EP1539006 - INTRAMEDULLARY OSTEOSYNTHESIS PIN FOR THERAPY OF LONG BONE FRACTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.10.2009 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.04.2011 [2011/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tantum AG Memellandstr. 2 24537 Neumünster / DE | [2005/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROTH, Wolfgang Leopoldstr. 6 66802 Überherrn / DE | 02 /
HARDER, Hans, E. Mecklenburger Strasse 35 24253 Probsteierhagen / DE | [2005/24] | Representative(s) | Wenzel & Kalkoff Patentanwälte Meiendorfer Strasse 89 22145 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/24] | Patentanwälte Wenzel & Kalkoff Grubesallee 26 22143 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 03794925.2 | 22.08.2003 | [2005/24] | WO2003EP09353 | Priority number, date | DE2002213235U | 24.08.2002 Original published format: DE 20213235 U | [2005/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004024012 | Date: | 25.03.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1539006 | Date: | 15.06.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.03.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1539006 | Date: | 17.12.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/72, A61B17/68 | [2005/24] | CPC: |
A61B17/72 (EP);
A61B17/8685 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, IT [2005/50] |
Former [2005/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INTRAMEDULLÄRER OSTEOSYNTHESE-NAGEL ZUM VERSORGEN VON RÖHRENKNOCHENFRAKTUREN | [2005/24] | English: | INTRAMEDULLARY OSTEOSYNTHESIS PIN FOR THERAPY OF LONG BONE FRACTURES | [2005/24] | French: | CLOU D'OSTEOSYNTHESE CENTRO-MEDULLAIRE SERVANT A SOIGNER DES FRACTURES DES OS LONGS | [2005/24] | Entry into regional phase | 24.03.2005 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.02.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 24.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/24] | 23.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 30.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 17.12.2008 | ES | 28.03.2009 | [2011/14] |
Former [2009/35] | ES | 28.03.2009 | Cited in | International search | [XY]GB1428653 (NAT RES DEV) [X] 1,8,17,18 * page 1, line 96 - page 2, line 7 * [Y] 2,11-13; | [Y]US5100405 (MCLAREN ALEXANDER C [US]) [Y] 2,11-13 * page 4, line 9 - line 24; figures 1,2 *; | [A]FR2783699 (BERTHOLET MAURICE [FR]) [A] 3* page 3, line 19 - line 24 * |