EP1572808 - PHTHALIMIDYLAZO DYES, PROCESSES FOR THE PREPARATION THEREOF AND THE USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.01.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.02.2010 [2010/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huntsman Advanced Materials (Switzerland) GmbH Klybeckstrasse 200 4057 Basel / CH | [2006/34] |
Former [2005/37] | For all designated states Ciba Specialty Chemicals Holding Inc. Klybeckstrasse 141 4057 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CLEMENT, Antoine Route du centre 40 CH-1723 Marly / CH | 02 /
ARQUINT, Alfons Im Rankhof 6 CH-4058 Basel / CH | 03 /
LAUK, Urs Alfred-Strebelweg 15 CH-8047 Zürich / CH | [2006/51] |
Former [2005/37] | 01 /
CLEMENT, Antoine Laufenburgerstrasse 2/5 CH-4058 Basel / CH | ||
02 /
ARQUINT, Alfons Im Rankhof 6 CH-4058 Basel / CH | |||
03 /
LAUK, Urs Alfred-Strebelweg 15 CH-8047 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 03799542.0 | 08.12.2003 | [2005/37] | WO2003EP50956 | Priority number, date | EP20020406118 | 19.12.2002 Original published format: EP 02406118 | [2005/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004056926 | Date: | 08.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1572808 | Date: | 14.09.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C09B29/036, C09B29/42, C09B67/22 | [2005/37] | CPC: |
C09B29/3634 (EP,US);
C09B29/0029 (KR);
C09B29/0033 (EP,US);
C09B29/3617 (KR);
C09B67/0033 (KR);
Y10S8/922 (US);
Y10T442/30 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PHTHALIMIDYL-AZOFARBSTOFFE, VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG UND DEREN VERWENDUNG | [2005/37] | English: | PHTHALIMIDYLAZO DYES, PROCESSES FOR THE PREPARATION THEREOF AND THE USE THEREOF | [2005/37] | French: | COLORANTS PHTALIMIDYLAZOIQUES JAUNES A BASE DE 3-CYANO-4-METHYL-6 HYDROXY-2-PYRIDONES ET DE 4-AMINO-N-ALKYLPHTALIMIDES HALOGENEES | [2005/37] | Entry into regional phase | 20.05.2005 | National basic fee paid | 20.05.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.05.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.06.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/37] | 13.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/07] | 17.09.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPS5285584 ; | [X]JPS53138431 ; | [X]JPS53119930 ; | [X]JPS53138432 ; | [A]GB1302221 (BADISCHE ANILIN- & SODA-FABRIK AG.) [A] 1-10* example 51; claims 1,11-15 *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1977, no. 35, Database accession no. 1977-61950Y, XP002260144 & JPS5285584 A 19770715 (MITSUBISHI CHEM IND LTD) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,9,10 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1979, no. 03, Database accession no. 1979-04691B, XP002260145 & JPS53138431 A 19781202 (MITSUBISHI CHEM IND LTD) [X] 1-3,5,7,9,10 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1978, no. 47, Database accession no. 1978-84875A, XP002260146 & JPS53119930 A 19781019 (MITSUBISHI CHEM IND LTD) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,9,10 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1979, no. 03, Database accession no. 1979-04692B, XP002260147 & JPS53138432 A 19781202 (MITSUBISHI CHEM IND LTD) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,9,10 * abstract * |