EP1540414 - OPTICAL PATH SWITCHING DEVICE AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.01.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.02.2016 [2016/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states National Institute of Advanced Industrial Science and Technology 3-1, Kasumigaseki 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8921 / JP | For all designated states DAINICHISEIKA COLOR & CHEMICALS MFG. CO. LTD. 7-6 Bakuro-cho 1-chome Nihonbashi Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8383 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/24] | For all designated states National Institute of Advanced Industrial Science and Technology 3-1, Kasumigaseki 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8921 / JP | ||
For all designated states DAINICHISEIKA COLOR & CHEMICALS MFG. CO. LTD. 7-6 Bakuro-cho 1-chome Nihonbashi Chuo-ku, Tokyo 103-8383 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UENO, Ichiro 5-5, Takamori 3-chome Isehara-shi, Kanagawa 259-1114 / JP | 02 /
HIRAGA, Takashi, NAT. INST. ADV. IND. SC.&TECH. Kansai, 8-31, Midorigaoka 1-chome Ikeda-shi, Osaka 563-8577 / JP | 03 /
MIZOKURO, Toshiko, NAT. INST. ADV. IND. SC.&TECH. Kansai, 8-31, Midorigaoka 1-chome Ikeda-shi, Osaka 563-8577 / JP | 04 /
YAMAMOTO, Noritaka, NAT. INST. ADV. IND. SC.&TECH. Kansai, 8-31, Midorigaoka 1-chome Ikeda-shi, Osaka 563-8577 / JP | 05 /
MOCHIZUKI, Hiroyuki, NAT. INST. ADV. IND. SC.&TECH Kansai, 8-31, Midorigaoka 1-chome Ikeda-shi, Osaka 563-8577 / JP | 06 /
TANAKA, Norio, DAINICHISEIKA COLOR & CHEM. CO. LTD 7-6, Nihonbashi Bakuro-cho 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8383 / JP | [2005/24] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/24] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03797575.2 | 11.09.2003 | [2005/24] | WO2003JP11609 | Priority number, date | JP20020275713 | 20.09.2002 Original published format: JP 2002275713 | [2005/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004027508 | Date: | 01.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1540414 | Date: | 15.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/31 | [2005/24] | CPC: |
G02F1/293 (EP,US);
G02F1/31 (KR);
G02F1/313 (KR);
G02F1/0126 (EP,US);
G02F1/0147 (EP,US);
G02F1/311 (EP,US);
G02F3/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/02] |
Former [2005/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHALTEINRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN FÜR OPTISCHE WEGE | [2005/24] | English: | OPTICAL PATH SWITCHING DEVICE AND METHOD | [2005/24] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DE COMMUTATION DE TRAJET OPTIQUE | [2005/24] | Entry into regional phase | 15.03.2005 | National basic fee paid | 15.03.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.03.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.03.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/24] | 10.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.10.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2016/08] | 12.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/08] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.01.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 17.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2015 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1011007 (AGENCY IND SCIENCE TECHN [JP], et al) [A] 1-30 * the whole document *; | [A]US4585301 (BIALKOWSKI STEPHEN E [US]) [A] 1-3,16-18 * the whole document * | by applicant | US4585301 |