10.2007 | ||
CY | 17.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2007 | ||
DK | 17.10.2007 | ||
EE | 17.10.2007 | ||
FI | 17.10.2007 | ||
LI | 17.10.2007 | ||
NL | 17.10.2007 | ||
RO | 17.10.2007 | ||
SI | 17.10.2007 | ||
SK | 17.10.2007 | ||
BG | 17.01.2008 | ||
SE | 17.01.2008 | ||
GR | 18.01.2008 | ||
ES | 28.01.2008 | ||
PT | 17.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | BE | 17.10.2007 | |
CH | 17.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2007 | ||
DK | 17.10.2007 | ||
EE | 17.10.2007 | ||
FI | 17.10.2007 | ||
LI | 17.10.2007 | ||
NL | 17.10.2007 | ||
RO | 17.10.2007 | ||
SI | 17.10.2007 | ||
SK | 17.10.2007 | ||
BG | 17.01.2008 | ||
SE | 17.01.2008 | ||
GR | 18.01.2008 | ||
ES | 28.01.2008 | ||
PT | 17.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | BE | 17.10.2007 | |
CH | 17.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2007 | ||
DK | 17.10.2007 | ||
FI | 17.10.2007 | ||
LI | 17.10.2007 | ||
NL | 17.10.2007 | ||
RO | 17.10.2007 | ||
SI | 17.10.2007 | ||
SK | 17.10.2007 | ||
BG | 17.01.2008 | ||
SE | 17.01.2008 | ||
GR | 18.01.2008 | ||
ES | 28.01.2008 | ||
PT | 17.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | BE | 17.10.2007 | |
CH | 17.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2007 | ||
DK | 17.10.2007 | ||
FI | 17.10.2007 | ||
LI | 17.10.2007 | ||
NL | 17.10.2007 | ||
RO | 17.10.2007 | ||
SI | 17.10.2007 | ||
SK | 17.10.2007 | ||
BG | 17.01.2008 | ||
SE | 17.01.2008 | ||
GR | 18.01.2008 | ||
ES | 28.01.2008 | ||
PT | 17.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | BE | 17.10.2007 | |
CH | 17.10.2007 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2007 | ||
DK | 17.10.2007 | ||
LI | 17.10.2007 | ||
NL | 17.10.2007 | ||
RO | 17.10.2007 | ||
SI | 17.10.2007 | ||
SK | 17.10.2007 | ||
BG | 17.01.2008 | ||
SE | 17.01.2008 | ||
ES | 28.01.2008 | ||
PT | 17.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | CH | 17.10.2007 | |
CZ | 17.10.2007 | ||
DK | 17.10.2007 | ||
LI | 17.10.2007 | ||
NL | 17.10.2007 | ||
SI | 17.10.2007 | ||
BG | 17.01.2008 | ||
SE | 17.01.2008 | ||
ES | 28.01.2008 | ||
PT | 17.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/26] | CH | 17.10.2007 | |
LI | 17.10.2007 | ||
NL | 17.10.2007 | ||
SI | 17.10.2007 | ||
BG | 17.01.2008 | ||
SE | 17.01.2008 | ||
ES | 28.01.2008 | ||
PT | 17.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | CH | 17.10.2007 | |
LI | 17.10.2007 | ||
NL | 17.10.2007 | ||
BG | 17.01.2008 | ||
SE | 17.01.2008 | ||
ES | 28.01.2008 | ||
PT | 17.03.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4662992 (MIRSBERGER PETER [DE]); | [A]EP0770727 (VALMET CORP [FI]); | [A]WO9960203 (VALMET CORP [FI], et al); | [A]EP1072721 (VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH [DE]); | [A]DE10050847 (VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH [DE]); | [A]US2002053415 (MESCHENMOSER ANDREAS [DE]) |