EP1540271 - METHOD FOR MEASURING CONTOUR VARIATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.03.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nederlandse Organisatie voor toegepast- natuurwetenschappelijk onderzoek TNO Anna van Buerenplein 1 2595 DA 's-Gravenhage / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2006/12] | For all designated states Nederlandse Organisatie voor Toegepast-Natuurwetenschappelijk Onderzoek TNO Schoemakerstraat 97 2628 VK Delft / NL | ||
Former [2005/24] | For all designated states Nederlandse Organisatie voor Toegepast-Natuurwetenschappelijk Onderzoek TNO Schoemakerstraat 97 2628 VK Delft / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAUNDERS, Ian Buiksloterbreek 7 NL-1034 XC Amsterdam / NL | 02 /
VAN BRUG, Hedser Waterbiesweg 58 NL-2548 WZ The Hague / NL | 03 /
KORPERSHOEK, Jacobus, Johannes Koekoekslaan 19 NL-3121 XJ Schiedam / NL | [2005/24] | Representative(s) | Winckels, Johannes Hubertus F., et al Vereenigde Postbus 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2005/24] | Winckels, Johannes Hubertus Franciscus, et al Vereenigde Postbus 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 03795501.0 | 12.09.2003 | [2005/24] | WO2003NL00634 | Priority number, date | NL20021021457 | 13.09.2002 Original published format: NL 1021457 | [2005/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004025216 | Date: | 25.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1540271 | Date: | 15.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.03.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1540271 | Date: | 22.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01B9/02, G01B11/24 | [2005/24] | CPC: |
G01B9/02098 (EP,US);
G01B11/2441 (EP,US);
G01B9/02081 (EP,US);
G01B9/02097 (EP,US);
G01B2290/45 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR MESSUNG VON KONTURVERûNDERUNGEN | [2005/24] | English: | METHOD FOR MEASURING CONTOUR VARIATIONS | [2005/24] | French: | PROCEDE DE MESURE DE VARIATIONS DE CONTOUR | [2005/24] | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.2005 | National basic fee paid | 18.03.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.03.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.04.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.03.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/24] | 22.08.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.03.2006 | BE | 22.03.2006 | CY | 22.03.2006 | CZ | 22.03.2006 | EE | 22.03.2006 | FI | 22.03.2006 | IT | 22.03.2006 | RO | 22.03.2006 | SI | 22.03.2006 | SK | 22.03.2006 | TR | 22.03.2006 | BG | 22.06.2006 | DK | 22.06.2006 | SE | 22.06.2006 | GR | 23.06.2006 | ES | 03.07.2006 | PT | 22.08.2006 | IE | 12.09.2006 | LU | 12.09.2006 | HU | 23.09.2006 | MC | 30.09.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 22.03.2006 | |
BE | 22.03.2006 | ||
CZ | 22.03.2006 | ||
EE | 22.03.2006 | ||
FI | 22.03.2006 | ||
IT | 22.03.2006 | ||
RO | 22.03.2006 | ||
SI | 22.03.2006 | ||
SK | 22.03.2006 | ||
TR | 22.03.2006 | ||
BG | 22.06.2006 | ||
DK | 22.06.2006 | ||
SE | 22.06.2006 | ||
GR | 23.06.2006 | ||
ES | 03.07.2006 | ||
PT | 22.08.2006 | ||
IE | 12.09.2006 | ||
LU | 12.09.2006 | ||
HU | 23.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2008/32] | AT | 22.03.2006 | |
BE | 22.03.2006 | ||
CZ | 22.03.2006 | ||
EE | 22.03.2006 | ||
FI | 22.03.2006 | ||
IT | 22.03.2006 | ||
RO | 22.03.2006 | ||
SI | 22.03.2006 | ||
SK | 22.03.2006 | ||
BG | 22.06.2006 | ||
DK | 22.06.2006 | ||
SE | 22.06.2006 | ||
GR | 23.06.2006 | ||
ES | 03.07.2006 | ||
PT | 22.08.2006 | ||
IE | 12.09.2006 | ||
HU | 23.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 22.03.2006 | |
BE | 22.03.2006 | ||
CZ | 22.03.2006 | ||
EE | 22.03.2006 | ||
FI | 22.03.2006 | ||
IT | 22.03.2006 | ||
RO | 22.03.2006 | ||
SI | 22.03.2006 | ||
SK | 22.03.2006 | ||
BG | 22.06.2006 | ||
DK | 22.06.2006 | ||
SE | 22.06.2006 | ||
GR | 23.06.2006 | ||
ES | 03.07.2006 | ||
PT | 22.08.2006 | ||
IE | 12.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 22.03.2006 | |
BE | 22.03.2006 | ||
CZ | 22.03.2006 | ||
IT | 22.03.2006 | ||
RO | 22.03.2006 | ||
SI | 22.03.2006 | ||
SK | 22.03.2006 | ||
BG | 22.06.2006 | ||
DK | 22.06.2006 | ||
SE | 22.06.2006 | ||
GR | 23.06.2006 | ||
ES | 03.07.2006 | ||
PT | 22.08.2006 | ||
IE | 12.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/42] | AT | 22.03.2006 | |
BE | 22.03.2006 | ||
IT | 22.03.2006 | ||
RO | 22.03.2006 | ||
SI | 22.03.2006 | ||
SK | 22.03.2006 | ||
BG | 22.06.2006 | ||
DK | 22.06.2006 | ||
SE | 22.06.2006 | ||
ES | 03.07.2006 | ||
PT | 22.08.2006 | ||
IE | 12.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/41] | AT | 22.03.2006 | |
BE | 22.03.2006 | ||
IT | 22.03.2006 | ||
RO | 22.03.2006 | ||
SI | 22.03.2006 | ||
SK | 22.03.2006 | ||
BG | 22.06.2006 | ||
DK | 22.06.2006 | ||
SE | 22.06.2006 | ||
ES | 03.07.2006 | ||
PT | 22.08.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/14] | AT | 22.03.2006 | |
BE | 22.03.2006 | ||
SI | 22.03.2006 | ||
SK | 22.03.2006 | ||
BG | 22.06.2006 | ||
DK | 22.06.2006 | ||
SE | 22.06.2006 | ||
ES | 03.07.2006 | ||
PT | 22.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | AT | 22.03.2006 | |
SI | 22.03.2006 | ||
SK | 22.03.2006 | ||
BG | 22.06.2006 | ||
SE | 22.06.2006 | ||
ES | 03.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | AT | 22.03.2006 | |
SI | 22.03.2006 | ||
BG | 22.06.2006 | ||
SE | 22.06.2006 | ||
ES | 03.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | AT | 22.03.2006 | |
SI | 22.03.2006 | ||
BG | 22.06.2006 | ||
SE | 22.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/46] | AT | 22.03.2006 | |
SI | 22.03.2006 | ||
SE | 22.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/43] | AT | 22.03.2006 | |
SI | 22.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/40] | SI | 22.03.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH04310847 ; | [XD] - HEDSER VAN BRUG, "Temporal phase unwrapping and its application in shearography systems", APPLIED OPTICS, (19981001), vol. 37, no. 28, pages 6701 - 6706, XP002244333 [XD] 1,14 * page 6705; figures 6,7 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930318), vol. 017, no. 132, Database accession no. (P - 1504), & JP04310847 A 19921102 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO LTD) [A] 1,14 * abstract * |