EP1543246 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CONNECTING PROFILES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.02.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 08.12.2010 [2010/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Top Glass S.p.A. Via Monte Suello 18 25128 Brescia / IT | [2005/33] |
Former [2005/25] | For all designated states Top Glass S.p.A. Via Bergamo, 15 20096 Pioltello, Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRANCA, Alfonso Via Duccio Boninsegna 15 I-20145 Milano / IT | [2005/25] | Representative(s) | Rapisardi, Mariacristina, et al Ufficio Brevetti Rapisardi S.r.l. Via Serbelloni 12 20122 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/33] | Rapisardi, Mariacristina, et al Ufficio Brevetti Rapisardi S.r.l., Via Serbelloni, 12 20122 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2005/25] | Rapisardi, Mariacristina Ufficio Brevetti Rapisardi S.r.l., Via Serbelloni, 12 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 03798097.6 | 30.06.2003 | [2005/25] | WO2003EP06936 | Priority number, date | IT2002MI02016 | 24.09.2002 Original published format: IT MI20022016 | [2005/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004029467 | Date: | 08.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1543246 | Date: | 22.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1543246 | Date: | 09.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F16B7/04, F16B21/02, F16B11/00 | [2005/25] | CPC: |
F16B21/02 (EP,US);
F16B11/006 (EP,US);
F16B7/0433 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/15] |
Former [2005/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERBINDUNG VON PROFILEN | [2005/25] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CONNECTING PROFILES | [2005/25] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE D'ASSEMBLAGE DE PROFILES | [2005/25] | Entry into regional phase | 03.04.2004 | National basic fee paid | 03.04.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.04.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.04.2004 | Examination requested [2005/25] | 06.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.04.2008 | BE | 09.04.2008 | CY | 09.04.2008 | CZ | 09.04.2008 | DK | 09.04.2008 | EE | 09.04.2008 | FI | 09.04.2008 | NL | 09.04.2008 | RO | 09.04.2008 | SI | 09.04.2008 | SK | 09.04.2008 | TR | 09.04.2008 | CH | 30.06.2008 | IE | 30.06.2008 | LI | 30.06.2008 | LU | 30.06.2008 | MC | 30.06.2008 | BG | 09.07.2008 | GB | 09.07.2008 | SE | 09.07.2008 | DE | 10.07.2008 | GR | 10.07.2008 | ES | 20.07.2008 | PT | 09.09.2008 | HU | 10.10.2008 | [2010/49] |
Former [2010/37] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
BE | 09.04.2008 | ||
CY | 09.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2008 | ||
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
EE | 09.04.2008 | ||
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
RO | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
TR | 09.04.2008 | ||
CH | 30.06.2008 | ||
IE | 30.06.2008 | ||
LI | 30.06.2008 | ||
LU | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
GB | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
DE | 10.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
HU | 10.10.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
BE | 09.04.2008 | ||
CY | 09.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2008 | ||
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
EE | 09.04.2008 | ||
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
RO | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
CH | 30.06.2008 | ||
IE | 30.06.2008 | ||
LI | 30.06.2008 | ||
LU | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
GB | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
DE | 10.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
HU | 10.10.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
BE | 09.04.2008 | ||
CY | 09.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2008 | ||
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
EE | 09.04.2008 | ||
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
RO | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
CH | 30.06.2008 | ||
IE | 30.06.2008 | ||
LI | 30.06.2008 | ||
LU | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
GB | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
DE | 10.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/43] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
BE | 09.04.2008 | ||
CY | 09.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2008 | ||
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
EE | 09.04.2008 | ||
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
RO | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
CH | 30.06.2008 | ||
IE | 30.06.2008 | ||
LI | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
GB | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
DE | 10.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/30] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
BE | 09.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2008 | ||
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
EE | 09.04.2008 | ||
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
RO | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
CH | 30.06.2008 | ||
IE | 30.06.2008 | ||
LI | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
GB | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
DE | 10.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
BE | 09.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2008 | ||
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
EE | 09.04.2008 | ||
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
RO | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
IE | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
GB | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
DE | 10.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
BE | 09.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2008 | ||
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
EE | 09.04.2008 | ||
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
RO | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
IE | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
DE | 10.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
BE | 09.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2008 | ||
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
EE | 09.04.2008 | ||
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
RO | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
DE | 10.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
BE | 09.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2008 | ||
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
RO | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
DE | 10.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
BE | 09.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2008 | ||
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
DE | 10.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
DE | 10.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
PT | 09.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | NL | 09.04.2008 | |
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/47] | SI | 09.04.2008 | |
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | SI | 09.04.2008 | Cited in | International search | [XA]DE7119423U (GÖTZ METALLBAU GMBH) [X] 1-9,11-13,20-22,24,25 * page 4 - page 6; figure - * [A] 14-16,19,23; | [A]US4981735 (RICKSON DONALD D [US]) [A] 14,16,23 * column 2, line 32 - line 39 ** figure - *; | [X]FR2721074 (OTIS ELEVATOR CO [US]) [X] 1-13,17,18,22,24,25 * page 3, line 13 - line 37 * * figures 1,2,5,6 *; | [X]US2001017019 (DEGELSEGGER WALTER [DE]) [X] 1-7,11-13,21,22,24,25 * page 2, paragraph 26 * * figure - * |