EP1545698 - DEVICE FOR BODY TREATMENT BY ELECTROSTIMULATION OR IONTOPHORESIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.02.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 08.12.2010 [2010/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FACO S.A. Avenue de l'Indépendance 25 B-4020 Wandre / BE | [2005/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JULEMONT, Pierre Chaussée d'Argenteau 88 B-4601 Argenteau / BE | 02 /
SMAL, Olivier Voie de Liège 23 B-4053 Embourg / BE | [2005/26] | Representative(s) | Pronovem, et al Office Van Malderen Parc d'affaires Zénobe Gramme- bâtiment K Square des Conduites d'Eau 1-2 4020 Liège / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | pronovem, et al Office Van Malderen Boulevard de la Sauvenière 85/043 4000 Liège / BE | ||
Former [2007/38] | pronovem, et al OFFICE VAN MALDEREN Bd. de la Sauvenière 85/043 4000 Liège / BE | ||
Former [2005/26] | Van Malderen, Joelle, et al Office Van Malderen, Boulevard de la Sauvenière, 85/043 4000 Liège / BE | Application number, filing date | 03798007.5 | 19.08.2003 | [2005/26] | WO2003BE00138 | Priority number, date | EP20020447186 | 30.09.2002 Original published format: EP 02447186 | [2005/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004028625 | Date: | 08.04.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1545698 | Date: | 29.06.2005 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1545698 | Date: | 09.04.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/32, A61N1/04 | [2005/26] | CPC: |
A61N1/0428 (EP);
A61N1/0452 (EP);
A61N1/325 (EP);
A61N1/0476 (EP);
A61N1/048 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/26] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG DES KÖRPERS MIT ELEKTROSTIMULATION ODER IONTOPHORESE | [2005/26] | English: | DEVICE FOR BODY TREATMENT BY ELECTROSTIMULATION OR IONTOPHORESIS | [2005/26] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT CORPOREL PAR ELECTROSTIMULATION OU IONOPHORESE | [2005/26] | Entry into regional phase | 11.01.2005 | National basic fee paid | 11.01.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.01.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.01.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/26] | 28.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.04.2008 | CY | 09.04.2008 | CZ | 09.04.2008 | DK | 09.04.2008 | EE | 09.04.2008 | FI | 09.04.2008 | IE | 09.04.2008 | IT | 09.04.2008 | NL | 09.04.2008 | RO | 09.04.2008 | SI | 09.04.2008 | SK | 09.04.2008 | TR | 09.04.2008 | BG | 09.07.2008 | SE | 09.07.2008 | DE | 10.07.2008 | GR | 10.07.2008 | ES | 20.07.2008 | GB | 19.08.2008 | LU | 19.08.2008 | BE | 31.08.2008 | CH | 31.08.2008 | LI | 31.08.2008 | MC | 31.08.2008 | FR | 01.09.2008 | PT | 09.09.2008 | HU | 10.10.2008 | [2010/49] |
Former [2010/37] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
CY | 09.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2008 | ||
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
EE | 09.04.2008 | ||
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
IE | 09.04.2008 | ||
IT | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
RO | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
TR | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
DE | 10.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
GB | 19.08.2008 | ||
LU | 19.08.2008 | ||
BE | 31.08.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
FR | 01.09.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
HU | 10.10.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
CY | 09.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2008 | ||
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
EE | 09.04.2008 | ||
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
IE | 09.04.2008 | ||
IT | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
RO | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
DE | 10.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
GB | 19.08.2008 | ||
LU | 19.08.2008 | ||
BE | 31.08.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
FR | 01.09.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
HU | 10.10.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
CY | 09.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2008 | ||
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
EE | 09.04.2008 | ||
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
IE | 09.04.2008 | ||
IT | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
RO | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
DE | 10.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
GB | 19.08.2008 | ||
LU | 19.08.2008 | ||
BE | 31.08.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
FR | 01.09.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
Former [2010/01] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
CY | 09.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2008 | ||
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
EE | 09.04.2008 | ||
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
IE | 09.04.2008 | ||
IT | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
RO | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
DE | 10.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
GB | 19.08.2008 | ||
BE | 31.08.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
FR | 01.09.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/43] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
CY | 09.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2008 | ||
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
EE | 09.04.2008 | ||
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
IE | 09.04.2008 | ||
IT | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
RO | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
DE | 10.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
BE | 31.08.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
FR | 01.09.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/40] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
CZ | 09.04.2008 | ||
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
EE | 09.04.2008 | ||
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
IE | 09.04.2008 | ||
IT | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
RO | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
DE | 10.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
BE | 31.08.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
FR | 01.09.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/32] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
CZ | 09.04.2008 | ||
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
EE | 09.04.2008 | ||
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
IE | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
RO | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
DE | 10.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
BE | 31.08.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/30] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
CZ | 09.04.2008 | ||
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
EE | 09.04.2008 | ||
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
IE | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
RO | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
DE | 10.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
CH | 31.08.2008 | ||
LI | 31.08.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
CZ | 09.04.2008 | ||
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
EE | 09.04.2008 | ||
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
IE | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
RO | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
DE | 10.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
CZ | 09.04.2008 | ||
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
EE | 09.04.2008 | ||
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
IE | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
RO | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/16] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
CZ | 09.04.2008 | ||
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
IE | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
RO | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.08.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
CZ | 09.04.2008 | ||
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
IE | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
RO | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
IE | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | NL | 09.04.2008 | |
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/47] | SI | 09.04.2008 | |
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | SI | 09.04.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5498235 (FLOWER RONALD J [US]) [A] 1-4 * column 2, line 26 - column 3, line 8; figure - *; | [A]EP0906767 (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US]) [A] 1,3,5,6,8 * column 3, line 56 - column 6, line 32; figure - *; | [A]US5991655 (GROSS JOSEPH [IE], et al) [A] 1,3* column 9, line 7 - column 10, line 2; figure 5 *; | [XA]US6157858 (GROSS JOSEPH [IE], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 10, line 54 - column 11, line 46; figure - * [A] 4 |