EP1558123 - MULTI-MODAL SYSTEM FOR DETECTION AND CONTROL OF CHANGES IN BRAIN STATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Flint Hills Scientific, L.L.C. Suite A, 5020 W. 15th Street Lawrence, KS 66049 / US | [2010/47] |
Former [2005/31] | For all designated states Flint Hills Scientific, L.L.C. Suite A, 5020 W. 15th Street Lawrence, KS 66049 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OSORIO, Ivan 4005 W. 124th Street Leawood, KS 66209 / US | 02 /
BHAVARAJU, Naresh, C. 11018 W. Ocean Air Drive Apt. 264 San Diego, CA 92130 / US | [2007/07] |
Former [2005/31] | 01 /
OSORIO, Ivan 4005 W. 124th Street Leawood, KS 66209 / US | ||
02 /
BHAVARAJU, Naresh, C. 6909 W. 51st Place, Apt. 3B Mission, KS 66202 / US | Representative(s) | Hale, Peter, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/31] | Hale, Peter, et al Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 03808204.6 | 09.10.2003 | [2005/31] | WO2003US32192 | Priority number, date | US20020418154P | 11.10.2002 Original published format: US 418154 P | [2007/07] |
Former [2005/31] | US20020418154P | 11.10.2002 | |
US20030930003 | 09.10.2003 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004032720 | Date: | 22.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/17] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1558123 | Date: | 03.08.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1558123 | Date: | 24.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.06.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/00 | [2005/31] | CPC: |
A61F7/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MULTIMODALES SYSTEM ZUM NACHWEIS UND ZUR KONTROLLE VON VERÄNDERUNGEN DES ZUSTANDS DES GEHIRNS | [2010/25] | English: | MULTI-MODAL SYSTEM FOR DETECTION AND CONTROL OF CHANGES IN BRAIN STATE | [2005/31] | French: | SYSTEME MULTIMODAL POUR LA DETECTION ET LA COMMANDE DE CHANGEMENTS DE L'ETAT CEREBRAL | [2005/31] |
Former [2005/31] | MULTIMODALES SYSTEM ZUM NACHWEIS UND ZURKONTROLLE VON VERÄNDERUNGEN DES ZUSTANDS DES GEHIRNS | Entry into regional phase | 11.05.2005 | National basic fee paid | 11.05.2005 | Search fee paid | 11.05.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.05.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/31] | 02.08.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Priority | 12.09.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Priority 0002 | 06.03.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2010 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 06.05.2010 | 06.05.2010 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 18.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.09.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 16.09.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.11.2010 | BE | 24.11.2010 | CY | 24.11.2010 | CZ | 24.11.2010 | DK | 24.11.2010 | EE | 24.11.2010 | FI | 24.11.2010 | HU | 24.11.2010 | IT | 24.11.2010 | RO | 24.11.2010 | SE | 24.11.2010 | SI | 24.11.2010 | SK | 24.11.2010 | TR | 24.11.2010 | BG | 24.02.2011 | GR | 25.02.2011 | ES | 07.03.2011 | PT | 24.03.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
BE | 24.11.2010 | ||
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
IT | 24.11.2010 | ||
RO | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SK | 24.11.2010 | ||
TR | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
ES | 07.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
BE | 24.11.2010 | ||
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
IT | 24.11.2010 | ||
RO | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SK | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
ES | 07.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
BE | 24.11.2010 | ||
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
DK | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
RO | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SK | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
ES | 07.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
BE | 24.11.2010 | ||
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.11.2010 | ||
EE | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
ES | 07.03.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/31] | AT | 24.11.2010 | |
CY | 24.11.2010 | ||
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
SI | 24.11.2010 | ||
BG | 24.02.2011 | ||
GR | 25.02.2011 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/24] | CY | 24.11.2010 | |
FI | 24.11.2010 | ||
SE | 24.11.2010 | ||
PT | 24.03.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3298371 (LEE ARNOLD S J) [X] 1 * column 2; figure 2 *; | [A]FR2269914 (ERBE ELEKTROMEDIZIN [DE]) [A] 1-11* the whole document *; | [A]US6128527 (HOWARD III MATTHEW A [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract *; | [A]US6149677 (DOBAK III JOHN D [US]) [A] 1-11 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [X]US6248126 (LESSER RONALD P [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 8, lines 33-66 *; | [X]US2002068902 (LARNARD DONALD J [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,7,10 * paragraphs [0034] - [0049]; claim 1 *; | [X]US2002120317 (FLETCHER ROBERT DAVID [CA]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0012] - [0015]; figure 1; claim 1 * | International search | [A]US5995868 (OSORIO IVAN [US], et al); | [A]US6128527 (HOWARD III MATTHEW A [US], et al); | [A]US6248126 (LESSER RONALD P [US], et al) |