EP1573305 - SAMPLE-HOLDER FOR MEASURING DRAFT AND MOISTURE IN POROUS OBJECTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.2014 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2016 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): GR | published on 13.07.2016 [2016/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hauni Maschinenbau AG Kurt-A.-Körber-Chaussee 8-32 21033 Hamburg / DE | [2012/11] |
Former [2005/37] | For all designated states SOCIETE NATIONALE D'EXPLOITATION INDUSTRIELLE DES TABACS ET ALLUMETTES (S.E.I.T.A.) 182-188, avenue de France 75013 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHOLET, Georges 11 rue Mathurin Régnier F-45140 Ormes / FR | 02 /
POULET, Jean-Rémi 20 rue Carnot F-45400 Fleury Les Aubrais / FR | 03 /
VERSTICHEL, Gwennael 490 rue Peynault F-45200 Amilly / FR | [2005/37] | Representative(s) | de Saint-Palais, Arnaud Marie, et al Cabinet Moutard 35 Rue de la Paroisse B.P. 20513 78005 Versailles Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/42] | de Saint-Palais, Arnaud Marie, et al Cabinet Moutard 35 Rue de la Paroisse B.P. 20513 78005 Versailles Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2005/37] | de Saint-Palais, Arnaud Marie, et al Cabinet Moutard, 35, rue de la Paroisse 78000 Versailles / FR | Application number, filing date | 03796167.9 | 04.12.2003 | [2005/37] | WO2003FR03596 | Priority number, date | FR20020016254 | 18.12.2002 Original published format: FR 0216254 | [2005/37] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004065948 | Date: | 05.08.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/32] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1573305 | Date: | 14.09.2005 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1573305 | Date: | 16.10.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01N22/04 | [2005/37] | CPC: |
G01N22/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/37] | Title | German: | PROBENTRÄGER ZUR MESSUNG DES ZUGES UND DER FEUCHTE VON PORÖSEN OBJEKTEN | [2005/37] | English: | SAMPLE-HOLDER FOR MEASURING DRAFT AND MOISTURE IN POROUS OBJECTS | [2005/37] | French: | PORTE-ECHANTILLON POUR LA MESURE DU TIRAGE ET DE L'HUMIDITE D'OBJETS POREUX | [2013/30] |
Former [2005/37] | PORTE-ECHANTILLON POUR LA MESURE DU TIRAGE ET DE L HUMIDITE D OBJETS POREUX | Entry into regional phase | 10.06.2005 | National basic fee paid | 10.06.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.06.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.06.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/37] | 13.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 03.09.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.07.2007 | Opposition(s) | 17.07.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.12.2003 | AT | 16.10.2013 | BG | 16.10.2013 | CY | 16.10.2013 | CZ | 16.10.2013 | DK | 16.10.2013 | EE | 16.10.2013 | ES | 16.10.2013 | FI | 16.10.2013 | MC | 16.10.2013 | RO | 16.10.2013 | SE | 16.10.2013 | SI | 16.10.2013 | SK | 16.10.2013 | TR | 16.10.2013 | IE | 04.12.2013 | LU | 04.12.2013 | BE | 31.12.2013 | CH | 31.12.2013 | LI | 31.12.2013 | GR | 17.01.2014 | PT | 17.02.2014 | [2016/28] |
Former [2015/38] | HU | 04.12.2003 | |
AT | 16.10.2013 | ||
BG | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
GR | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SI | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
TR | 16.10.2013 | ||
IE | 04.12.2013 | ||
LU | 04.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/34] | HU | 04.12.2003 | |
AT | 16.10.2013 | ||
BG | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SI | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
TR | 16.10.2013 | ||
IE | 04.12.2013 | ||
LU | 04.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SI | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
TR | 16.10.2013 | ||
IE | 04.12.2013 | ||
LU | 04.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SI | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
IE | 04.12.2013 | ||
LU | 04.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
IE | 04.12.2013 | ||
LU | 04.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
LU | 04.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
LU | 04.12.2013 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
LU | 04.12.2013 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
LU | 04.12.2013 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 16.10.2013 | |
SE | 16.10.2013 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3360721 (PULLMAN JAMES O) [A] 1-5 * figures 1-3; claim 1 *; | [Y]US3783373 (JAWOR T) [Y] 1 * abstract * * column 2, line 48 - column 3, line 35; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US4246774 (FLESSELLES JACQUES, et al) [Y] 1 * abstract * * column 2, line 57 - column 3, line 49; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US4522214 (OSMALOV JEROME S [US]) [A] 1-5 * abstract *; | [A]US5977780 (HERRMANN RAINER [DE]) [A] 1-5 * abstract * * column 3, line 55 - column 5, line 28; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0967479 (ALLEN BRADLEY CO [US]) [A] 1-5 * abstract *; | [A]DE10037180 (REEMTSMA H F & PH [DE]) [A] 1-5* abstract * |