EP1543734 - GEL-FORM COMPOSITION FOR SUPPLYING PROTEIN AND CALCIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.02.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 17.09.2014 [2014/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 9, Kandatsukasa-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8535 / JP | [2010/13] |
Former [2005/45] | For all designated states OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 9, Kandatsukasa-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8535 / JP | ||
Former [2005/25] | For all designated states Otsuka Pharmaceutical Company, Limited 9, Kandatsukasa-cho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8535 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKAICHI, Akihisa 292, Aza Nakajima, Takashima, Naruto-cho Naruto-shi, Tokushima 772-0051 / JP | 02 /
OKAMOTO, Toshihiko 632, Ko, Kokufu-cho Tokushima-shi, Tokushima 779-3122 / JP | 03 /
WATANABE, Yoshinari Ekureru Takasaki 509, 262-1, Takasago-cho Takasaki-shi, Gunma 370-0047 / JP | 04 /
HIRATA, Keizaburo Santonore Yoshinogawa 1001, 178-1, Tsurushim Tokushima-shi, Tokushima 771-0117 / JP | [2005/25] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/25] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03798434.1 | 22.09.2003 | [2005/25] | WO2003JP12061 | Priority number, date | JP20020278408 | 25.09.2002 Original published format: JP 2002278408 | [2005/25] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004028279 | Date: | 08.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1543734 | Date: | 22.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1543734 | Date: | 31.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/13] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1543734 | Date: | 19.05.2010 | [2010/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.04.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/29, A23L1/304, A23L1/305, A23L2/00 | [2005/25] | CPC: |
A23L33/17 (EP,US);
A23L33/00 (KR);
A23L33/16 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00 (EP,US);
A23V2200/228 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/1578, A23V2250/5024, A23V2200/222, A23V2250/02, A23V2250/54 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/13] |
Former [2005/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | GELFÖRMIGE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR DIE BEREITSTELLUNG VON PROTEIN UND CALCIUM | [2010/17] | English: | GEL-FORM COMPOSITION FOR SUPPLYING PROTEIN AND CALCIUM | [2005/25] | French: | COMPOSITION SOUS FORME DE GEL | [2005/25] |
Former [2005/25] | GELF RMIGE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG F R DIE BEREITSTELLUNG VON PROTEIN UND CALCIUM | Entry into regional phase | 15.03.2005 | Translation filed | 15.03.2005 | National basic fee paid | 15.03.2005 | Search fee paid | 15.03.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.03.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/25] | 02.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 15.02.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 31.03.2010 | BE | 31.03.2010 | CY | 31.03.2010 | CZ | 31.03.2010 | DK | 31.03.2010 | EE | 31.03.2010 | FI | 31.03.2010 | GR | 31.03.2010 | RO | 31.03.2010 | SE | 31.03.2010 | SI | 31.03.2010 | SK | 31.03.2010 | TR | 31.03.2010 | BG | 30.06.2010 | PT | 02.08.2010 | GB | 22.09.2010 | IE | 22.09.2010 | IT | 22.09.2010 | LU | 22.09.2010 | ES | 23.09.2010 | CH | 30.09.2010 | FR | 30.09.2010 | LI | 30.09.2010 | MC | 30.09.2010 | HU | 01.10.2010 | [2014/38] |
Former [2013/42] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
TR | 31.03.2010 | ||
BG | 30.06.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
GB | 22.09.2010 | ||
IE | 22.09.2010 | ||
IT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LU | 22.09.2010 | ||
ES | 23.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
FR | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
HU | 01.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
BG | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
TR | 31.03.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
GB | 22.09.2010 | ||
IE | 22.09.2010 | ||
IT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LU | 22.09.2010 | ||
ES | 23.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
FR | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
HU | 01.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/44] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
BG | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
GB | 22.09.2010 | ||
IE | 22.09.2010 | ||
IT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LU | 22.09.2010 | ||
ES | 23.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
FR | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
HU | 01.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
BG | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
GB | 22.09.2010 | ||
IE | 22.09.2010 | ||
IT | 22.09.2010 | ||
ES | 23.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
FR | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
HU | 01.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
BG | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
GB | 22.09.2010 | ||
IE | 22.09.2010 | ||
IT | 22.09.2010 | ||
ES | 23.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
FR | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/51] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
GB | 22.09.2010 | ||
IE | 22.09.2010 | ||
IT | 22.09.2010 | ||
ES | 23.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
FR | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/43] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
GB | 22.09.2010 | ||
IE | 22.09.2010 | ||
IT | 22.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
FR | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
IE | 22.09.2010 | ||
IT | 22.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
FR | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
IE | 22.09.2010 | ||
IT | 22.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
FR | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/31] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
IT | 22.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/49] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/38] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/37] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/36] | SI | 31.03.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1046347 (OTSUKA FOOD CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4* the whole document * | International search | [Y]US4642238 (LIN SANTA H C [US], et al); | [Y]WO0101789 (NESTLE SA [CH], et al) |