EP1549548 - A MACHINE FOR MAKING FILTER BAGS OF TETRAHEDRAL SHAPE FOR INFUSION PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/27] | A MACHINE AND METHOD FOR MAKING FILTER BAGS OF TETRAHEDRAL SHAPE FOR INFUSION PRODUCTS | ||
[2006/08] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.06.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states I.M.A. INDUSTRIA MACCHINE AUTOMATICHE S.p.A. Via Emilia Levante, 428-442 40064 Ozzano dell'Emilia / IT | [2005/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REA, Dario Via della Rocca, 8/3 I-40050 Monterenzio (Bologna) / IT | 02 /
RIVOLA, Sauro Via Fantaguzzi, 5 I-48025 Riolo Terme / IT | [2005/27] | Representative(s) | Lanzoni, Luciano Bugnion S.p.A. Via di Corticella, 87 40128 Bologna / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/27] | Lanzoni, Luciano c/o BUGNION S.p.A. Via Goito, 18 40126 Bologna / IT | Application number, filing date | 03807943.0 | 06.10.2003 | [2005/27] | WO2003IB04396 | Priority number, date | IT2002BO00638 | 09.10.2002 Original published format: IT BO20020638 | [2005/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004033303 | Date: | 22.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1549548 | Date: | 06.07.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1549548 | Date: | 26.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B65B29/02, B65D81/00 | [2005/27] | CPC: |
B65D85/808 (EP,US);
B29C65/086 (EP,US);
B29C66/1122 (EP,US);
B29C66/3452 (EP,US);
B29C66/4312 (EP,US);
B29C66/43121 (EP,US);
B29C66/4322 (EP,US);
B29C66/81465 (EP,US);
B29C66/81467 (EP,US);
B29C66/8322 (EP,US);
B29C66/83411 (EP,US);
B29C66/849 (EP,US);
B65B29/028 (EP,US);
B29C65/18 (EP,US);
B29C66/4332 (EP,US);
B29K2711/126 (EP,US);
B29L2031/14 (EP,US);
B29L2031/7122 (EP,US);
B65D75/50 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/27] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MASCHINE ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON FILTERBEUTELN IN TETRAEDERFORM FÜR AUFBRÜHBARE PRODUKTE | [2006/08] | English: | A MACHINE FOR MAKING FILTER BAGS OF TETRAHEDRAL SHAPE FOR INFUSION PRODUCTS | [2006/08] | French: | MACHINE DE FABRICATION DE SACHETS FILTRANTS DE FORME TETRAEDRIQUE POUR PRODUITS D'INFUSION | [2006/08] |
Former [2005/27] | MASCHINE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON FILTERBEUTELN IN TETRAEDERFORM FÜR AUFBRÜHBARE PRODUKTE | ||
Former [2005/27] | A MACHINE AND METHOD FOR MAKING FILTER BAGS OF TETRAHEDRAL SHAPE FOR INFUSION PRODUCTS | ||
Former [2005/27] | MACHINE ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE SACHETS FILTRANTS DE FORME TETRAEDRIQUE POUR PRODUITS D'INFUSION | Entry into regional phase | 24.06.2004 | National basic fee paid | 24.06.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.06.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.06.2004 | Examination requested [2005/27] | 15.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.05.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 29.05.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.04.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.07.2006 | BE | 26.07.2006 | CH | 26.07.2006 | CY | 26.07.2006 | CZ | 26.07.2006 | EE | 26.07.2006 | FI | 26.07.2006 | LI | 26.07.2006 | NL | 26.07.2006 | RO | 26.07.2006 | SI | 26.07.2006 | SK | 26.07.2006 | TR | 26.07.2006 | IE | 06.10.2006 | LU | 06.10.2006 | BG | 26.10.2006 | DK | 26.10.2006 | SE | 26.10.2006 | GR | 27.10.2006 | MC | 31.10.2006 | PT | 26.12.2006 | HU | 27.01.2007 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 26.07.2006 | |
BE | 26.07.2006 | ||
CH | 26.07.2006 | ||
CZ | 26.07.2006 | ||
EE | 26.07.2006 | ||
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
LI | 26.07.2006 | ||
NL | 26.07.2006 | ||
RO | 26.07.2006 | ||
SI | 26.07.2006 | ||
SK | 26.07.2006 | ||
TR | 26.07.2006 | ||
IE | 06.10.2006 | ||
LU | 06.10.2006 | ||
BG | 26.10.2006 | ||
DK | 26.10.2006 | ||
SE | 26.10.2006 | ||
GR | 27.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
HU | 27.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/32] | AT | 26.07.2006 | |
BE | 26.07.2006 | ||
CH | 26.07.2006 | ||
CZ | 26.07.2006 | ||
EE | 26.07.2006 | ||
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
LI | 26.07.2006 | ||
NL | 26.07.2006 | ||
RO | 26.07.2006 | ||
SI | 26.07.2006 | ||
SK | 26.07.2006 | ||
IE | 06.10.2006 | ||
BG | 26.10.2006 | ||
DK | 26.10.2006 | ||
SE | 26.10.2006 | ||
GR | 27.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
HU | 27.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 26.07.2006 | |
BE | 26.07.2006 | ||
CH | 26.07.2006 | ||
CZ | 26.07.2006 | ||
EE | 26.07.2006 | ||
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
LI | 26.07.2006 | ||
NL | 26.07.2006 | ||
RO | 26.07.2006 | ||
SI | 26.07.2006 | ||
SK | 26.07.2006 | ||
IE | 06.10.2006 | ||
BG | 26.10.2006 | ||
DK | 26.10.2006 | ||
SE | 26.10.2006 | ||
GR | 27.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 26.07.2006 | |
BE | 26.07.2006 | ||
CH | 26.07.2006 | ||
CZ | 26.07.2006 | ||
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
LI | 26.07.2006 | ||
NL | 26.07.2006 | ||
RO | 26.07.2006 | ||
SI | 26.07.2006 | ||
SK | 26.07.2006 | ||
IE | 06.10.2006 | ||
BG | 26.10.2006 | ||
DK | 26.10.2006 | ||
SE | 26.10.2006 | ||
GR | 27.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 26.07.2006 | |
BE | 26.07.2006 | ||
CH | 26.07.2006 | ||
CZ | 26.07.2006 | ||
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
LI | 26.07.2006 | ||
NL | 26.07.2006 | ||
RO | 26.07.2006 | ||
SI | 26.07.2006 | ||
SK | 26.07.2006 | ||
IE | 06.10.2006 | ||
BG | 26.10.2006 | ||
DK | 26.10.2006 | ||
SE | 26.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/49] | AT | 26.07.2006 | |
BE | 26.07.2006 | ||
CH | 26.07.2006 | ||
CZ | 26.07.2006 | ||
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
IT | 26.07.2006 | ||
LI | 26.07.2006 | ||
NL | 26.07.2006 | ||
RO | 26.07.2006 | ||
SI | 26.07.2006 | ||
SK | 26.07.2006 | ||
IE | 06.10.2006 | ||
BG | 26.10.2006 | ||
DK | 26.10.2006 | ||
SE | 26.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/41] | AT | 26.07.2006 | |
BE | 26.07.2006 | ||
CH | 26.07.2006 | ||
CZ | 26.07.2006 | ||
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
IT | 26.07.2006 | ||
LI | 26.07.2006 | ||
NL | 26.07.2006 | ||
RO | 26.07.2006 | ||
SI | 26.07.2006 | ||
SK | 26.07.2006 | ||
BG | 26.10.2006 | ||
DK | 26.10.2006 | ||
SE | 26.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/29] | AT | 26.07.2006 | |
BE | 26.07.2006 | ||
CH | 26.07.2006 | ||
CZ | 26.07.2006 | ||
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
LI | 26.07.2006 | ||
NL | 26.07.2006 | ||
SI | 26.07.2006 | ||
SK | 26.07.2006 | ||
BG | 26.10.2006 | ||
DK | 26.10.2006 | ||
SE | 26.10.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/23] | AT | 26.07.2006 | |
CH | 26.07.2006 | ||
CZ | 26.07.2006 | ||
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
LI | 26.07.2006 | ||
NL | 26.07.2006 | ||
SI | 26.07.2006 | ||
BG | 26.10.2006 | ||
DK | 26.10.2006 | ||
SE | 26.10.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CH | 26.07.2006 | |
CZ | 26.07.2006 | ||
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
LI | 26.07.2006 | ||
NL | 26.07.2006 | ||
SI | 26.07.2006 | ||
BG | 26.10.2006 | ||
DK | 26.10.2006 | ||
SE | 26.10.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/20] | CH | 26.07.2006 | |
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
LI | 26.07.2006 | ||
NL | 26.07.2006 | ||
SI | 26.07.2006 | ||
BG | 26.10.2006 | ||
SE | 26.10.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/14] | CH | 26.07.2006 | |
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
LI | 26.07.2006 | ||
SI | 26.07.2006 | ||
BG | 26.10.2006 | ||
SE | 26.10.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | SI | 26.07.2006 | Cited in | International search | [Y]GB445562 (HANS IRMSCHER) [Y] 2,4,12 * page 2, line 39 - page 3, line 15; figures 1-6 *; | [XY]GB1575845 (RODIGUES ELY R) [X] 1,7,9,11,14,16 * page 4, line 97 - page 5, line 7; figure 8 * [Y] 2,4,6,8,10,12,15; | [A]GB2053837 (RODRIGUES ELY R) [A] 1,14* page 3, line 94 - page 4, line 54; figures 2A,2E *; | [Y]EP1164080 (TEEPACK SPEZIALMASCHINEN [DE]) [Y] 6,8,10,15 * column 4, line 15 - line 16; figure 1 * |