Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7176766 | Global Dossier | 13.02.2007 | B2 | US2005212610 | 29.09.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IB0303648 | 08.08.2003 | EP02078896 | 20.09.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2006500815 | Global Dossier | 05.01.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | IB0303648 | 08.08.2003 | EP02078896 | 20.09.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2003253183 | Global Dossier | 08.04.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IB0303648 | 08.08.2003 | EP02078896 | 20.09.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1543610 | Global Dossier | 28.06.2006 | B1 | EP1543610 | 22.06.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP03797424 | 08.08.2003 | IB0303648 | 08.08.2003 | EP02078896 | 20.09.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60306532T | 05.07.2007 | T2 | DE60306532D1 | 10.08.2006 | D1 | Priority number | Date | IB0303648 | 08.08.2003 | EP02078896 | 20.09.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2004027978 | Global Dossier | 01.04.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP02078896 | 20.09.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE332031T | 15.07.2006 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP02078896 | 20.09.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100438324C | 26.11.2008 | C | CN1682433 | 12.10.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | EP02078896 | 20.09.2002 |