EP1545881 - CLAMPING DEVICE FOR CLAMPING A FLEXIBLE COVERING ON A CYLINDER OF A PRINTING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.03.2012 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.04.2012 [2012/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WIFAG Maschinenfabrik AG Wylerringstrasse 39 3014 Bern / CH | [2007/36] |
Former [2005/26] | For all designated states Maschinenfabrik Wifag Wylerringstrasse 39 Postfach 3001 Bern / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZAHND, Andreas Mühlerain 43 CH-3052 Zollikofen / CH | 02 /
KOLZEM, André Breiteweg 14 CH-3006 Bern / CH | [2005/26] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Stuntzstrasse 16 81677 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/28] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Stuntzstrasse 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03798029.9 | 24.09.2003 | [2005/26] | WO2003CH00639 | Priority number, date | DE20021044944 | 26.09.2002 Original published format: DE 10244944 | DE20021044945 | 26.09.2002 Original published format: DE 10244945 | [2005/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004028808 | Date: | 08.04.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1545881 | Date: | 29.06.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B41F27/12 | [2005/26] | CPC: |
B41F27/1262 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/26] | Title | German: | KLEMMVORRICHTUNG ZUM KLEMMEN EINER FLEXIBLEN BESPANNUNG EINES ZYLINDERS EINER DRUCKMASCHINE | [2005/26] | English: | CLAMPING DEVICE FOR CLAMPING A FLEXIBLE COVERING ON A CYLINDER OF A PRINTING MACHINE | [2005/26] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SERRAGE SERVANT A FIXER UN HABILLAGE FLEXIBLE SUR UN CYLINDRE D'UNE MACHINE A IMPRIMER | [2005/26] | Entry into regional phase | 26.04.2005 | National basic fee paid | 26.04.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.04.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.02.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/26] | 02.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/16] | 11.11.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/16] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.03.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DX]US5010818 (WALLSCHLAEGER SR ALAN R [US]) [DX] 1,2,4-11,19-23,29 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19606744 (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]) [A] 1* the whole document * | by applicant | US2900904 | US5010818 | US5123353 | DE4238343 | US5485785 | DE19509561 | EP0856401 | DE20022737U |