EP1537421 - A METHOD FOR THE IDENTIFICATION OF DRUG TARGETS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.10.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vlaams Interuniversitair Instituut voor Biotechnologie vzw. Rijvisschestraat 120 9052 Zwijnaarde / BE | For all designated states Universiteit Gent Sint-Pietersnieuwstraat 25 9000 Gent / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/49] | For all designated states Vlaams Interuniversitair Instituut voor Biotechnologie vzw. Rijvisschestraat 120 9052 Zwijnaarde / BE | ||
For all designated states Universiteit Gent Sint-Pietersnieuwstraat 25 9000 Gent / BE | |||
Former [2005/23] | For all designated states Vlaams Interuniversitair Instituut voor Biotechnologie vzw. Rijvisschestraat 120 9052 Zwijnaarde / BE | ||
For all designated states UNIVERSITEIT GENT Sint-Pietersnieuwstraat 25 9000 Gent / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VANDEKERCKHOVE, Joel Rode Beukendreef 27 B-8210 Loppem / BE | 02 /
GEVAERT, Kris Narcislaan 179 B-9240 Zele / BE | [2005/23] | Application number, filing date | 03795023.5 | 11.09.2003 | [2005/23] | WO2003EP50402 | Priority number, date | EP20020078801 | 12.09.2002 Original published format: EP 02078801 | [2005/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004025243 | Date: | 25.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/13] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1537421 | Date: | 08.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.03.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1537421 | Date: | 05.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/68 | [2005/23] | CPC: |
C40B30/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM IDENTIFIZIEREN VON DRUG TARGETS | [2005/23] | English: | A METHOD FOR THE IDENTIFICATION OF DRUG TARGETS | [2005/23] | French: | PROCEDE D'IDENTIFICATION DE CIBLES D'UN MEDICAMENT | [2005/23] | Entry into regional phase | 07.03.2005 | National basic fee paid | 07.03.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.03.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.03.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/23] | 13.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.09.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 05.12.2007 | CZ | 05.12.2007 | EE | 05.12.2007 | FI | 05.12.2007 | RO | 05.12.2007 | SI | 05.12.2007 | SK | 05.12.2007 | TR | 05.12.2007 | BG | 05.03.2008 | GR | 06.03.2008 | PT | 05.05.2008 | HU | 06.06.2008 | [2010/37] |
Former [2010/34] | CY | 05.12.2007 | |
CZ | 05.12.2007 | ||
EE | 05.12.2007 | ||
FI | 05.12.2007 | ||
RO | 05.12.2007 | ||
SI | 05.12.2007 | ||
SK | 05.12.2007 | ||
BG | 05.03.2008 | ||
GR | 06.03.2008 | ||
PT | 05.05.2008 | ||
HU | 06.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | CY | 05.12.2007 | |
CZ | 05.12.2007 | ||
EE | 05.12.2007 | ||
FI | 05.12.2007 | ||
RO | 05.12.2007 | ||
SI | 05.12.2007 | ||
SK | 05.12.2007 | ||
BG | 05.03.2008 | ||
GR | 06.03.2008 | ||
PT | 05.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | CZ | 05.12.2007 | |
EE | 05.12.2007 | ||
FI | 05.12.2007 | ||
RO | 05.12.2007 | ||
SI | 05.12.2007 | ||
SK | 05.12.2007 | ||
BG | 05.03.2008 | ||
GR | 06.03.2008 | ||
PT | 05.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | CZ | 05.12.2007 | |
EE | 05.12.2007 | ||
FI | 05.12.2007 | ||
RO | 05.12.2007 | ||
SI | 05.12.2007 | ||
SK | 05.12.2007 | ||
GR | 06.03.2008 | ||
PT | 05.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | CZ | 05.12.2007 | |
FI | 05.12.2007 | ||
RO | 05.12.2007 | ||
SI | 05.12.2007 | ||
SK | 05.12.2007 | ||
GR | 06.03.2008 | ||
PT | 05.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | CZ | 05.12.2007 | |
FI | 05.12.2007 | ||
RO | 05.12.2007 | ||
SI | 05.12.2007 | ||
SK | 05.12.2007 | ||
PT | 05.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | CZ | 05.12.2007 | |
FI | 05.12.2007 | ||
RO | 05.12.2007 | ||
SI | 05.12.2007 | ||
SK | 05.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/36] | CZ | 05.12.2007 | |
FI | 05.12.2007 | ||
SI | 05.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/26] | FI | 05.12.2007 | |
SI | 05.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/25] | FI | 05.12.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A] - KAPUST RACHEL B ET AL, "The P1' specificity of tobacco etch virus protease", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, (20020628), vol. 294, no. 5, ISSN 0006-291X, pages 949 - 955, XP002275331 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0006-291X(02)00574-0 | [X] - CHELIUS D ET AL, "Expression, purification and characterization of the structure and disulfide linkages of insulin-like growth factor binding protein-4", JOURNAL OF ENDOCRINOLOGY, (200102), vol. 168, no. 2, ISSN 0022-0795, pages 283 - 296, XP002275332 [X] 1-12 * abstract * * page 286, column R, paragraph 2 * * page 288 - page 290 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1677/joe.0.1680283 | [X] - WEIJLAND A ET AL, "THE PURIFICATION AND CHARACTERIZATION OF THE CATALYTIC DOMAIN OF SRC EXPRESSED IN SCHIZOSACCHAROMYCES POMBE COMPARISON OF UNPHOSPHORYLATED AND TYROSINE PHOSPHORYLATED SPECIES", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF BIOCHEMISTRY, BERLIN, DE, (1996), vol. 240, no. 3, ISSN 0014-2956, pages 756 - 764, XP001121077 [X] 1-12 * abstract * * figure 5; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1432-1033.1996.0756h.x | [X] - WEIJLAND A ET AL, "ELONGATION FACTOR TU D138N, A MUTANT WITH MODIFIED SUBSTRATE SPECIFICITY, AS A TOOL TO STUDY ENERGY CONSUMPTION IN PROTEIN BIOSYNTHESIS", BIOCHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. EASTON, PA, US, (1994), vol. 33, no. 35, ISSN 0006-2960, pages 10711 - 10717, XP001146119 [X] 1-8 * abstract * * page 10712, column L, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi00201a019 | Examination | US6027890 |