EP1546458 - RAINBOW FIBRES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 13.05.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.2017 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 01.03.2017 [2017/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states D W Spinks (Embossing) Ltd Unit 3 Hale Wharf, Ferry Lane, Tottenham London N17 9NF / GB | [2008/24] |
Former [2005/26] | For all designated states D W Spinks (Embossing) Ltd Unit 3 Hale Wharf, Ferry Lane, Tottenham London N17 9NF / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPINKS, Gary, D. 16 Fortis Green Avenue, Muswell Hill London N2 9NA / GB | [2005/26] | Representative(s) | Critten, Matthew Peter, et al Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Critten, Matthew Peter, et al Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street London, WC1R 4PQ / GB | ||
Former [2005/26] | Whiting, Gary, et al Abel & Imray, 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 03795055.7 | 28.08.2003 | [2005/26] | WO2003GB03706 | Priority number, date | GB20020021449 | 16.09.2002 Original published format: GB 0221449 | [2005/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004025028 | Date: | 25.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1546458 | Date: | 29.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.03.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1546458 | Date: | 11.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | D21H21/48, D06P1/00 | [2005/26] | CPC: |
D06P1/0012 (EP,US);
D06P1/0096 (EP,US);
D21H21/48 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1348 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24455 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24463 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24769 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24802 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24835 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24901 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249964 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249965 (EP,US);
Y10T428/29 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2915 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2933 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2965 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/26] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REGENBOGENFASERN | [2005/26] | English: | RAINBOW FIBRES | [2005/26] | French: | FIBRES IRISEES | [2005/26] | Entry into regional phase | 07.04.2005 | National basic fee paid | 07.04.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.04.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.04.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/26] | 10.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 24.04.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 24.04.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP08003077.8 / EP1930501 | EP14192929.9 / EP2860311 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
10.03.2009
17.03.2009
ADMISSIBLE Crane & Co., Inc. 30 South Street Dalton MA 01226 / US Opponent's representative Dummett Copp LLP, et al, et al 25 The Square Martlesham Heath GB-Ipswich IP5 3SL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/38] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.03.2009
17.03.2009
ADMISSIBLE Crane&Co., Inc. 30 South Street Dalton MA 01226 / US Opponent's representative Dummett Copp LLP, et al, et al 25 The Square Martlesham Heath GB-Ipswich IP5 3SL / GB | ||
Former [2009/16] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.03.2009
Crane&Co., Inc. 30 South Street Dalton MA 01226 / US Opponent's representative Gemmell, Peter Alan, et al, et al Dummett Copp 25 The Square Martlesham Heath Ipswich IP5 3SL Suffolk / GB | 17.04.2009 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 20.10.2009 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 23.10.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.11.2012 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 12.11.2012 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 09.05.2016 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2016/24] | Appeal following opposition | 11.01.2013 | Appeal received No. T0123/13 | 19.03.2013 | Statement of grounds filed | 09.05.2016 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 24.04.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 24.04.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 11.06.2008 | DK | 11.06.2008 | EE | 11.06.2008 | RO | 11.06.2008 | SK | 11.06.2008 | LU | 28.08.2008 | MC | 31.08.2008 | BG | 11.09.2008 | [2017/09] |
Former [2016/21] | CY | 11.06.2008 | |
DK | 11.06.2008 | ||
EE | 11.06.2008 | ||
RO | 11.06.2008 | ||
SK | 11.06.2008 | ||
LU | 28.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
BG | 11.09.2008 | ||
IT | 28.08.2015 | ||
Former [2010/34] | CY | 11.06.2008 | |
DK | 11.06.2008 | ||
EE | 11.06.2008 | ||
RO | 11.06.2008 | ||
SK | 11.06.2008 | ||
LU | 28.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
BG | 11.09.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | DK | 11.06.2008 | |
EE | 11.06.2008 | ||
RO | 11.06.2008 | ||
SK | 11.06.2008 | ||
LU | 28.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
BG | 11.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | DK | 11.06.2008 | |
EE | 11.06.2008 | ||
RO | 11.06.2008 | ||
SK | 11.06.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
BG | 11.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | DK | 11.06.2008 | |
EE | 11.06.2008 | ||
RO | 11.06.2008 | ||
SK | 11.06.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/20] | DK | 11.06.2008 | |
RO | 11.06.2008 | ||
SK | 11.06.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/16] | RO | 11.06.2008 | |
SK | 11.06.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB1095286 (PORTALS LTD, et al); | [A]US4655788 (JALON MICHEL [FR]); | [YA]EP0342929 (WIGGINS TEAPE GROUP LTD [GB]) [Y] 1,7,18,24,35,36 * the whole document * [A] 15,17,32,34; | [YA]US4897300 (BOEHM MICHAEL [DE]) [Y] 1,7,18,24,36 * the whole document * [A] 2-6,9-14,19-23,26-31; | [Y]EP0388090 (DE LA RUE CO PLC [GB]) [Y] 1,7,18,24,36 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0520060 (NACIONAL MONEDA TIMBRE [ES]) [Y] 1,7,18,24,35,36 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9945200 (KOREA SECURITY PRINTING AND MI [KR], et al) [A] 1-36 * the whole document * |