EP1558782 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR THE EVAPORATIVE DEPOSITION OF A HIGH-TEMPERATURE SUPERCONDUCTOR IN A VACUUM WITH CONTINUOUS MATERIAL INTRODUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.03.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 30.09.2009 [2009/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Theva Dünnschichttechnik GmbH Rote-Kreuz-Strasse 8 85737 Ismaning / DE | [2006/13] |
Former [2005/31] | For all designated states Theva Dünnschichttechnik GmbH Rote-Kreuz-Strasse 8 85737 Ismaning / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KINDER, Helmut Hohenbachernstrasse 55 85354 Freising / DE | [2005/31] | Representative(s) | Hess, Peter K. G. Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/31] | Hess, Peter K., Dipl.-Phys. Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenberg . Geissler Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03795784.2 | 15.10.2003 | [2005/31] | WO2003EP11428 | Priority number, date | EP20020024901 | 05.11.2002 Original published format: EP 02024901 | [2005/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004041985 | Date: | 21.05.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/21] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1558782 | Date: | 03.08.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.05.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1558782 | Date: | 29.03.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C23C14/28, C23C14/24 | [2005/31] | CPC: |
C23C14/30 (EP,KR,US);
C23C14/0021 (EP,KR,US);
C23C14/08 (EP,US);
C23C14/221 (KR);
C23C14/246 (EP,KR,US);
C23C14/34 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM AUFDAMPFEN EINES HOCHTEMPERATURSUPRALEITERS IM VAKUUM MIT KONTINUIERLICHER MATERIALNACHFÜHRUNG | [2005/31] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR THE EVAPORATIVE DEPOSITION OF A HIGH-TEMPERATURE SUPERCONDUCTOR IN A VACUUM WITH CONTINUOUS MATERIAL INTRODUCTION | [2005/31] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DE DEPOT EN PHASE VAPEUR SOUS VIDE D'UN SUPRACONDUCTEUR À HAUTE TEMPÉRATURE AVEC REMPLISSAGE DE MATÉRIAU AUTOMATIQUE | [2005/42] |
Former [2005/31] | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DE DEPOT EN PHASE VAPEUR D'UN MATERIAU DE REVETEMENT | Entry into regional phase | 12.05.2005 | National basic fee paid | 12.05.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.05.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.06.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/31] | 19.07.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.09.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 29.03.2006 | CZ | 29.03.2006 | EE | 29.03.2006 | FI | 29.03.2006 | IE | 29.03.2006 | NL | 29.03.2006 | RO | 29.03.2006 | SI | 29.03.2006 | SK | 29.03.2006 | TR | 29.03.2006 | BG | 29.06.2006 | DK | 29.06.2006 | SE | 29.06.2006 | GR | 30.06.2006 | ES | 10.07.2006 | PT | 29.08.2006 | HU | 30.09.2006 | AT | 15.10.2006 | LU | 15.10.2006 | BE | 31.10.2006 | MC | 31.10.2006 | [2009/40] |
Former [2009/03] | CY | 29.03.2006 | |
CZ | 29.03.2006 | ||
EE | 29.03.2006 | ||
FI | 29.03.2006 | ||
IE | 29.03.2006 | ||
NL | 29.03.2006 | ||
RO | 29.03.2006 | ||
SI | 29.03.2006 | ||
SK | 29.03.2006 | ||
TR | 29.03.2006 | ||
BG | 29.06.2006 | ||
DK | 29.06.2006 | ||
SE | 29.06.2006 | ||
GR | 30.06.2006 | ||
ES | 10.07.2006 | ||
PT | 29.08.2006 | ||
HU | 30.09.2006 | ||
AT | 15.10.2006 | ||
LU | 15.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/37] | CZ | 29.03.2006 | |
EE | 29.03.2006 | ||
FI | 29.03.2006 | ||
IE | 29.03.2006 | ||
NL | 29.03.2006 | ||
RO | 29.03.2006 | ||
SI | 29.03.2006 | ||
SK | 29.03.2006 | ||
TR | 29.03.2006 | ||
BG | 29.06.2006 | ||
DK | 29.06.2006 | ||
SE | 29.06.2006 | ||
GR | 30.06.2006 | ||
ES | 10.07.2006 | ||
PT | 29.08.2006 | ||
HU | 30.09.2006 | ||
AT | 15.10.2006 | ||
LU | 15.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/32] | CZ | 29.03.2006 | |
EE | 29.03.2006 | ||
FI | 29.03.2006 | ||
IE | 29.03.2006 | ||
NL | 29.03.2006 | ||
RO | 29.03.2006 | ||
SI | 29.03.2006 | ||
SK | 29.03.2006 | ||
BG | 29.06.2006 | ||
DK | 29.06.2006 | ||
SE | 29.06.2006 | ||
GR | 30.06.2006 | ||
ES | 10.07.2006 | ||
PT | 29.08.2006 | ||
HU | 30.09.2006 | ||
AT | 15.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CZ | 29.03.2006 | |
EE | 29.03.2006 | ||
FI | 29.03.2006 | ||
IE | 29.03.2006 | ||
NL | 29.03.2006 | ||
RO | 29.03.2006 | ||
SI | 29.03.2006 | ||
SK | 29.03.2006 | ||
BG | 29.06.2006 | ||
DK | 29.06.2006 | ||
SE | 29.06.2006 | ||
GR | 30.06.2006 | ||
ES | 10.07.2006 | ||
PT | 29.08.2006 | ||
AT | 15.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | CZ | 29.03.2006 | |
IE | 29.03.2006 | ||
NL | 29.03.2006 | ||
RO | 29.03.2006 | ||
SI | 29.03.2006 | ||
SK | 29.03.2006 | ||
BG | 29.06.2006 | ||
DK | 29.06.2006 | ||
SE | 29.06.2006 | ||
GR | 30.06.2006 | ||
ES | 10.07.2006 | ||
PT | 29.08.2006 | ||
AT | 15.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/14] | IE | 29.03.2006 | |
NL | 29.03.2006 | ||
RO | 29.03.2006 | ||
SI | 29.03.2006 | ||
SK | 29.03.2006 | ||
BG | 29.06.2006 | ||
DK | 29.06.2006 | ||
SE | 29.06.2006 | ||
ES | 10.07.2006 | ||
PT | 29.08.2006 | ||
AT | 15.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/50] | IE | 29.03.2006 | |
NL | 29.03.2006 | ||
RO | 29.03.2006 | ||
SI | 29.03.2006 | ||
SK | 29.03.2006 | ||
BG | 29.06.2006 | ||
DK | 29.06.2006 | ||
SE | 29.06.2006 | ||
ES | 10.07.2006 | ||
PT | 29.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/41] | IE | 29.03.2006 | |
IT | 29.03.2006 | ||
NL | 29.03.2006 | ||
RO | 29.03.2006 | ||
SI | 29.03.2006 | ||
SK | 29.03.2006 | ||
BG | 29.06.2006 | ||
DK | 29.06.2006 | ||
SE | 29.06.2006 | ||
ES | 10.07.2006 | ||
PT | 29.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/20] | IE | 29.03.2006 | |
NL | 29.03.2006 | ||
SI | 29.03.2006 | ||
SK | 29.03.2006 | ||
BG | 29.06.2006 | ||
DK | 29.06.2006 | ||
SE | 29.06.2006 | ||
ES | 10.07.2006 | ||
PT | 29.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/14] | IE | 29.03.2006 | |
SI | 29.03.2006 | ||
SK | 29.03.2006 | ||
BG | 29.06.2006 | ||
DK | 29.06.2006 | ||
SE | 29.06.2006 | ||
ES | 10.07.2006 | ||
PT | 29.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | SI | 29.03.2006 | |
SK | 29.03.2006 | ||
BG | 29.06.2006 | ||
SE | 29.06.2006 | ||
ES | 10.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | SI | 29.03.2006 | |
BG | 29.06.2006 | ||
SE | 29.06.2006 | ||
ES | 10.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | SI | 29.03.2006 | |
BG | 29.06.2006 | ||
SE | 29.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/46] | SI | 29.03.2006 | |
SE | 29.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/40] | SI | 29.03.2006 | Cited in | International search | [XY]JPH01108364 ; | [XY]JPH01108363 ; | [X]JPS613880 ; | [Y]JPH01264114 ; | [A]JPH0995775 ; | [Y]JPH1186647 ; | [Y]US3654109 (HOHL JAKOB H, et al) [Y] 19,20 * column 5, line 1 - line 20 * * column 7, line 42 - line 44 * * column 8, line 36 - line 43 *; | [XY]DE2513813 (AIRCO INC) [X] 1-4,9-13,16,18 * page 3 - page 5; figures 1-3 * [Y] 5-7,17,19-27; | [Y]US4381894 (GOGOL JR CARL A, et al) [Y] 19,20 * column 2; figure 1 *; | [Y]US5254832 (GARTNER GEORG [DE], et al) [Y] 5-7 * abstract * * column 3, line 13 - line 17 * * column 7, line 21 - line 25 * * column 9, line 5 - line 13 * * column 11, line 5 - line 17; figure 5 *; | [Y]WO9822635 (MICRON TECHNOLOGY INC [US]) [Y] 8 * page 1 - page 4; figure 3 *; | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890725), vol. 013, no. 331, Database accession no. (C - 622), & JP01108364 A 19890425 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND CO LTD) [X] 1-4,9-13,16,18 * abstract * [Y] 5-7,17,19-27 | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890725), vol. 013, no. 331, Database accession no. (C - 622), & JP01108363 A 19890425 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND CO LTD) [X] 1-4,9-13,16,18 * abstract * [Y] 5-7,17,19-27 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860527), vol. 010, no. 144, Database accession no. (C - 349), & JP61003880 A 19860109 (TAIYOU YUUDEN KK) [X] 1,13,16 * abstract * | [XDY] - DAVIS M F ET AL, "ELECTRON BEAM FLASH EVAPORATION FOR YBACUO AND BICASRCUO THIN FILMS", JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS. NEW YORK, US, (19891115), vol. 66, no. 10, ISSN 0021-8979, pages 4903 - 4908, XP000105104 [XD] 28 * the whole document * [Y] 23-27 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.343759 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900117), vol. 014, no. 022, Database accession no. (E - 874), & JP01264114 A 19891020 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC IND LTD) [Y] 17 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970829), vol. 1997, no. 08, & JP09095775 A 19970408 (CHUGAI RO CO LTD) [A] 13-15 * abstract * | [Y] - LEE S-G ET AL, "DEPOSITION ANGLE-DEPENDENT MORPHOLOGY OF LASER DEPOSITED YBA2CU3O7 THIN FILMS", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS. NEW YORK, US, (19940808), vol. 65, no. 6, ISSN 0003-6951, pages 764 - 766, XP000464593 [Y] 8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.112223 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990630), vol. 1999, no. 08, & JP11086647 A 19990330 (FUJIKURA LTD) [Y] 21,22 * abstract * |