EP1518290 - ION CONDUCTIVE BLOCK COPOLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.03.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.04.2011 [2011/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University Of North Florida Board of Trustees 1 UNF Drive Jacksonville FL 32224 / US | [2010/19] |
Former [2005/13] | For all designated states Polyfuel, Inc. 1245 Terra Bella Avenue Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XU, Helen c/o Polyfuel, Inc. 1245 Terra Bella Av Mountain View CA 94043 / US | 02 /
CAO, Shuguang c/o Polyfuel, Inc., 1245 Terra Bella Av. Mountain View CA 94043 / US | 03 /
CHEN, Jingping c/o Polyfuel Inc., 1245 Terra Bella Av. Mountain View CA 94043 / US | 04 /
JEANES, Thomas c/o Polyfuel Inc., 1245 Terra Bella Avenue Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 05 /
NAM, Kie, Hyun c/o Polyfuel, Inc., 1245 Terra Bella Av. Mountain View CA 94043 / US | [2005/13] | Representative(s) | Duxbury, Stephen, et al Arnold & Siedsma Bavariaring 17 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/13] | Duxbury, Stephen, et al Arnold & Siedsma Isartorplatz 5 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03799789.7 | 13.05.2003 | [2005/13] | WO2003US15351 | Priority number, date | US20020381136P | 13.05.2002 Original published format: US 381136 P | US20030449299P | 20.02.2003 Original published format: US 449299 P | [2005/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004042839 | Date: | 21.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/21] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1518290 | Date: | 30.03.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.05.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.01.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/10, H01M4/88, H01M6/18, B01D71/68, B01D71/80, C08G65/40, C08G75/23, C08J5/22, H01B1/12 | [2009/49] | CPC: |
H01M4/881 (EP,US);
C08G65/4056 (EP,US);
C08J5/2256 (EP,US);
C08L71/00 (EP,US);
C08L81/06 (EP,US);
H01B1/122 (EP,US);
H01M10/0525 (EP,US);
H01M10/0565 (EP,US);
H01M6/181 (EP,US);
H01M8/1027 (EP,US);
H01M8/1032 (EP,US);
H01M8/1034 (EP,US);
H01M8/1037 (EP,US);
H01M8/1039 (EP,US);
C08G2650/40 (EP,US);
C08G2650/64 (EP,US);
C08J2381/06 (EP,US);
H01M2300/0082 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2005/13] | H01M8/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | IONENLEITENDE BLOCKCOPOLYMERE | [2005/13] | English: | ION CONDUCTIVE BLOCK COPOLYMERS | [2005/13] | French: | COPOLYMERES BLOCS CONDUCTEURS D'IONS | [2005/13] | Entry into regional phase | 11.11.2004 | National basic fee paid | 11.11.2004 | Search fee paid | 11.11.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.11.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 11.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/13] | 24.02.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/17] | 06.12.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2010 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1113517 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1-12,21 * paragraphs [0001] , [0010] - [0021] - [0033] * * examples 1,3 * * claims 1-13 *[I] 13-20; | [XA]DE10007272 (MEMBRANA GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-11,17-20 * page 2, line 1 - line 3 * * page 2, line 20 - line 22 * * page 3, line 22 - page 4, line 61 * * page 5, line 8 - line 30 * * examples 1-10,12,13 * [A] 12-16,21; | [XA] - WANG F ET AL, "SODIUM SULFONATE-FUNCTIONALIZED POLY(ETHER ETHER KETONE)S", MACROMOLECULAR CHEMISTRY AND PHYSICS, WILEY-VCH VERLAG, WEINHEIM, DE, (19980701), vol. 199, no. 7, ISSN 1022-1352, pages 1421 - 1426, XP000777518 [X] 1-11,17 * the whole document * [A] 12-16,18-21 | [XI] - GAN D ET AL, "Synthesis and characterization of poly(ether ketone ketone)(PEEK)/sodium sulfonated poly(arylene ethylene ketone)(S-PAEK) block copolymers", POLYMER INTERNATIONAL, BARKING, GB, (20010101), vol. 50, pages 812 - 816, XP002969654 [X] 1-16,21 * the whole document * [I] 17-20 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/pi.700 | International search | [X]US6214488 (HELMER-METZMANN FREDDY [DE], et al) |