EP1593005 - CALENDAR MECHANISM FOR DISPLAYING THE DAY OF THE WEEK AND THE DAY OF THE MONTH IN A TIMEPIECE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.06.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ETA SA Manufacture Horlogère Suisse Schild-Rust-Strasse 17 2540 Grenchen / CH | [2005/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KÜPFER, Marc Hofmattweg 20 CH-4533 Riedholz / CH | 02 /
BETTELINI, Marco Chemin des Saigneules 17a CH-2515 Prêles / CH | [2006/50] |
Former [2005/45] | 01 /
KÜPFER, Marc Muttenstrasse 6 CH-4500 Solothurn / CH | ||
02 /
BETTELINI, Marco Chemin des Saigneules 17a CH-2515 Prêles / CH | Representative(s) | Ravenel, Thierry Gérard Louis ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2011/30] | Ravenel, Thierry Gérard Louis ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3 CH-2001 Neuchâtel / CH | ||
Former [2010/12] | Vigand, Philippe ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | ||
Former [2005/45] | Vigand, Philippe, et al ICB, Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA, Rue des Sors 7 2074 Marin / CH | Application number, filing date | 03799584.2 | 18.12.2003 | [2005/45] | WO2003EP51044 | Priority number, date | EP20030075060 | 07.01.2003 Original published format: EP 03075060 | [2005/45] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004066039 | Date: | 05.08.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1593005 | Date: | 09.11.2005 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1593005 | Date: | 27.07.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G04B19/24 | [2005/45] | CPC: |
G04B19/25366 (EP,US);
G04B19/25333 (EP,US);
G04B19/2534 (EP,US);
G04B19/25346 (EP,US);
G04B19/25353 (EP,US);
G04B19/2536 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KALENDARMECHANISMUS ZUR DARSTELLUNG DES WOCHENTAGES UND DES MONATSTAGES IN EINER UHR | [2005/45] | English: | CALENDAR MECHANISM FOR DISPLAYING THE DAY OF THE WEEK AND THE DAY OF THE MONTH IN A TIMEPIECE | [2005/45] | French: | MECANISME DE CALENDRIER POUR AFFICHER LE QUANTIEME ET LE JOUR DE LA SEMAINE DANS UNE PIECE D HORLOGERIE | [2005/45] | Entry into regional phase | 08.08.2005 | National basic fee paid | 08.08.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.08.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.08.2005 | Examination requested [2005/45] | 15.04.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.04.2011 | Opposition(s) | 02.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.07.2011 | CY | 27.07.2011 | CZ | 27.07.2011 | DK | 27.07.2011 | EE | 27.07.2011 | FI | 27.07.2011 | HU | 27.07.2011 | IE | 27.07.2011 | IT | 27.07.2011 | NL | 27.07.2011 | RO | 27.07.2011 | SE | 27.07.2011 | SI | 27.07.2011 | SK | 27.07.2011 | TR | 27.07.2011 | BG | 27.10.2011 | GR | 28.10.2011 | ES | 07.11.2011 | PT | 28.11.2011 | GB | 18.12.2011 | LU | 18.12.2011 | BE | 31.12.2011 | MC | 31.12.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 27.07.2011 | |
CY | 27.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2011 | ||
DK | 27.07.2011 | ||
EE | 27.07.2011 | ||
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
IE | 27.07.2011 | ||
IT | 27.07.2011 | ||
NL | 27.07.2011 | ||
RO | 27.07.2011 | ||
SE | 27.07.2011 | ||
SI | 27.07.2011 | ||
SK | 27.07.2011 | ||
TR | 27.07.2011 | ||
BG | 27.10.2011 | ||
GR | 28.10.2011 | ||
ES | 07.11.2011 | ||
PT | 28.11.2011 | ||
GB | 18.12.2011 | ||
LU | 18.12.2011 | ||
BE | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 27.07.2011 | |
CY | 27.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2011 | ||
DK | 27.07.2011 | ||
EE | 27.07.2011 | ||
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
IE | 27.07.2011 | ||
IT | 27.07.2011 | ||
NL | 27.07.2011 | ||
RO | 27.07.2011 | ||
SE | 27.07.2011 | ||
SI | 27.07.2011 | ||
SK | 27.07.2011 | ||
BG | 27.10.2011 | ||
GR | 28.10.2011 | ||
ES | 07.11.2011 | ||
PT | 28.11.2011 | ||
GB | 18.12.2011 | ||
LU | 18.12.2011 | ||
BE | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 27.07.2011 | |
CY | 27.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2011 | ||
DK | 27.07.2011 | ||
EE | 27.07.2011 | ||
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
IE | 27.07.2011 | ||
IT | 27.07.2011 | ||
NL | 27.07.2011 | ||
RO | 27.07.2011 | ||
SE | 27.07.2011 | ||
SI | 27.07.2011 | ||
SK | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.10.2011 | ||
ES | 07.11.2011 | ||
PT | 28.11.2011 | ||
GB | 18.12.2011 | ||
LU | 18.12.2011 | ||
BE | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 27.07.2011 | |
CY | 27.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2011 | ||
DK | 27.07.2011 | ||
EE | 27.07.2011 | ||
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
IE | 27.07.2011 | ||
IT | 27.07.2011 | ||
NL | 27.07.2011 | ||
RO | 27.07.2011 | ||
SE | 27.07.2011 | ||
SI | 27.07.2011 | ||
SK | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.10.2011 | ||
ES | 07.11.2011 | ||
PT | 28.11.2011 | ||
GB | 18.12.2011 | ||
BE | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/46] | AT | 27.07.2011 | |
CY | 27.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2011 | ||
DK | 27.07.2011 | ||
EE | 27.07.2011 | ||
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
IE | 27.07.2011 | ||
IT | 27.07.2011 | ||
NL | 27.07.2011 | ||
RO | 27.07.2011 | ||
SE | 27.07.2011 | ||
SI | 27.07.2011 | ||
SK | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.10.2011 | ||
PT | 28.11.2011 | ||
GB | 18.12.2011 | ||
BE | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/33] | AT | 27.07.2011 | |
CY | 27.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2011 | ||
DK | 27.07.2011 | ||
EE | 27.07.2011 | ||
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
IE | 27.07.2011 | ||
IT | 27.07.2011 | ||
NL | 27.07.2011 | ||
RO | 27.07.2011 | ||
SE | 27.07.2011 | ||
SI | 27.07.2011 | ||
SK | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.10.2011 | ||
PT | 28.11.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 27.07.2011 | |
CY | 27.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2011 | ||
EE | 27.07.2011 | ||
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
IE | 27.07.2011 | ||
IT | 27.07.2011 | ||
NL | 27.07.2011 | ||
RO | 27.07.2011 | ||
SE | 27.07.2011 | ||
SI | 27.07.2011 | ||
SK | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.10.2011 | ||
PT | 28.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/21] | AT | 27.07.2011 | |
CY | 27.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 27.07.2011 | ||
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
IE | 27.07.2011 | ||
NL | 27.07.2011 | ||
SE | 27.07.2011 | ||
SI | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.10.2011 | ||
PT | 28.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 27.07.2011 | |
CY | 27.07.2011 | ||
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
IE | 27.07.2011 | ||
NL | 27.07.2011 | ||
SE | 27.07.2011 | ||
SI | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.10.2011 | ||
PT | 28.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 27.07.2011 | |
CY | 27.07.2011 | ||
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
NL | 27.07.2011 | ||
SE | 27.07.2011 | ||
SI | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.10.2011 | ||
PT | 28.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 27.07.2011 | |
FI | 27.07.2011 | ||
NL | 27.07.2011 | ||
SE | 27.07.2011 | ||
SI | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.10.2011 | ||
PT | 28.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | FI | 27.07.2011 | |
NL | 27.07.2011 | ||
SE | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.10.2011 | ||
PT | 28.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | FI | 27.07.2011 | |
NL | 27.07.2011 | ||
PT | 28.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | NL | 27.07.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]CH684980 (EBAUCHESFABRIK ETA AG) [A] 1-12 * figure 1 * * column 2, line 61 - line 65 * * column 1, line 3 - line 9 * * column 2, line 37 - line 43 *; | [A]US4059953 (MORRISON DAVID, et al) [A] 1-12 * figures 2,7 * * column 6, line 26 - line 28 ** column 6, line 42 - line 45 * |