EP1570148 - COMBINED DRIVE UNIT FOR AT LEAST ONE ASSEMBLY AND A DOOR LOCK IN A MOTOR VEHICLE DOOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.12.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 13.04.2011 [2011/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kiekert Aktiengesellschaft Kettwiger Strasse 12-24 42579 Heiligenhaus / DE | [2005/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MENKE, Johannes-Theodor Am Nordhang 85 42551 Velbert / DE | 02 /
ZIMMERMANN, Gerhard Konrad-Adenauer-Str. 26 42553 Velbert / DE | 03 /
REDDMANN, Uwe Danziger Str. 24 45145 Essen / DE | 04 /
OSTERMANN, Wilfried Fischlaker Str. 82 45239 Essen / DE | 05 /
SCHIFFER, Holger Eschendonk 10 40668 Meerbusch / DE | 06 /
ARMBRUSTER, Stefan Hauptstr. 136 42579 Heiligenhaus / DE | 07 /
JOKIEL, Christian Werkerhofstr. 16 42579 Heiligenhaus / DE | 08 /
KILL, Jürgen Balthasarstr. 11 50670 Köln / DE | [2005/36] | Application number, filing date | 03795739.6 | 01.12.2003 | [2005/36] | WO2003DE03969 | Priority number, date | DE2002158566 | 14.12.2002 Original published format: DE 10258566 | [2005/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004055310 | Date: | 01.07.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1570148 | Date: | 07.09.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1570148 | Date: | 17.02.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | E05F15/16 | [2005/36] | CPC: |
E05B81/25 (EP);
E05F15/689 (EP);
E05B53/008 (EP);
E05B81/13 (EP);
E05F15/697 (EP);
E05Y2201/434 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2006/14] |
Former [2005/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOMBINIERTE ANTRIEBSEINHEIT FÜR WENIGSTENS EIN AGGREGAT UND EIN TÜRSCHLOSS IN EINER KRAFTFAHRZEUGTÜR | [2005/36] | English: | COMBINED DRIVE UNIT FOR AT LEAST ONE ASSEMBLY AND A DOOR LOCK IN A MOTOR VEHICLE DOOR | [2005/36] | French: | UNITE D'ENTRAINEMENT COMBINEE POUR AU MOINS UN ORGANE ET UNE SERRURE DE PORTIERE DANS UN VEHICULE A MOTEUR | [2005/36] | Entry into regional phase | 03.06.2005 | National basic fee paid | 03.06.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.06.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/36] | 17.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 08.10.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 08.10.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.11.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/04] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 08.10.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 08.10.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.11.2009 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 17.02.2010 | [2011/15] | Cited in | International search | [X]US6107759 (MILLER ROBIN MIHEKUM) [X] 1,2,4,8,9 * column 4, line 5 - line 54; figures 2-4 *; | [X]US6412223 (HIEBL JOHANN) [X] 1,9,10 * column 2, line 56 - column 3, line 19; figure 2 * |