10.06.2016 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2016 [2016/28] |
14.08.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.09.2015 [2015/38] |
24.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] |
17.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] |
03.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] |
27.02.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.04.2015 [2015/14] |
24.10.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.11.2014 [2014/48] |
10.10.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.11.2014 [2014/46] |
05.09.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.10.2014 [2014/41] |
22.08.2014 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 24.09.2014 [2014/39] |
15.08.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.09.2014 [2014/38] |
08.08.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.09.2014 [2014/37] |
01.08.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.09.2014 [2014/36] |
06.06.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.07.2014 [2014/28] |
23.05.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.06.2014 [2014/26] |
09.05.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.06.2014 [2014/24] |
25.04.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.05.2014 [2014/22] |
13.09.2013 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] |
06.09.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
06.09.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
24.06.2013 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
21.06.2013 |
Change - French title |
published on 24.07.2013 [2013/30] |
09.01.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.02.2012 |
Change - applicant |
published on 14.03.2012 [2012/11] |
10.01.2012 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
29.12.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.08.2011 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
29.11.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.06.2010 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
26.03.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
24.11.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.09.2009 |
Change - representative |
published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] |
25.11.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.01.2008 |
Change: Reply to examination report |
|
15.01.2008 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
09.11.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.09.2007 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
13.07.2007 |
First examination report |
|
11.07.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
08.12.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.02.2006 |
Change - extension states |
published on 12.04.2006 [2006/15] |
21.10.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.07.2005 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 14.09.2005 [2005/37] |
29.07.2005 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 14.09.2005 [2005/37] |
22.06.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.06.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.02.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.10.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.09.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.08.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.08.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.04.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|