EP1541911 - MATERIAL FOR GLAND PACKING AND THE GLAND PACKING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.06.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON PILLAR PACKING CO., LTD. 11-48, Nonakaminami 2-chome, Yodogawa-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 532-0022 / JP | [2005/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UEDA, Takahisa, Nippon Pillar Packing Co., Ltd. 11-48, Nonakaminami 2-chome, Yodogawa-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 532-0022 / JP | 02 /
FUJIWARA, Masaru, Nippon Pillar Packing Co., Ltd. Sanda Factory, 541-1, Aza-Utsuba, Shimouchigami Sanda-shi, Hyogo 669-1333 / JP | [2005/24] | Representative(s) | Fleuchaus, Michael A. Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechsanwälte Steinerstraße 15/Haus A 81369 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/24] | Fleuchaus, Michael A. Fleuchaus & Gallo, Melchiorstrasse 42 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03795335.3 | 09.09.2003 | [2005/24] | WO2003JP11504 | Priority number, date | JP20020265877 | 11.09.2002 Original published format: JP 2002265877 | JP20020265878 | 11.09.2002 Original published format: JP 2002265878 | JP20020265879 | 11.09.2002 Original published format: JP 2002265879 | JP20020265880 | 11.09.2002 Original published format: JP 2002265880 | [2005/24] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004025151 | Date: | 25.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1541911 | Date: | 15.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.03.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1541911 | Date: | 01.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.03.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F16J15/22, D02G3/06 | [2006/10] | CPC: |
F16J15/22 (EP,KR,US);
D02G3/06 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/24] | F16J15/22 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/01] |
Former [2005/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | MATERIAL FÜR STOPFBUCHSE UND STOPFBUCHSE | [2005/24] | English: | MATERIAL FOR GLAND PACKING AND THE GLAND PACKING | [2005/24] | French: | MATERIAU POUR GARNITURE D'ETANCHEITE ET GARNITURE D'ETANCHEITE | [2005/24] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2005 | Translation filed | 11.04.2005 | National basic fee paid | 11.04.2005 | Search fee paid | 11.04.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.04.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/24] | 11.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.06.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 15.06.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1179698 (NIPPON PILLAR PACKING [JP]) [X] 1-5,8-11 * paragraphs [0015] , [0016] , [0021] , [0023] * * figures 3A,3B *; | [X]EP1193428 (NIPPON PILLAR PACKING [JP]) [X] 1-5,8-11 * paragraphs [0006] , [0015] , [0016] , [0021] , [0028] , [0040] * * figures 6C,7D,17 *; | [X]US2002069635 (TSUKAMOTO KATSURO [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,6-11 * paragraphs [0014] , [0101] , [0110] , [0111] , [0114] , [0131] , [0135] ** figures 1-3 * | International search | [X]WO0148402 (NIPPON PILLAR PACKING [JP], et al); | [X]GB2285067 (T & N TECHNOLOGY LTD [GB]); | [X]WO0148403 (NIPPON PILLAR PACKING [JP], et al); | [Y]JPH05118444 (NIPPON PILLAR PACKING); | [Y]JPH03249482 (NIPPON PILLAR PACKING); | [Y]JP2002129440 (JAPAN MATEKKUSU KK); | [Y]JPH10132086 (NIPPON PILLAR PACKING) | by applicant | JPH0627546 | JPH0674346 |