EP1545704 - APPARATUS FOR TREATING A TUMOR BY AN ELECTRIC FIELD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.06.2021 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.07.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.06.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.01.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 06.07.2022 [2022/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novocure GmbH Park 6 6039 Root D4 / CH | [2020/32] |
Former [2015/07] | For all designated states Novocure Limited Le Masurier House La Rue Le Masurier St. Helier, Jersey (Channel Islands) JE2 4YE / GB | ||
Former [2005/26] | For all designated states Standen Ltd. Le Masurier House, La Rue Le Masurier St. Helier, Jersey (Channel Islands) JE2 4YE / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PALTI, Yoram 51 Ruth 34404 Haifa / IL | [2005/26] | Representative(s) | Boden, Keith McMurray, et al Vertus Professional Services Ltd 1 Highlands Road Reigate, RH2 0LA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/33] | Boden, Keith McMurray, et al Fry Heath & Spence LLP Unit A, Faraday Court Faraday Road Crawley, West Sussex RH10 9PU / GB | ||
Former [2009/52] | Boden, Keith McMurray, et al Fry Heath & Spence LLP The Gables Massetts Road Horley Surrey RH6 7DQ / GB | ||
Former [2008/45] | Howard, Paul Nicholas, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2005/26] | Howard, Paul Nicholas, et al Carpmaels & Ransford, 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 03799042.1 | 01.10.2003 | [2005/26] | WO2003IB04321 | Priority number, date | US20020263329 | 02.10.2002 Original published format: US 263329 | US20020285313 | 31.10.2002 Original published format: US 285313 | US20020315576 | 10.12.2002 Original published format: US 315576 | [2005/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004030760 | Date: | 15.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/16] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1545704 | Date: | 29.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1545704 | Date: | 12.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/40 | [2005/26] | CPC: |
A61B18/12 (EP,US);
A61N1/18 (EP,US);
A61N1/40 (EP,US);
A61B18/14 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00084 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2020/33] |
Former [2005/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | APPARAT ZUR TUMORBEHANDLUNG MITTELS EINES ELEKTRISCHEN FELDES | [2005/26] | English: | APPARATUS FOR TREATING A TUMOR BY AN ELECTRIC FIELD | [2005/26] | French: | DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE TRAITER UNE TUMEUR OU UNE AFFECTION SIMILAIRE, ET ARTICLES COMPRENANT CE DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE TRAITER UNE TUMEUR | [2005/26] | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.2005 | National basic fee paid | 28.04.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.05.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/26] | 29.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.03.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 16.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.06.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 26.06.2013 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 15.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.11.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 09.12.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.01.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 30.01.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.02.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 29.04.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 29.04.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.05.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 19.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Appeal following examination | 05.09.2013 | Appeal received No. T2329/13 | 06.11.2013 | Statement of grounds filed | 20.03.2019 | Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant | 20.03.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.04.2019 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | EP10012702.6 / EP2281602 | EP10012706.7 / EP2281603 | EP10012716.6 / EP2281604 | EP10012777.8 / EP2281605 | EP19183539.6 / EP3572123 | EP19219623.6 / EP3656441 | EP19219652.5 / EP3659671 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.05.2008 | Opposition(s) | 14.05.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/29] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 13.05.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 13.05.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.05.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 25.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 19.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 17.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 13.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 06.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 17 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 12.08.2020 | EE | 12.08.2020 | MC | 12.08.2020 | RO | 12.08.2020 | SI | 12.08.2020 | SK | 12.08.2020 | LU | 01.10.2020 | BG | 12.11.2020 | [2022/27] |
Former [2021/36] | EE | 12.08.2020 | |
MC | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
SI | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
LU | 01.10.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | EE | 12.08.2020 | |
MC | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
LU | 01.10.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | EE | 12.08.2020 | |
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | EE | 12.08.2020 | |
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | BG | 12.11.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2220269 (JOHANNES PATZOLD, et al) [A] 13,51,62,68 * the whole document *; | [X]GB1419660 (ESB INC) [X] 1-4,10,11 * page 3, line 56 - line 65 * * page 4, line 36 - line 57 * * page 8, line 21 - line 50 * * page 10, line 28 - line 46 *; | [A]GB2026322 (LAWRENCE J) [A] 1 * page 1, line 102 - line 114 * * page 2, line 49 - line 61 *; | [Y]GB2043453 (ELECTROCHEM TECH CORP) [Y] 5 * page 1, line 35 - line 50 *; | [A]US4467809 (BRIGHTON CARL T [US]) [A] 1* column 3, line 3 - line 31 *; | [Y]EP0330797 (INDIBA SA [ES]) [Y] 8 * the whole document *; | [X]WO0160994 (PALTI YORAM PROF [IL]) [X] 1-4,10-12 * page 10, line 10 - line 19 * * page 14, line 9 - line 15 * * page 18, line 7 - line 9 * * claims 20-23 *; | [XY]US6413255 (STERN ROGER A [US]) [X] 1-4,6 * column 5, line 51 - column 6, line 65 * * column 8, line 27 - line 62 * * column 10, line 55 - column 11, line 47 * * figure 12 * [Y] 5,8 | Examination | US3915151 | US5269304 | by applicant | US6043066 |