EP1547732 - ROBOT DEVICE AND CONTROL METHOD OF ROBOT DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.08.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.09.2013 [2013/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/26] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAGASAKA, Kenichiro, Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | [2005/26] | Representative(s) | Körber, Martin Hans Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 33 06 09 80066 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/26] | Körber, Martin, Dipl.-Phys. Mitscherlich & Partner Patentanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03799175.9 | 30.09.2003 | [2005/26] | WO2003JP12474 | Priority number, date | JP20020288745 | 01.10.2002 Original published format: JP 2002288745 | [2005/26] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004030870 | Date: | 15.04.2004 | Language: | JA | [2004/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1547732 | Date: | 29.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.04.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B25J5/00 | [2005/26] | CPC: |
B62D57/032 (EP,US);
B62D57/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/03] |
Former [2005/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ROBOTERVORRICHTUNG UND STEUERVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2005/26] | English: | ROBOT DEVICE AND CONTROL METHOD OF ROBOT DEVICE | [2005/26] | French: | ROBOT ET PROCEDE DE COMMANDE DUDIT ROBOT | [2005/26] | Entry into regional phase | 28.05.2004 | Translation filed | 28.05.2004 | National basic fee paid | 28.05.2004 | Search fee paid | 28.05.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.05.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.05.2004 | Examination requested [2005/26] | 20.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/39] | 08.05.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2013/39] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.11.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5355064 (YOSHINO RYUTARO [JP], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1103451 (SONY CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-12* the whole document *; | [A]EP1120203 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document * | International search | [A]JPH10217161 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD); | [A] - VOKOBRATOVIC MIOMIR, "Hoko robot to jinko no ashi", THE NIKKAN KOGYO SHINBUN LTD., (19750331), page 55, XP002977492 |