EP1540402 - MAGNETIC OPTICAL ELEMENT HOLDER AND MICROSCOPE ASSEMBLY INCLUDING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.09.2007 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Leica Microsystems CMS GmbH CPTD Ernst-Leitz-Strasse 17-37 35578 Wetzlar / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/28] | For all designated states Leica Microsystems CMS GmbH Ernst-Leitz-Strasse 17-37 35578 Wetzlar / DE | ||
Former [2005/24] | For all designated states Leica Microsystems, Inc. 3362 Walden Avenue Depew, NY 14043-2437 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BONAVENTURA, Russell 258 Cindy Drive Williamsville, NY 14221 / US | [2005/37] |
Former [2005/24] | 01 /
BONAVENTURA, Russell 7559 Lower East Hill Road Colden, NY 14033 / US | Representative(s) | Reichert, Werner Franz, et al Leica Microsystems GmbH Corporate Patents and Trademarks Ernst-Leitz-Strasse 17-37 35578 Wetzlar / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | Reichert, Werner Franz, et al Leica Microsystems GmbH Corporate Patents and Trademarks Ernst-Leitz-Strasse 17-37 35578 Wetzlar / DE | ||
Former [2005/24] | Reichert, Werner F., Dr., et al Leica Microsystems AG, Konzernstelle Patente + Marken, Ernst-Leitz-Strasse 17-37 35578 Wetzlar / DE | Application number, filing date | 03795619.0 | 20.08.2003 | [2005/24] | WO2003US26225 | Priority number, date | US20020244354 | 16.09.2002 Original published format: US 244354 | [2005/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004025329 | Date: | 25.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/13] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1540402 | Date: | 15.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.03.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.05.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G02B7/02, G02B21/06 | [2005/24] | CPC: |
G02B21/06 (EP,US);
G02B7/006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/35] |
Former [2005/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HALTER FÜR EIN MAGNETISCH-OPTISCHES ELEMENT UND MIKROSKOPBAUGRUPPE DAMIT | [2005/24] | English: | MAGNETIC OPTICAL ELEMENT HOLDER AND MICROSCOPE ASSEMBLY INCLUDING SAME | [2005/24] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE MAINTIEN MAGNETIQUE POUR ELEMENT OPTIQUE, ET ENSEMBLE MICROSCOPE POURVU D'UN TEL DISPOSITIF | [2005/24] | Entry into regional phase | 09.06.2004 | National basic fee paid | 09.06.2004 | Search fee paid | 05.07.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.07.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.04.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.05.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 05.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/35] | 27.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.05.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/43] | 11.06.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 05.07.2005 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   05.07.2005 | 05.07.2005 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   05.07.2005 | 05.07.2005 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   05.07.2005 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 27.05.2005 | M02   Fee paid on   05.07.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3202053 (LAWLER WILLIAM F) [X] 1-14 * figure - * * column 1, line 11 - line 23 * * column 2, line 17 - line 70 *; | [A]US3285127 (HORST PILLER) [A] 1-14 * figures 1,2 * * column 1, line 13 - line 47 *; | [A]DE19702754 (ZEISS CARL JENA GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-14 * abstract ** column 1, line 3 - line 50 *; | [X]US5933287 (MUELLER ROLAND [DE]) [X] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [X]US2002015225 (UE YOSHIHIRO [JP]) [X] 12-14 * figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0091] - paragraph [0099] * | International search | [X]US5933287 (MUELLER ROLAND [DE]); | [A]US5619293 (USUI KAZUTOSHI [JP]) |