EP1530492 - METHOD FOR IMMOBILIZING HYDROGEL-BONDING POLYMERS ON POLYMER SUBSTRATE SURFACES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.04.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fresenius Medical Care Deutschland GmbH Else-Kröner-Strasse 1 61352 Bad Homburg v.d.H. / DE | [2005/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DRÖSCHEL, Stefan Lisbet-Dill-Strasse 8 66125 Saarbrücken / DE | 02 /
FISLAGE, Rainer Max-Müller-Strasse 23 66606 St. Wendel / DE | [2005/20] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/20] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03797209.8 | 24.07.2003 | [2005/20] | WO2003EP08180 | Priority number, date | DE2002138559 | 22.08.2002 Original published format: DE 10238559 | [2005/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004026356 | Date: | 01.04.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1530492 | Date: | 18.05.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1530492 | Date: | 24.06.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61L29/08, A61L29/14, A61L31/10, A61L31/14, G03F7/028 | [2005/20] | CPC: |
A61L31/10 (EP,US);
A61L29/085 (EP,US);
A61L29/145 (EP,US);
A61L31/145 (EP,US);
G03F7/031 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31507 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31551 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/20] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR IMMOBILISIERUNG VON HYDROGEL-BILDENDEN POLYMEREN AUF POLYMERSUBSTRATOBERFLAECHEN | [2005/20] | English: | METHOD FOR IMMOBILIZING HYDROGEL-BONDING POLYMERS ON POLYMER SUBSTRATE SURFACES | [2005/20] | French: | PROCEDE POUR IMMOBILISER DES POLYMERES FORMANT UN HYDROGEL SUR DES SURFACES DE SUBSTRAT POLYMERE | [2005/20] | Entry into regional phase | 30.12.2004 | National basic fee paid | 30.12.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.12.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.02.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/20] | 01.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 15.01.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 30.01.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.04.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 23.04.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 24.06.2009 | CZ | 24.06.2009 | DK | 24.06.2009 | EE | 24.06.2009 | FI | 24.06.2009 | IE | 24.06.2009 | NL | 24.06.2009 | RO | 24.06.2009 | SI | 24.06.2009 | SK | 24.06.2009 | TR | 24.06.2009 | AT | 24.07.2009 | LU | 24.07.2009 | BE | 31.07.2009 | CH | 31.07.2009 | LI | 31.07.2009 | MC | 31.07.2009 | BG | 24.09.2009 | SE | 24.09.2009 | GR | 25.09.2009 | PT | 24.10.2009 | HU | 25.12.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/31] | CZ | 24.06.2009 | |
DK | 24.06.2009 | ||
EE | 24.06.2009 | ||
FI | 24.06.2009 | ||
IE | 24.06.2009 | ||
NL | 24.06.2009 | ||
RO | 24.06.2009 | ||
SI | 24.06.2009 | ||
SK | 24.06.2009 | ||
AT | 24.07.2009 | ||
LU | 24.07.2009 | ||
BE | 31.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
BG | 24.09.2009 | ||
SE | 24.09.2009 | ||
GR | 25.09.2009 | ||
PT | 24.10.2009 | ||
HU | 25.12.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | CZ | 24.06.2009 | |
DK | 24.06.2009 | ||
EE | 24.06.2009 | ||
FI | 24.06.2009 | ||
IE | 24.06.2009 | ||
NL | 24.06.2009 | ||
RO | 24.06.2009 | ||
SI | 24.06.2009 | ||
SK | 24.06.2009 | ||
AT | 24.07.2009 | ||
LU | 24.07.2009 | ||
BE | 31.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
BG | 24.09.2009 | ||
SE | 24.09.2009 | ||
GR | 25.09.2009 | ||
PT | 24.10.2009 | ||
Former [2011/13] | CZ | 24.06.2009 | |
DK | 24.06.2009 | ||
EE | 24.06.2009 | ||
FI | 24.06.2009 | ||
IE | 24.06.2009 | ||
NL | 24.06.2009 | ||
RO | 24.06.2009 | ||
SI | 24.06.2009 | ||
SK | 24.06.2009 | ||
AT | 24.07.2009 | ||
BE | 31.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
BG | 24.09.2009 | ||
SE | 24.09.2009 | ||
GR | 25.09.2009 | ||
PT | 24.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/49] | CZ | 24.06.2009 | |
DK | 24.06.2009 | ||
EE | 24.06.2009 | ||
FI | 24.06.2009 | ||
IE | 24.06.2009 | ||
NL | 24.06.2009 | ||
SI | 24.06.2009 | ||
SK | 24.06.2009 | ||
AT | 24.07.2009 | ||
BE | 31.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
BG | 24.09.2009 | ||
SE | 24.09.2009 | ||
GR | 25.09.2009 | ||
PT | 24.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/29] | CZ | 24.06.2009 | |
DK | 24.06.2009 | ||
EE | 24.06.2009 | ||
FI | 24.06.2009 | ||
IE | 24.06.2009 | ||
NL | 24.06.2009 | ||
SI | 24.06.2009 | ||
SK | 24.06.2009 | ||
BE | 31.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
BG | 24.09.2009 | ||
SE | 24.09.2009 | ||
PT | 24.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | CZ | 24.06.2009 | |
DK | 24.06.2009 | ||
EE | 24.06.2009 | ||
FI | 24.06.2009 | ||
IE | 24.06.2009 | ||
NL | 24.06.2009 | ||
SI | 24.06.2009 | ||
SK | 24.06.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
BG | 24.09.2009 | ||
SE | 24.09.2009 | ||
PT | 24.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | CZ | 24.06.2009 | |
DK | 24.06.2009 | ||
EE | 24.06.2009 | ||
FI | 24.06.2009 | ||
IE | 24.06.2009 | ||
NL | 24.06.2009 | ||
SI | 24.06.2009 | ||
SK | 24.06.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
BG | 24.09.2009 | ||
SE | 24.09.2009 | ||
PT | 24.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | CZ | 24.06.2009 | |
EE | 24.06.2009 | ||
FI | 24.06.2009 | ||
NL | 24.06.2009 | ||
SI | 24.06.2009 | ||
SK | 24.06.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
BG | 24.09.2009 | ||
SE | 24.09.2009 | ||
PT | 24.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | CZ | 24.06.2009 | |
EE | 24.06.2009 | ||
FI | 24.06.2009 | ||
NL | 24.06.2009 | ||
SI | 24.06.2009 | ||
SK | 24.06.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
SE | 24.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | CZ | 24.06.2009 | |
EE | 24.06.2009 | ||
FI | 24.06.2009 | ||
NL | 24.06.2009 | ||
SI | 24.06.2009 | ||
SK | 24.06.2009 | ||
SE | 24.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | CZ | 24.06.2009 | |
EE | 24.06.2009 | ||
FI | 24.06.2009 | ||
SI | 24.06.2009 | ||
SE | 24.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/51] | FI | 24.06.2009 | |
SI | 24.06.2009 | ||
SE | 24.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/50] | FI | 24.06.2009 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4766160 (BICHON DANIEL [FR], et al) [X] 1,2,5-7,10-14 * column 4, line 44 - line 61 * * example 3 * * claim - *; | [X]US2001024697 (BARON RICHARD CARLTON [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7,10-12 * page 2, column L, line 12 - line 43 * * page 3, column L, line 6 - line 34 * * example 1 * * claim - *; | [X]US6410645 (PATHAK CHANDRASHEKHAR P [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6,7,11,12,14 * column 7, line 5 - line 28 * * column 10, line 13 - line 26 * * column 12, line 4 - line 26 * * examples 1,4 *; | [PX]WO03055611 (SURMODICS INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-7,10-14 * page 8, line 3 - page 10, line 3 * * page 15, line 4 - page 16, line 2 * * example 11 ** claim - * |