EP1572404 - DEEP HOLE DRILL WITH REPLACEMENT SETS FOR DIFFERENT DIAMETERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/37] | DEEP HOLE DRILL EB800 | ||
[2007/29] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 23.03.2012 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2018 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: FR | published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gühring, Jörg Franz-Schubert-Strasse 18 72458 Albstadt / DE | [2007/48] |
Former [2005/37] | For all designated states GÜHRING, Jörg Franz-Schubert-Strasse 18 72458 Albstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KÜNZEL, Lothar Hausstr. 20 72124 Pliezhausen / DE | [2005/37] | Representative(s) | Angermeier, Simon Andreas Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/17] | Angermeier, Simon Andreas Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | ||
Former [2008/50] | Angermeier, Simon Andreas Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | ||
Former [2007/14] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2006/13] | Eisele, Otten, Roth & Dobler Karlstrasse 8 88212 Ravensburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 03799449.8 | 18.12.2003 | [2005/37] | WO2003DE04274 | Priority number, date | DE20022019754U | 19.12.2002 Original published format: DE 20219754 U | [2005/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004056518 | Date: | 08.07.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/28] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1572404 | Date: | 14.09.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1572404 | Date: | 28.11.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/48] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1572404 | Date: | 25.04.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B23B51/04 | [2006/12] | CPC: |
B23B51/00 (EP,KR,US);
B23B51/02 (KR);
B23B2251/085 (EP,US);
B23B2251/56 (EP,US);
B23B51/063 (EP,US);
Y10S408/713 (EP,US);
Y10T408/45 (EP,US);
Y10T408/455 (EP,US);
Y10T408/5586 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2005/37] | B23B51/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/37] | Title | German: | TIEFLOCHBOHRER MIT AUSTAUSCHSÄTZEN FÜR VERSCHIEDENE DURCHMESSER | [2007/29] | English: | DEEP HOLE DRILL WITH REPLACEMENT SETS FOR DIFFERENT DIAMETERS | [2007/29] | French: | FORET LONG AVEC ENSEMBLE DE REMPLACEMENT POUR DES DIAMETRES DIFFERENTES | [2012/17] |
Former [2005/37] | TIEFLOCHBOHRER EB800 | ||
Former [2005/37] | DEEP HOLE DRILL EB800 | ||
Former [2005/37] | FORET LONG EB800 | Entry into regional phase | 24.05.2005 | National basic fee paid | 24.05.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.05.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/37] | 09.09.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 15.11.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 18.07.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 08.10.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
26.08.2008
ADMISSIBLE Botek Präzisionsbohrtechnik GmbH Längenfeldstrasse 4 72585 Riederich / DE Opponent's representative Jakelski, Joachim, et al, et al Jakelski & Althoff Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Mollenbachstrasse 37 71229 Leonberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
26.08.2008
ADMISSIBLE Botek Präzisionsbohrtechnik GmbH Längenfeldstrasse 4 72585 Riederich / DE Opponent's representative Jakelski, Joachim, et al, et al Otte & Jakelski, Patentanwaltskanzlei Mollenbachstrasse 37 71229 Leonberg / DE | 02.10.2008 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 09.04.2009 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 09.02.2010 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 30.11.2011 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 05.03.2012 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | Appeal following opposition | 14.04.2010 | Appeal received No. T0777/10 | 18.06.2010 | Statement of grounds filed | 30.11.2011 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 30.11.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 09.02.2010 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | 30.11.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.12.2011 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Request for further processing for: | 16.01.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 16.01.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.02.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2006 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   15.03.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 28.11.2007 | DK | 28.11.2007 | EE | 28.11.2007 | FI | 28.11.2007 | NL | 28.11.2007 | IE | 18.12.2007 | LU | 18.12.2007 | BE | 31.12.2007 | CH | 31.12.2007 | LI | 31.12.2007 | MC | 31.12.2007 | BG | 28.02.2008 | GR | 29.02.2008 | ES | 11.03.2008 | PT | 28.04.2008 | [2018/31] |
Former [2016/07] | CY | 28.11.2007 | |
DK | 28.11.2007 | ||
EE | 28.11.2007 | ||
FI | 28.11.2007 | ||
NL | 28.11.2007 | ||
IE | 18.12.2007 | ||
LU | 18.12.2007 | ||
BE | 31.12.2007 | ||
CH | 31.12.2007 | ||
LI | 31.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
BG | 28.02.2008 | ||
GR | 29.02.2008 | ||
ES | 11.03.2008 | ||
PT | 28.04.2008 | ||
FR | 31.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | CY | 28.11.2007 | |
DK | 28.11.2007 | ||
EE | 28.11.2007 | ||
FI | 28.11.2007 | ||
NL | 28.11.2007 | ||
TR | 28.11.2007 | ||
IE | 18.12.2007 | ||
LU | 18.12.2007 | ||
BE | 31.12.2007 | ||
CH | 31.12.2007 | ||
LI | 31.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
BG | 28.02.2008 | ||
GR | 29.02.2008 | ||
ES | 11.03.2008 | ||
PT | 28.04.2008 | ||
FR | 31.12.2009 | ||
Former [2009/43] | CY | 28.11.2007 | |
DK | 28.11.2007 | ||
EE | 28.11.2007 | ||
FI | 28.11.2007 | ||
NL | 28.11.2007 | ||
TR | 28.11.2007 | ||
IE | 18.12.2007 | ||
LU | 18.12.2007 | ||
BE | 31.12.2007 | ||
CH | 31.12.2007 | ||
LI | 31.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
BG | 28.02.2008 | ||
GR | 29.02.2008 | ||
ES | 11.03.2008 | ||
PT | 28.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/40] | CY | 28.11.2007 | |
DK | 28.11.2007 | ||
EE | 28.11.2007 | ||
FI | 28.11.2007 | ||
NL | 28.11.2007 | ||
IE | 18.12.2007 | ||
LU | 18.12.2007 | ||
BE | 31.12.2007 | ||
CH | 31.12.2007 | ||
LI | 31.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
BG | 28.02.2008 | ||
GR | 29.02.2008 | ||
ES | 11.03.2008 | ||
PT | 28.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | CY | 28.11.2007 | |
DK | 28.11.2007 | ||
EE | 28.11.2007 | ||
FI | 28.11.2007 | ||
NL | 28.11.2007 | ||
IE | 18.12.2007 | ||
BE | 31.12.2007 | ||
CH | 31.12.2007 | ||
LI | 31.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
BG | 28.02.2008 | ||
GR | 29.02.2008 | ||
ES | 11.03.2008 | ||
PT | 28.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | DK | 28.11.2007 | |
EE | 28.11.2007 | ||
FI | 28.11.2007 | ||
NL | 28.11.2007 | ||
IE | 18.12.2007 | ||
BE | 31.12.2007 | ||
CH | 31.12.2007 | ||
LI | 31.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
BG | 28.02.2008 | ||
GR | 29.02.2008 | ||
ES | 11.03.2008 | ||
PT | 28.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | DK | 28.11.2007 | |
FI | 28.11.2007 | ||
NL | 28.11.2007 | ||
IE | 18.12.2007 | ||
BE | 31.12.2007 | ||
CH | 31.12.2007 | ||
LI | 31.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
BG | 28.02.2008 | ||
ES | 11.03.2008 | ||
PT | 28.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | DK | 28.11.2007 | |
FI | 28.11.2007 | ||
NL | 28.11.2007 | ||
BE | 31.12.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
BG | 28.02.2008 | ||
ES | 11.03.2008 | ||
PT | 28.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | DK | 28.11.2007 | |
FI | 28.11.2007 | ||
NL | 28.11.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
BG | 28.02.2008 | ||
ES | 11.03.2008 | ||
PT | 28.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | DK | 28.11.2007 | |
FI | 28.11.2007 | ||
NL | 28.11.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
BG | 28.02.2008 | ||
ES | 11.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/33] | FI | 28.11.2007 | |
NL | 28.11.2007 | ||
MC | 31.12.2007 | ||
BG | 28.02.2008 | ||
ES | 11.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | FI | 28.11.2007 | |
NL | 28.11.2007 | ||
BG | 28.02.2008 | ||
ES | 11.03.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR892182 (COMM ACIERS SOC IND) [A] 1,2,4 * page 2, column L, line 8 - column R, line 4 *; | [A]US3094016 (MAX KLEINE WERNER KURT) [A] * figures 1-6 *; | [A]US4437802 (HALL JR JOHN J [US]) [A] * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0418437 (FISHER & CO CLEVELEYS LTD J [GB]) [A] 1-3,6,8,12 * column 2, line 35 - column 4, line 3; figures 1-6 * | Opposition | US3422706 |