EP1546784 - OPTICAL RECEPTACLE WITH LOW TRANSMISSION LOSS AND PHOTOELECTRIC CONVERSION MODULE FOR THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.07.2011 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): BG | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Electric Works Co., Ltd. 1048 Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka / JP | For all designated states Delphi Technologies Inc. 5725 Delphi Drive Troy, MI 48007 / US | [2009/08] |
Former [2005/26] | For all designated states Matsushita Electric Works, Ltd. 1048, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu 571-8686 / JP | ||
For all designated states Delphi Technologies Inc. 5725 Delphi Drive Troy, MI 48007 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kambe, Yoshiaki c/o Panasonic Electric Works Co., Ltd., 1048, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8686 / JP | 02 /
Shimaya, Kenichi c/o Panasonic Electric Works Co., Ltd., 1048, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8686 / JP | 03 /
Shimomura, Tsutomu c/o Panasonic Electric Works Co., Ltd., 1048, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8686 / JP | 04 /
Haack, Albrecht Muehlenfeld 6 42369 Wuppertal / DE | 05 /
Halbach, Paul Gerhard Ferdinand-Lasalle-Strasse 23 42369 Wuppertal / DE | 06 /
Gaertner, Markus Friedrichsallee 26 42117 Wuppertal / DE | [2010/35] |
Former [2007/15] | 01 /
Kambe, Yoshiaki, Matsushita Electric Works, Ltd. 1048 Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8686 / JP | ||
02 /
Shimaya, Kenichi, Matsushita Electric Works, Ltd. 1048 Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8686 / JP | |||
03 /
Shimomura, Tsutomu, Matsushita Electric Works Ltd 1048 Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8686 / JP | |||
04 /
Haack, Albrecht Muehlenfeld 6 42369 Wuppertal / DE | |||
05 /
Halbach, Paul Gerhard Ferdinand-Lasalle-Strasse 23 42369 Wuppertal / DE | |||
06 /
Gaertner, Markus Friedrichsallee 26 42117 Wuppertal / DE | |||
Former [2005/26] | 01 /
Kambe, Yoshiaki, Matsushita Electric Works, Ltd. 1048 Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8686 / JP | ||
02 /
Shimaya, Kenichi, Matsushita Electric Works, Ltd. 1048 Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8686 / JP | |||
03 /
Shimomura, Tsutomu, Matsushita Electric Works Ltd 1048 Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8686 / JP | |||
04 /
Haack, Albrecht Muehlenfeld 6 42369 Wuppertal / DE | |||
05 /
Halbach, Paul Gerhard Ferdinand-Lasalle-Strasse 23 42369 Wuppertal / DE | |||
06 /
Gaertner, Markus Ibacher Strasse 75 42855 Remscheid / DE | Representative(s) | Appelt, Christian W. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Appelt, Christian W. Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/26] | Appelt, Christian W. FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Anwaltssozietät Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03799152.8 | 29.09.2003 | [2005/26] | WO2003JP12388 | Priority number, date | JP20020287413 | 30.09.2002 Original published format: JP 2002287413 | [2005/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004031817 | Date: | 15.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/16] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1546784 | Date: | 29.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1546784 | Date: | 08.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/42 | [2005/26] | CPC: |
G02B6/4292 (EP,US);
G02B6/4246 (EP,US);
G02B6/389 (EP,US);
G02B6/4204 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/26] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPTISCHES MODUL MIT GERINGEN ÜBERTRAGUNGSVERLUSTEN UND PHOTOELEKTRISCHES UMWANDLUNGSMODUL | [2005/26] | English: | OPTICAL RECEPTACLE WITH LOW TRANSMISSION LOSS AND PHOTOELECTRIC CONVERSION MODULE FOR THE SAME | [2005/26] | French: | RECEPTACLE A USAGE OPTIQUE A FAIBLE PERTE DE TRANSMISSION ET MODULE DE CONVERSION PHOTOELECTRIQUE POUR CELUI-CI | [2005/26] | Entry into regional phase | 23.03.2005 | National basic fee paid | 23.03.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.03.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/26] | 04.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.09.2010 | BE | 08.09.2010 | CY | 08.09.2010 | CZ | 08.09.2010 | DK | 08.09.2010 | EE | 08.09.2010 | FI | 08.09.2010 | NL | 08.09.2010 | RO | 08.09.2010 | SE | 08.09.2010 | SI | 08.09.2010 | SK | 08.09.2010 | TR | 08.09.2010 | IE | 29.09.2010 | LU | 29.09.2010 | CH | 30.09.2010 | LI | 30.09.2010 | MC | 30.09.2010 | BG | 08.12.2010 | GR | 09.12.2010 | ES | 19.12.2010 | PT | 10.01.2011 | HU | 09.03.2011 | [2013/42] |
Former [2012/47] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
BE | 08.09.2010 | ||
BG | 08.09.2010 | ||
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2010 | ||
DK | 08.09.2010 | ||
EE | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
RO | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
SK | 08.09.2010 | ||
TR | 08.09.2010 | ||
IE | 29.09.2010 | ||
LU | 29.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
ES | 19.12.2010 | ||
PT | 10.01.2011 | ||
HU | 09.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/44] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
BE | 08.09.2010 | ||
BG | 08.09.2010 | ||
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2010 | ||
DK | 08.09.2010 | ||
EE | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
RO | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
SK | 08.09.2010 | ||
IE | 29.09.2010 | ||
LU | 29.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
ES | 19.12.2010 | ||
PT | 10.01.2011 | ||
HU | 09.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
BE | 08.09.2010 | ||
BG | 08.09.2010 | ||
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2010 | ||
DK | 08.09.2010 | ||
EE | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
RO | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
SK | 08.09.2010 | ||
IE | 29.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
ES | 19.12.2010 | ||
PT | 10.01.2011 | ||
HU | 09.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
BE | 08.09.2010 | ||
BG | 08.09.2010 | ||
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2010 | ||
DK | 08.09.2010 | ||
EE | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
RO | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
SK | 08.09.2010 | ||
IE | 29.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
ES | 19.12.2010 | ||
PT | 10.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
BE | 08.09.2010 | ||
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2010 | ||
DK | 08.09.2010 | ||
EE | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
RO | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
SK | 08.09.2010 | ||
IE | 29.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
ES | 19.12.2010 | ||
PT | 10.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
BE | 08.09.2010 | ||
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2010 | ||
EE | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
RO | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
SK | 08.09.2010 | ||
IE | 29.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
ES | 19.12.2010 | ||
PT | 10.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/31] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
BE | 08.09.2010 | ||
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2010 | ||
EE | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
RO | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
SK | 08.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
ES | 19.12.2010 | ||
PT | 10.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/24] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2010 | ||
EE | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
SK | 08.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
PT | 10.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/23] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2010 | ||
EE | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
SK | 08.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/17] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | AT | 08.09.2010 | |
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 08.09.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0009330 (AMP INC [US]) [A] 1,12,13 * abstract *; | [A]US4737008 (OHYAMA SADAHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1,12,13 * abstract *; | [A]EP0320214 (MOLEX INC [US]) [A] 1,12,13 * abstract *; | [A]US5224186 (KISHIMOTO KOJI [JP], et al) [A] * abstract *; | [A]US5259053 (SCHAFFER RONALD R [US], et al) [A] 1,12,13 * abstract *; | [A]US5475783 (KURASHIMA HIROMI [JP]) [A] 1,12,13 * abstract *; | [A]US5633971 (KURASHIMA HIROMI [JP]) [A] 1,12,13 * abstract *; | [A]US6113280 (NAGAOKA YASUTAKA [JP], et al) [A] 1,12,13* abstract *; | [DA]US2002102073 (SHIRAKAWA TSUGUHITO [JP]) [DA] 1,12,13 * abstract * | Examination | JPH03238406 | JPH08136766 | JP2000347073 | DE10023463 | EP1217406 | EP1227349 |